Mathis v. Wasylyk et al

Plaintiff: Roland Mathis
Defendant: Dr. Irene Wasylyk, M.D., Garland R. Ward, PA-C and ARH Appalachian Regional Health Care Hospital
Case Number: 5:2018cv01487
Filed: December 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Omar J Aboulhosn
Referring Judge: Irene C Berger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Filing 5 MAIL RETURNED AS UNDELIVERABLE. Document showing proof of filing requested by Plaintiff sent to Roland Mathis at FCI Beckley, Box 350 Federal Prison Camp, Beaver, WV 25813, via postage stamped envelope provided by Plaintiff. Mail resent to Roland Mathis at FCI Beckley, P. O. Box 350, Beaver, WV 25813. (btm)
December 26, 2018 Filing 4 APPLICATION by Roland Mathis to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees and Costs. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn. (btm)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Directing that Plaintiff shall either pay the filing and administrative fee totaling $400 or file an Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by 1/4/2019; advising Plaintiff that failure to either pay the filing and administrative fee or file an Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by 1/4/2019, will result in a recommendation of dismissal of this matter without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Rule 41.1 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for the Southern District of West Virginia. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 12/4/2018. (cc: Plaintiff - pro se with blank Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis) (btm)
December 3, 2018 CASE assigned to Judge Irene C. Berger. (klc)
December 3, 2018 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (msa)
December 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter and Envelope) (msa). Modified on 12/3/2018 (msa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mathis v. Wasylyk et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Irene Wasylyk, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garland R. Ward, PA-C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARH Appalachian Regional Health Care Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roland Mathis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?