Murphy et al v. Butler et al

Plaintiff: Phyllis Murphy and the Estate of Michael Murphy
Defendant: Rose Mary Brown and Karen Ann Butler
Undetermined: Nationwide Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 5:2019cv00049
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene C Berger
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Cancelling the Scheduling Conference previously scheduled for 03/06/2019. Joinder of Parties, amended pleadings due by 4/5/2019. Discovery requests to be completed by 8/8/2019, and all depositions by 10/2/2019. Expert Witness List by parties bearing the burden of proof due by 8/1/2019, by party not bearing burden of proof due by 8/30/2019, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due by 9/25/2019. Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 10/22/2019. Motions in Limine to be filed by 12/6/2019, with responses due by 12/13/2019. Proposed Jury Charges due by 1/6/2020. Plaintiffs' portion of proposed Pretrial Order to defendants due by 1/8/2020. Proposed integrated pretrial order due by 1/15/2020. Pretrial Conference/Final Settlement Conference at 11:00 AM on 1/22/2020 in Beckley. Jury Trial set for 1/27/2020 at 09:00 AM in Beckley before Judge Irene C. Berger. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 2/20/2019. (cc:attys; any unrepresented party) (msa) (Modified on 2/21/2019 to correct discovery deadline)(slr).
February 14, 2019 Filing 14 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by Rose Mary Brown, Karen Ann Butler, Phyllis Murphy, Michael Murphy, Nationwide Insurance Company of America. (Garren, Mark) (Modified on 2/15/2019 to add party filers) (ts).
February 12, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER TO #8 Counterclaim by Phyllis Murphy(Individually and in her capacity as the Executrix of).(Murphy, Glen)
February 12, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER TO #7 Counterclaim by Phyllis Murphy(Individually and in her capacity as the Executrix of).(Murphy, Glen)
February 11, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Don C. A. Parker, Glen A. Murphy on behalf of Phyllis Murphy(Individually and in her capacity as the Executrix of). (Murphy, Glen)
February 4, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME for Phyllis Murphy to Answer #7 and #8 Counterclaims to February 14, 2019 by Phyllis Murphy, Michael Murphy, Rose Mary Brown, Karen Ann Butler, Nationwide Insurance Company of America (Anderson, Clayton) (Modified on 2/5/2019 to add link to #7, 8 counterclaims and to add party filers) (ts).
February 4, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Clayton G. Anderson on behalf of Phyllis Murphy. (Anderson, Clayton)
January 23, 2019 Filing 8 FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to #4 Answer to Complaint and Counterclaim by Rose Mary Brown and COUNTERCLAIM by Defendant Rose Mary Brown against Plaintiff Phyllis Murphy (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Garren, Mark)
January 23, 2019 Filing 7 FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to #5 Answer to Complaint and Counterclaim by Karen Ann Butler and COUNTERCLAIM by Defendant Karen Ann Butler against Plaintiff Phyllis Murphy (Individually and in her capacity as the Executrix of) (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Garren, Mark)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 2/6/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 2/13/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 2/20/2019. Scheduling Conference at 3:30 PM on 3/6/2019 in Beckley. Entry of Scheduling Order 3/13/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 3/20/2019. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 1/22/2019. (cc:attys; any unrepresented party) (slr)
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT Attached to #1 Notice of Removal by Karen Ann Butler and COUNTERCLAIM by Defendant Karen Ann Butler against Plaintiff Phyllis Murphy. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Garren, Mark) (Modified on 1/20/2019 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (ts).
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT Attached to #1 Notice of Removal With Jury Demand by Rose Mary Brown and COUNTERCLAIM by Defendant Rose Mary Brown against Plaintiff Phyllis Murphy. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Garren, Mark) (Modified on 1/20/2019 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (ts).
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORDS from the Circuit Court of Greenbrier County. Includes: Supplement to Exhibit A attached to Notice of Removal (Garren, Mark)
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (msa)
January 16, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Irene C. Berger. (klc)
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Rose Mary Brown, Karen Ann Butler with summons, complaint, docket sheet and other miscellaneous documents from Circuit Court of Greenbrier County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7027951. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (msa) (Modified on 1/17/2019 to remove and replace incorrect image of main document) (slr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murphy et al v. Butler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rose Mary Brown
Represented By: Mark L. Garren
Represented By: Christen Marie Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Ann Butler
Represented By: Mark L. Garren
Represented By: Christen Marie Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis Murphy
Represented By: Kimberly K. Parmer
Represented By: Marvin W. Masters
Represented By: Clayton G. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: the Estate of Michael Murphy
Represented By: Kimberly K. Parmer
Represented By: Marvin W. Masters
Represented By: Clayton G. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Nationwide Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Teresa Darlene Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?