Jones v. F.C.I. Beckley Med. Staff Employees et al
Plaintiff: |
Steve Jones |
Defendant: |
F.C.I. Beckley Med. Staff Employees, Mr. White, Mrs. Lilly and Mrs. Rose |
Case Number: |
5:2011cv00530 |
Filed: |
March 12, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia |
Office: |
Beckley Office |
County: |
Raleigh |
Presiding Judge: |
Irene C. Berger |
Presiding Judge: |
R. Clarke VanDervort |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Personal Injury |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1331 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 30, 2014 |
Filing
74
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The Court does ORDER that the Magistrate Judge's 69 Proposed Findings and Recommendation dismissing Plaintiff's Complaint be ADOPTED, that the Plaintiff's 72 Objections to the PF&R be OVERRULED, and t hat the Plaintiff's complaint be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; the Court ORDERS that the Plaintiff's renewed Motion for Appointment of Counsel and Motion for a Jury Trial, contained at the end of his objections, be DENIED; the Court ORDERS that the 73 MOTION to Alter or Amend Judgment Pursuant to FRCVP 59(e) be DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 6/30/2014. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (slr)
|
April 1, 2014 |
Filing
70
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The Court ADOPTS and incorporates herein the findings and recommendation of the Magistrate Judge as contained in the 69 Proposed Findings and Recommendation, and ORDERS that the United States' 61 Motion to Dismiss be GRANTED, the Plaintiff's 2 Complaint be DISMISSED, and that this action be REMOVED from the Court's docket. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 04/01/2014. (cc: USMJ VanDervort; attys; any unrepresented party) (msa)
|
October 15, 2013 |
Filing
60
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The Court ORDERS that Plaintiff's 48 "Objections and Traverse(s)," which the Corut construes as a Motion for Reconsideration, be GRANTED only to the extent that the Court has substantively reviewed his timely objections and arguments and DENIED to the extent that the motion asks the Court to alter its prior ruling; the Court ORDERS that Plaintiff's objections to the 46 PF&R be OVERRULED; the Court REAFFIRMS its 47 Memorandum Opinion and Or der adopting the Magistrate's Proposed Findings and Recommendation.: (1) granting the United States' First Amended Motion to Dismiss Defendants Conley White, Janeen Rose and Frances Lilly and Substitute the United States; (2) denying as moo t the United States' Motion to Dismiss Defendants Conley White, Janeen Rose, and Frances Lilly and Substitute the United States; (3) granting the United States' Motion to Dismiss Medical Negligence Claims for Failure to State a Claim; and ( 4) granting the Defendants' First Amended Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment; (5) denying as moot the Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment; and (6) referring this matter back to Magistrate Judge VanDervort for further proceedings regarding the Plaintiff's FTCA claim. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 10/15/2013. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (slr)
|
February 11, 2013 |
Filing
47
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the 43 Proposed Findings and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge and ORDERS as follows: (1) the 30 First Amended Motion of the United States to Dismiss Defendants Conley White, Janeen Rose and F rances Lilly and Substitute the United States is GRANTED; (2) the 16 Motion of the United States to Dismiss Defendants Conley White, Janeen Rose and Frances Lilly and Substitute the United States is DENIED AS MOOT; the 18 Motion of the United Sta tes to Dismiss Medical Negligence Claims for Failure to State a Claim is GRANTED; (4) the Defendants' 28 First Amended Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED; (5) the Defendants' 23 Motion to Di smiss, or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED AS MOOT; and (6) this matter is REFERRED back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings regarding the Plaintiff's FTCA claim. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 2/11/2013. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (slr)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?