O'Neil v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Charles Edward O'Neil
Defendant: Syed Rasheed, Sue Engels, N. Rehberg, Jerri Kirkland, Sherri Taylor, K. Rose, Richard H. Russell, Dominick McLain, Kenneth Kaiser, Scotty Rose and Marty Anderson
Case Number: 5:2007cv00358
Filed: March 31, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Office: Beckley Office
County: Raleigh
Presiding Judge: Thomas E. Johnston
Presiding Judge: R. Clarke VanDervort
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 153 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: the Court finds that it lacks jurisdiction and Dismisses the case with prejudice; the Clerk is directed to remove this action from the docket. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 9/30/2011. (cc: Magistrate Judge VanDervort, attys; any unrepresented party) (cds)
March 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 86 MEMORANDUM OPINION: For the reasons stated herein, the Court ADOPTS the recommendation contained in the 78 Proposed Findings and Recommendations, GRANTS Plaintiff's 81 Motion for Leave to Exceed Twenty Page Limit, DENIES Plaintiff's [36 ] Motion for Reconsideration of Order, GRANTS Defendants' 52 and 63 Motions to Dismiss, DENIES Plaintiff's 72 Response Motion in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, DISMISSES Plaintiff's 4 and 27 Complaint and REMOVES this matter from the Court's docket. A separate Judgment Order will enter this day implementing the rulings contained herein. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 3/31/2009. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mls)
January 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 78 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS: Recommending that the District Court DENY Plaintiff's 36 MOTION for Reconsideration Order, GRANT Defendant Rasheed's 52 MOTION to Dismiss, GRANT Federal Defendants' 63 MOTION to Dismiss, DEN Y Plaintiff's 72 Response MOTION in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, DISMISS Plaintiff's 4 and 27 Complaint and remove this matter from the Court's docket. This case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge R. Clarke VanDervort. Objections to Proposed F&R due by 2/17/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Clarke VanDervort on 1/30/2009. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mls)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Neil v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syed Rasheed
Represented By: Stewart E. Altmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sue Engels
Represented By: Kelly R. Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Rehberg
Represented By: Kelly R. Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerri Kirkland
Represented By: Kelly R. Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherri Taylor
Represented By: Kelly R. Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Rose
Represented By: Kelly R. Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard H. Russell
Represented By: Kelly R. Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominick McLain
Represented By: Kelly R. Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Kaiser
Represented By: Kelly R. Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scotty Rose
Represented By: Kelly R. Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marty Anderson
Represented By: Kelly R. Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Edward O'Neil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?