McNeilly v. Greenbrier Resort et al
Plaintiff: |
Scarlett Faith McNeilly |
Defendant: |
Greenbrier Resort, James C. Justice, II, Justice Family Group LLC, Gallagher Basset Services Inc., Kathy Miller, Paul Fogus and Tom Stacy |
Case Number: |
5:2012cv04609 |
Filed: |
August 22, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia |
Office: |
Beckley Office |
County: |
Greenbrier |
Presiding Judge: |
R. Clarke VanDervort |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Personal Injury |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 25, 2014 |
Filing
162
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: denying Defendant's 106 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 4/25/2014. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (cds)
|
March 21, 2014 |
Filing
133
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: It is ORDERED that the Plaintiff's 104 MOTION to Compel is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; Plaintiff's Motion to Compel regarding Interrogatory No. 6 is GRANTED and Defendant is DIRECTED to respond to Interrogatory No. 6 by 3/31/2014; Plaintiff's Motion to Compel regarding Interrogatory No. 4, Request for Production No. 2, and Second Set of Request for Production No. 2 is DENIED; Plaintiff's Motion to Compel regarding Interrogatory No. 5 is DENIED; it is ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Compel regarding Defendant's Initial Disclosure Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1)(A)(iv) is GRANTED; Defendant is DIRECTED to produce the information by 3/31/2014; it is ORDERED that Plaintiff� 39;s Motion to Compel as to First Set of Interrogatory No. 1 is DENIED; it is ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Compel as to Request for Production No. 1 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; Defendant shall produce any manager's log or any other such document by 3/31/2014; Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Clarke VanDervort on 3/21/2014. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (slr)
|
November 26, 2013 |
Filing
91
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the 72 Proposed Findings and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge and ORDERS that Defendant Gallagher Basset's 40 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Defendant Justice Family Group 's 60 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim be GRANTED to the extent they seek dismissal of the action and DENIED to the extent they request costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 11/26/2013. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (slr)
|
June 11, 2013 |
Filing
55
ORDER: It is ORDERED that Plaintiff's 46 MOTION to Amend Amended Complaint is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Clarke VanDervort on 6/11/2013. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (slr)
|
April 3, 2013 |
Filing
39
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the 34 Proposed Findings and Recommendations of the Magistrate Judge, and ORDERS that: Defendant Greenbrier Resort's 11 Motion to Dismiss as to Plaintiff's "Claim of Negligence of Right to Care of Choice" and "Claim of Failure to Pay for Medical Expenses" be GRANTED, but that Defendant's Motions to Dismiss be DENIED as to Plaintiff's "Claim of Negligence Pertaining to Premises Liability" and as to its request for costs and attorney's fees. Defendant Justice's 12 Motion to Dismiss be GRANTED to the extent he seeks dismissal of the action and DENIED to the extent he requests costs and attorneys' fees. Defendant Miller& #039;s 13 Motion to Dismiss GRANTED to the extent she seeks dismissal of the action and DENIED to the extent he requests costs and attorneys' fees. Defendant Fogus' 14 Motion to Dismiss be GRANTED to the extent he seeks dismissal of the action and DENIED to the extent he requests costs and attorneys' fees. Defendant Stacy's 15 Motion to Dismiss be GRANTED to the extent he seeks dismissal of the action and DENIED to the extent he requests costs and attorneys' fees. This matter be REFERRED back to the Honorable R. Clarke VanDervort for prosecution of Plaintiff's surviving claim for negligence pertaining to premises liability. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 4/3/2013. (cc: USMJ VanDervort; attys; any unrepresented party) (msa)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?