Crabtree v. O'Malley
Plaintiff: Charles R. Crabtree
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi and Martin J. O'Malley
Case Number: 3:2023cv00740
Filed: November 16, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Omar J Aboulhosn
Referring Judge: Robert C Chambers
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2024 Filing 4 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held before the Administrative Law Judge. (Bailey, Jason)
November 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing that Defendant SHALL file a Transcript no later than 60 days after notice of the action is given under Rule 3, which is 1/16/2024; Plaintiff SHALL file and serve on the Commissioner a brief for the requested relief within 30 days after the Transcript is filed; the Commissioner SHALL file and serve on the Plaintiff a brief within 30 days after service of the Plaintiff's brief; and Plaintiff may file a reply brief and serve it on the Commissioner within 14 days after service of the Commissioner's brief; serving a motion under Rule 4(c) alters these deadlines as set forth in Supplemental SSA Rules 4(d) and 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 11/17/2023. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (jsa)
November 17, 2023 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (ts)
November 16, 2023 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (ts)
November 16, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8537910. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jsa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crabtree v. O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles R. Crabtree
Represented By: Kenneth P. Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Social Security Administration - Office of General
Represented By: William S. Thompson, United States Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin J. O'Malley
Represented By: Social Security Administration - Office of General
Represented By: Jason S. Bailey
Represented By: William S. Thompson, United States Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?