Shelton v. Russell et al

Plaintiff: Sheila Lynn Shelton
Defendant: Landstar Ranger, Inc., Jeffrey P. Russell, Landstar System Holdings, Inc., Landstar Global Logistics, Inc., Landstar Inway, Inc. and Landstar Express America, Inc.
Interested Party: Erie Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2018cv01492
Filed: December 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene C Berger
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #13 Rule 26(f) Report of Planning Meeting by Landstar Express America, Inc., Landstar Global Logistics, Inc., Landstar Inway, Inc., Landstar Ranger, Inc., Landstar System Holdings, Inc., Jeffrey P. Russell, Erie Insurance Company, Sheila Lynn Shelton. ERROR: Image did not contain signature of counsel. CORRECTION: Image replaced. (ts)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Cancelling the Scheduling Conference previously scheduled for 1/30/2019; directing that this case shall proceed as follows: Joinder of Parties, amended pleadings due by 2/28/2019. Discovery requests to be completed by 7/1/2019, and all depositions by 11/15/2019. Expert Witness List by parties bearing the burden of proof due by 8/7/2019, by party not bearing burden of proof due by 9/24/2019, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due by 10/15/2019. Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 12/20/2019. Motions in Limine to be filed by 2/28/2020, with responses due by 3/6/2020. Proposed Jury Charges due by 4/6/2020. Plaintiffs portion of proposed Pretrial Order to defendants due by 4/1/2020. Proposed integrated pretrial order due by 4/8/2020. Pretrial Conference/Final Settlement Conference at 1:30 PM on 4/15/2020 in Beckley. Jury Trial set for 4/27/2020 at 9:00 AM in Beckley before Judge Irene C. Berger. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 1/17/2019. (cc:attys; any unrepresented party) (btm)
January 16, 2019 Filing 13 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by Landstar Express America, Inc., Landstar Global Logistics, Inc., Landstar Inway, Inc., Landstar Ranger, Inc., Landstar System Holdings, Inc., Jeffrey P. Russell, Erie Insurance Company, Sheila Lynn Shelton. (Gandee, Stephen) (Modified on 1/17/2019 to add party filers) (ts) (Modified on 1/25/2019 to replace image not signed by counsel)(ts).
December 11, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kermit J. Moore on behalf of Erie Insurance Company. (Moore, Kermit)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 1/2/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 1/9/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 1/16/2019. Scheduling Conference at 1:00 PM on 1/30/2019 in Beckley. Entry of Scheduling Order 2/6/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 2/13/2019. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 12/11/2018. (cc:attys; any unrepresented party) (btm)
December 6, 2018 Filing 10 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (btm)
December 5, 2018 CASE assigned to Judge Irene C. Berger. (klc)
December 5, 2018 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Landstar System Holdings, Inc. (btm)
December 5, 2018 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Landstar Global Logistics, Inc. (btm)
December 5, 2018 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Landstar Express America, Inc. (btm)
December 5, 2018 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Landstar Ranger, Inc. (btm)
December 5, 2018 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Landstar Inway, Inc. (btm)
December 5, 2018 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Landstar Ranger, Inc., Landstar Express America, Inc., Landstar Global Logistics, Inc., Landstar System Holdings, Inc. in support of #3 MOTION by Landstar Ranger, Inc., Landstar Express America, Inc., Landstar Global Logistics, Inc., Landstar System Holdings, Inc. to Dismiss re: Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit D) (btm)
December 5, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION by Landstar Ranger, Inc., Landstar Express America, Inc., Landstar Global Logistics, Inc., Landstar System Holdings, Inc. to Dismiss re: Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn. (btm)
December 5, 2018 Filing 2 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Jeffrey P. Russell and Landstar Inway, Inc. (btm)
December 5, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jeffrey P. Russell, Landstar Inway, Inc., Landstar Ranger, Inc., Landstar Express America, Inc., Landstar Global Logistics, Inc., Landstar System Holdings, Inc. with summons, complaint, docket sheet and other miscellaneous documents from Circuit Court of Wyoming County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-6984842. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (State Court Documents), #2 Exhibit B (State Court Docket Sheet), #3 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (btm) (Modified on 12/6/2018 to correct file date)(slr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shelton v. Russell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landstar Ranger, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen F. Gandee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey P. Russell
Represented By: Stephen F. Gandee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landstar System Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen F. Gandee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landstar Global Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen F. Gandee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landstar Inway, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen F. Gandee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landstar Express America, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen F. Gandee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Lynn Shelton
Represented By: Robert D. Cline, Jr.
Represented By: Brian E. Bigelow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Erie Insurance Company
Represented By: Kermit J. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?