Ali v. Raleigh County, et al
Plaintiff: |
Marquel Ali |
Defendant: |
Raleigh County, Raleigh County Sheriff's Department, Steven Tanner, City of Beckley, Beckley Police Department, Gary Epling, West Virginia State Police, Kenneth L. Pack and Jason Redden |
Case Number: |
5:2017cv03386 |
Filed: |
June 23, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia |
Office: |
Beckley Office |
County: |
Raleigh |
Presiding Judge: |
Irene C. Berger |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1981 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 14, 2019 |
Filing
336
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Granting Defendants Gary Epling and Jason Redden's 242 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting Defendants Raleigh County and Steven Tanner's 244 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting Defendants City of Beckl ey and David Snuffer's 246 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting Defendant Kenneth Pack's 248 Motion for Summary Judgment; dismissing the 23 Amended Complaint; terminating as moot all other pending motions; cancelling all further deadlines, hearing and trial dates in the scheduling order. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 5/14/2019. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (slr)
|
September 14, 2018 |
Filing
228
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Denying the 40 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint; denying the 213 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint to Reassert Section 1983 Claim Against Defendant Raleigh County; ; granting 225 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Out of Time. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 9/14/2018. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (slr)
|
August 28, 2018 |
Filing
217
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Granting in part and denying in part Defendants West Virginia State Police and Corporal Kenneth L. Pack's 38 MOTION to Dismiss; dismissing all the claims against the West Virginia State Police and Defendant Pack in his official capacity as an officer of the West Virginia State Police; directing that the motion be GRANTED as to Counts III, VI, and X, and that those counts be DISMISSED; ordering that the motion be DENIED otherwise; terminating as moot the Defendants' 41 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending the Resolution of their Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 8/28/2018. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (btm)
|
March 29, 2018 |
Filing
76
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART Defendant Jason Redden in his Capacity as a Parole Officer with the West Virginia Division of Correction's 5 MOTION to Dismiss the Plaintiff's Complaint; dismissing all of the Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Jason Redden in his official capacity as a parole officer for the West Virginia Division of Corrections; granting the motion as to Count X, and dismissing this count against Jason Redden in his individual capacity; denying the motion except as noted herein. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 3/29/2018. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (slr)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?