Knight v. Sanofi US Services Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sheri Knight
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc., Sun Pharma Global, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S., Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S., L.L.C., Sandoz, Inc., Accord Healthcare, Inc., Hospira Worldwide, Inc., Hospira, Inc., Sun Pharma Global FZE, Caraco Pharmaceutical Laboratories, Ltd., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc. and Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Case Number: 3:2023cv00719
Filed: November 7, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties, amended pleadings due by 1/15/2024. Discovery requests to be completed by 10/1/2024 and all depositions by 1/29/2025. Expert Witness List by parties bearing the burden of proof due by 11/1/2024, by party not bearing burden of proof due by 12/13/2024, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due by 1/3/2025. Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 2/18/2025; any response shall be filed within 14 days of the filing of the motion, with replies due within 7 days of the filing of the response. Settlement Meeting and Rule 26(a)(3) disclosures by 2/28/2025. Plaintiff's portion of proposed Pretrial Order to defendants due by 5/12/2025. Proposed Integrated Pretrial Order due by 5/19/2025. Pretrial Conference set for 5/27/2025 at 10:00 AM in Huntington before Judge Robert C. Chambers. Proposed Jury Charges due by 6/3/2025. Final Settlement Conference at 9:30 AM on 6/9/2025 in Huntington. Trial set for 6/10/2025 at 8:30 AM in Huntington before Judge Robert C. Chambers. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 12/1/2023. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
November 28, 2023 Filing 17 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by Sheri Knight, Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Proctor, Jason) (Modified on 11/30/2023 to add party filer) (mkw).
November 22, 2023 Filing 16 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Tracy Turner on behalf of Sheri Knight. Local counsel: Paul T. Farrell. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8542443. (Attachment: #1 Supplement Appearance of Counsel)(Farrell, Paul) (Modified on 11/22/2023 to replace images for the main document and the attachment) (mkw).
November 22, 2023 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #16 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY. Error: The image for the main document and the attachment was not flattened. Correction: Replaced unflattened images with flattened images) (mkw)
November 17, 2023 Filing 15 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Christopher S. McRae on behalf of Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sanofi US Services Inc.. Local counsel: Jason A. Proctor. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8539159. (Proctor, Jason)
November 10, 2023 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Sanofi US Services Inc. (Proctor, Jason)
November 10, 2023 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Proctor, Jason)
November 10, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Bonasso on behalf of Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Bonasso, Michael)
November 10, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason A. Proctor on behalf of Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Proctor, Jason)
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER directing the parties to conduct a Rule 26(f) meeting and file a Report of the Parties' Planning Meeting by 11/28/2023; the Court will then enter a scheduling order. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 11/9/2023. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (skm)
November 8, 2023 Filing 9 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (msa)
November 7, 2023 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
November 7, 2023 Filing 8 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:17-cv-13491. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (msa)
November 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TRANSFER ORDER-Case transferred to Southern District of West Virginia. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 10/23/2023. (MDL 2740, Doc. 16511)(go) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/7/2023.]
September 28, 2023 Filing 6 Joint Designation of Record for MDL Transfer by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Joint Designation of General and Case-Specific MDL Records to be included Upon Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Transfer of Orders, #2 Exhibit B - PTO, #3 Exhibit C - CMO, #4 Exhibit D - Pleadings, #5 Exhibit E - Orders on Dispositive Motions, #6 Exhibit F - Daubert Orders, #7 Exhibit G - MIL Orders)(Britton, Mary) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/7/2023.]
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance.(ADI) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/7/2023.]
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt.(ADI) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/7/2023.]
December 6, 2017 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Accord Healthcare, Inc., Caraco Pharmaceutical Laboratories, Ltd., Hospira Worldwide, Inc., Hospira, Inc., Sandoz, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sun Pharma Global FZE, Sun Pharma Global, Inc.. (aj) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/7/2023.]
November 28, 2017 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (gk) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/7/2023.]
November 28, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6495110) filed by Sheri Knight. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment 1, #2 Summons Accord Healthcare, #3 Summons Caraco Pharma, #4 Summons Hospira Inc, #5 Summons Hospira Worldwide, #6 Summons Sandoz, #7 Summons Sanofi US Services Inc, #8 Summons Sanofi-Aventis, #9 Summons Sun Pharma Global FZE, #10 Summons Sun Pharma Global Inc.)Attorney Thomas Christopher Pinedo added to party Sheri Knight(pty:pla).(Pinedo, Thomas) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/7/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knight v. Sanofi US Services Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc.
Represented By: Christopher S. McRae
Represented By: Michael Bonasso
Represented By: Jason A. Proctor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Pharma Global, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S., Inc.
Represented By: Christopher S. McRae
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S., L.L.C.
Represented By: Christopher S. McRae
Represented By: Stephen Evans Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accord Healthcare, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospira Worldwide, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospira, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Pharma Global FZE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caraco Pharmaceutical Laboratories, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc.
Represented By: Christopher S. McRae
Represented By: Jason A. Proctor
Represented By: Michael Bonasso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Represented By: Christopher S. McRae
Represented By: Jason A. Proctor
Represented By: Michael Bonasso
Represented By: Stephen Evans Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheri Knight
Represented By: Thomas Christopher Pinedo
Represented By: Matthew Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Tracy L. Turner
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?