Tolentino v. Raleigh General Hospital et al
Plaintiff: Philip Tolentino
Defendant: Conexus Medstaff, LLC and Raleigh General Hospital
Case Number: 5:2018cv01425
Filed: November 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene C Berger
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Raleigh General Hospital for Defendant Raleigh General Hospital, LLCs Response to Requests for Admissions and Defendant Raleigh General Hospital, LLCs Response to Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents. (Dean, Mark)
January 10, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Conexus Medstaff, LLC for Objections, Responses and Answers to Plaintiff's First Set of Combined Discovery Requests. (Burrus, Maigreade)
December 21, 2018 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Conexus Medstaff, LLC for First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff. (Burrus, Maigreade)
December 21, 2018 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Conexus Medstaff, LLC for First Interrogatories to Plaintiff. (Burrus, Maigreade)
December 21, 2018 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Raleigh General Hospital for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Dean, Mark)
December 21, 2018 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Conexus Medstaff, LLC for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Burrus, Maigreade)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Cancelling the Scheduling Conference previously scheduled for 1/9/2019; directing that this case shall proceed as follows: Joinder of Parties, amended pleadings due by 3/29/2019. Discovery requests to be completed by 7/5/2019, and all depositions by 8/30/2019. Expert Witness List by parties bearing the burden of proof due by 4/5/2019, by party not bearing burden of proof due by 5/10/2019, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due by 6/5/2019. Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 9/27/2019. Motions in Limine to be filed by 11/15/2019, with responses due by 11/22/2019. Proposed Jury Charges due by 1/6/2020. Plaintiffs portion of proposed Pretrial Order to defendants due by 12/31/2019. Proposed integrated pretrial order due by 1/7/2020. Pretrial Conference/Final Settlement Conference at 9:00 AM on 1/16/2020 in Beckley. Jury Trial set for 1/27/2020 at 9:00 AM in Beckley before Judge Irene C. Berger. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 12/18/2018. (cc:attys; any unrepresented party) (btm)
December 17, 2018 Filing 13 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by Conexus Medstaff, LLC, Raleigh General Hospital, Philip Tolentino. (Burrus, Maigreade) (Modified on 12/18/2018 to add party filers) (ts).
December 6, 2018 Filing 12 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Frederick L. Conrad III on behalf of Raleigh General Hospital. Local counsel: Bryan R. Cokeley. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-6986839. (Dean, Mark)
December 6, 2018 Filing 11 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Mark W. Peters on behalf of Raleigh General Hospital. Local counsel: Bryan R. Cokeley. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-6986813. (Dean, Mark)
November 30, 2018 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Philip Tolentino for First Set of Combined Discovery Requests to Defendant Raleigh General Hospital (Kolenich, Karl)
November 30, 2018 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Philip Tolentino for First Set of Combined Discovery Requests to Defendant Conexus Medstaff, LLC. (Kolenich, Karl)
November 28, 2018 Filing 8 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY by Jacob Lewis on behalf of Conexus Medstaff, LLC. Local counsel: Maigreade B. Burrus. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-6975459. (Burrus, Maigreade)
November 20, 2018 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Raleigh General Hospital (Dean, Mark)
November 20, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Raleigh General Hospital.(Dean, Mark)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 12/5/2018. Rule 26(f) Meeting 12/12/2018. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 12/19/2018. Scheduling Conference at 2:00 PM on 1/9/2019 in Beckley. Entry of Scheduling Order 1/16/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 1/23/2019. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 11/16/2018. (cc:attys; any unrepresented party) (btm)
November 15, 2018 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (btm)
November 14, 2018 CASE assigned to Judge Irene C. Berger. (ts)
November 14, 2018 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Conexus Medstaff, LLC (btm)
November 14, 2018 Filing 2 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Conexus Medstaff, LLC. (btm)
November 14, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Conexus Medstaff, LLC with summons, complaint, docket sheet and other miscellaneous documents from Circuit Court of Raleigh County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-6957323. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (btm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tolentino v. Raleigh General Hospital et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Tolentino
Represented By: Karl Joseph Kolenich
Represented By: Erika Klie Kolenich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conexus Medstaff, LLC
Represented By: Maigreade Bridget Burrus
Represented By: Jacob A. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raleigh General Hospital
Represented By: Bryan R. Cokeley
Represented By: Mark C. Dean
Represented By: Mark W. Peters
Represented By: Frederick L. Conrad, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?