Adkins v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Plaintiff: Chanda Adkins
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Case Number: 5:2018cv01358
Filed: October 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene C Berger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 1/2/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 1/9/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 1/16/2019. Scheduling Conference at 9:30 AM on 1/30/2019 in Beckley. Entry of Scheduling Order 2/6/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 2/13/2019. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 12/4/2018. (cc:attys; any unrepresented party) (slr)
December 3, 2018 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Kinder, Eric)
December 3, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER TO #1 Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kinder, Eric)
November 6, 2018 Filing 6 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME for Wal-Mart Stores East, LP to Answer or Otherwise Respond to #1 Complaint to December 3, 2018 by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Chanda Adkins (Thompson, Chelsea) (Modified on 11/7/2018 to add party filer)(ts).
October 26, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 10/22/2018 as to Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (taq)
October 17, 2018 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (btm)
October 16, 2018 CASE assigned to Judge Irene C. Berger. (klc)
October 16, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Chanda Adkins for Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, (Salvatore, Anthony)
October 16, 2018 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (btm)
October 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-6856856. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (btm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adkins v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: Eric E. Kinder
Represented By: Chelsea Elizabeth Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chanda Adkins
Represented By: Anthony M. Salvatore
Represented By: Brandon S. Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?