Slone et al v. Racer et al
Plaintiff: Opal R. Slone and The Estate of Jacquline Hudson
Defendant: Jeffrey Racer, Cabell County Sheriff's Office, Chuck Zerkle, Cabell County Commission and John Doe 1-5
Case Number: 3:2023cv00636
Filed: September 25, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Jeffrey Racer; Jury demand. (Lilly, Emily) (Modified on 11/21/2023 to add jury demand) (mkw).
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Jeffrey Racer in support of #14 MOTION by Jeffrey Racer to Dismiss With Prejudice, re: #1 Complaint. (Lilly, Emily)
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION by Jeffrey Racer to Dismiss With Prejudice, re: #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lilly, Emily) (Modified on 11/21/2023 to add link to #1 complaint) (mkw).
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REPLY by Cabell County Commission, Cabell County Sheriff's Office, Chuck Zerkle to #11 Response In Opposition. (Greve, Wendy)
November 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by James C. Stebbins on 11/07/23. Jeffrey Racer waiver mailed on 11/3/2023, answer due 1/2/2024. (Stebbins, James)
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RESPONSE by Opal R. Slone, The Estate of Jacquline Hudson in opposition to #8 MOTION by Cabell County Commission, Cabell County Sheriff's Office, Chuck Zerkle to Dismiss With Prejudice, re: #1 Complaint. (Haslam, Tyler) (Modified on 11/7/2023 to add party filer)
November 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions - 11/22/2023. Rule 26(f) Meeting - 11/27/2023. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting - 12/4/2023. Scheduling/status conference at 11:30 AM on 12/18/2023 in Huntington. Entry of Scheduling Order - 12/26/2023. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures - 1/2/2024. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 11/2/2023. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (mkw)
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Cabell County Commission, Cabell County Sheriff's Office, Chuck Zerkle in support of #8 MOTION by Cabell County Commission, Cabell County Sheriff's Office, Chuck Zerkle to Dismiss With Prejudice re: #1 Complaint. (Greve, Wendy)
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION by Cabell County Commission, Cabell County Sheriff's Office, Chuck Zerkle to Dismiss With Prejudice re: #1 Complaint. (Greve, Wendy)
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ANSWER TO #1 Complaint, by Cabell County Commission, Cabell County Sheriff's Office, Chuck Zerkle; Jury demand. (Greve, Wendy) (Modified on 10/20/2023 to add jury demand) (mkw).
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED for Cabell County Commission, Cabell County Commission served on 9/29/2023, answer due 10/20/2023. (Nessel, Kerry)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED for Chuck Zerkle, Chuck Zerkle served on 9/29/2023, answer due 10/20/2023. (Nessel, Kerry)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED for Cabell County Sheriff's Office, Cabell County Sheriff's Office served on 9/29/2023, answer due 10/20/2023. (Nessel, Kerry)
September 25, 2023 Opinion or Order CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
September 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (jsa)
September 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Cabell County Commission, Cabell County Sheriff's Office, Jeffrey Racer, Chuck Zerkle, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachments: #1 summons as to Cabell County Sheriff's Office, #2 summons as to Chuck Zerkle, #3 summons as to Cabell County Commission) (jsa)
September 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8503142. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons as to Jeffrey Racer, #2 Proposed Summons as to Cabell County Sheriff's Office, #3 Proposed Summons as to Chuck Zerkle, #4 Proposed Summons as to Cabell County Commission, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (jsa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Slone et al v. Racer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Opal R. Slone
Represented By: Kerry A. Nessel
Represented By: Tyler C. Haslam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Estate of Jacquline Hudson
Represented By: Kerry A. Nessel
Represented By: Tyler C. Haslam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Racer
Represented By: Emily L. Lilly
Represented By: James C. Stebbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cabell County Sheriff's Office
Represented By: Wendy E. Greve
Represented By: Benjamin Brice Vanston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chuck Zerkle
Represented By: Benjamin Brice Vanston
Represented By: Wendy E. Greve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cabell County Commission
Represented By: Benjamin Brice Vanston
Represented By: Wendy E. Greve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?