Harris v. Forest River, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Harris and Kenneth Harris, Jr.
Defendant: Forest River, Inc. and Summit RV
Case Number: 3:2023cv00570
Filed: August 23, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #6 MOTION to File Late His Response to the #4 MOTION by Forest River, Inc. to Dismiss; directing that Plaintiff is to file his Response on or before 10/23/2023. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 10/20/2023. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (skm)
October 20, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION by Kenneth Harris, Jr. to File Late His Response to the #4 MOTION by Forest River, Inc. to Dismiss to October 24th, 2023. (Sczepanski, John) (Modified on 10/20/2023 to detach proposed order and add as an attachment and to add link to the #4 motion) (mkw). (Additional attachment added on 10/20/2023: #1 Proposed Order) (mkw).
August 30, 2023 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Forest River, Inc. in support of #4 MOTION by Forest River, Inc. to Dismiss With Prejudice. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Palumbo, Corey)
August 30, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION by Forest River, Inc. to Dismiss With Prejudice, re: complaint attached to the #1 Notice of Removal. (Palumbo, Corey) (Modified on 8/31/2023 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (mkw).
August 25, 2023 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Forest River, Inc. (Palumbo, Corey)
August 24, 2023 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (jsa)
August 23, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Forest River, Inc. with summons, complaint, notice of filing notice of removal, docket sheet and other miscellaneous documents from Circuit Court of Putnam County. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-8482719. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (jsa)
August 23, 2023 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Forest River, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Harris, Jr.
Represented By: John A. Sczepanski, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forest River, Inc.
Represented By: Corey L. Palumbo
Represented By: J. Tyler Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summit RV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?