Hendricks v. Cordis Corporation
Plaintiff: Nicholas Hendricks
Defendant: Cardinal Health 105, Inc. and Cordis Corporation
Case Number: 5:2018cv01388
Filed: October 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene C Berger
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2018 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cordis Corporation for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Lawrence, Charity)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Cancelling the Scheduling Conference previously scheduled for 12/12/2018; ordering that this case shall proceed as follows: Joinder of Parties, amended pleadings due by 1/11/2019. Discovery requests to be completed by 9/13/2019, and all depositions by 11/8/2019. Expert Witness List by parties bearing the burden of proof due by 8/23/2019, by party not bearing burden of proof due by 9/20/2019, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due by 10/4/2019. Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 12/4/2019. Motions in Limine to be filed by 2/14/2020, with responses due by 2/21/2020. Proposed Jury Charges due by 4/6/2020. Plaintiffs portion of proposed Pretrial Order to defendants due by 3/31/2020. Proposed integrated pretrial order due by 4/7/2020. Pretrial Conference/Final Settlement Conference at 11:00 AM on 4/16/2020 in Beckley. Jury Trial set for 4/27/2020 at 9:00 AM in Beckley before Judge Irene C. Berger. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 11/30/2018. (cc:attys; any unrepresented party) (btm)
November 29, 2018 Filing 8 JOINT REPORT PURSUANT TO RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by Cordis Corporation, Nicholas Hendricks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Durst, Paula)
November 14, 2018 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Cordis Corporation in support of #6 MOTION by Cordis Corporation to Dismiss Complaint (Lawrence, Charity)
November 14, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION by Cordis Corporation to Dismiss Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Lawrence, Charity) (Modified on 11/15/2018 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (ts).
November 14, 2018 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Cordis Corporation (Lawrence, Charity)
November 14, 2018 Filing 4 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL With Prejudice of Cardinal Health 105, Inc., filed by Nicholas Hendricks and Defendants Cordis Corporation and Cardinal Health 105, Inc. (Lawrence, Charity) (Modified on 11/14/2018 to add party filers.) (slr).
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 11/14/2018. Rule 26(f) Meeting 11/21/2018. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 11/29/2018. Scheduling Conference at 9:00 AM on 12/12/2018 in Beckley. Entry of Scheduling Order 12/20/2018. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 12/27/2018. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 11/1/2018. (cc:attys; any unrepresented party) (slr)
October 29, 2018 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (msa)
October 26, 2018 CASE assigned to Judge Irene C. Berger. (ts)
October 26, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Cardinal Health 105, Inc., Cordis Corporation with summons, complaint and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Raleigh County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-6897277. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (msa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hendricks v. Cordis Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 105, Inc.
Represented By: James C. Walls, III
Represented By: Paula L. Durst
Represented By: Charity K. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cordis Corporation
Represented By: James C. Walls, III
Represented By: Paula L. Durst
Represented By: Charity K. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Hendricks
Represented By: Timothy P. Lupardus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?