State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company v. Allegheny Medical Services et al
Plaintiff: State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Deborah Dunkley, Allegheny Medical Services and J. Jorge A. Gordinho
Case Number: 5:2018cv01421
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene C Berger
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME for Alleghany Medical Services, J. Jorge A. Gordinho to Answer or Otherwise Respond re: #1 Complaint to February 19, 2019 by Allegheny Medical Services, J. Jorge A. Gordinho, State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company (Ritchie, Jonathan) (Modified on 1/3/2019 to add party filer)(ts).
November 13, 2018 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Plaintiff State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company (Nelson, Matthew)
November 13, 2018 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Allegheny Medical Services, J. Jorge A. Gordinho, Deborah Dunkley, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachments: #1 Summons as to J. Jorge A. Gordinho, #2 Summons as to Deborah Dunkley) (btm)
November 13, 2018 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (btm)
November 9, 2018 CASE assigned to Judge Irene C. Berger. (klc)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-6950791. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Part 1, #2 Exhibit A - Part 2, #3 Exhibit A - Part 3, #4 Exhibit A - Part 4, #5 Exhibit A - Part 5, #6 Exhibit A - Part 6, #7 Exhibit B, #8 Exhibit C, #9 Exhibit D, #10 Proposed Summons - Allegheny Medical Services, #11 Proposed Summons - J. Jorge A. Gordinho, #12 Proposed Summons - Deborah Dunkley, #13 Civil Cover Sheet) (btm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company v. Allegheny Medical Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Dunkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allegheny Medical Services
Represented By: Jonathan Zak Ritchie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Jorge A. Gordinho
Represented By: Jonathan Zak Ritchie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: David A. Bosak
Represented By: Matthew A. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?