Gutierrez et al v. Horton et al
Plaintiff: Bonnie Valigura and Andrew Gutierrez
Defendant: Each Unnamed Wrongdoer (1-99), Kim Pauley, William F. Richmond, Jr., Kelly Estep, Tiffani Dixon, Patrick Morrisey, Harry L. Kirkpatrick, III, Amber Warden, Mike Horton, All Principals and/or Agents of DHHR DFCS CPS, Coleen Brown-Bailey, Jim Justice, Kristen L. Keller and West Virginia Department of Health and Human Resources
Case Number: 5:2019cv00369
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Omar J Aboulhosn
Referring Judge: Irene C Berger
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 22 TRANSMITTED CERTIFIED COPY of #20 Memorandum Opinion and Order and #21 Judgment Order to attorneys and any unrepresented party. (Attachments: #1 Judgment Order) (btm)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 JUDGMENT ORDER DISMISSING this case and STRIKING it from the docket of this Court in accordance with the #20 Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 7/3/2019. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (btm)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER OVERRULING the Plaintiff's #8 Objections; ADOPTING the Magistrate Judge's #7 Proposed Findings and Recommendation; DISMISSING the Plaintiff's #3 and #4 Complaint ; TERMINATING AS MOOT all pending motions and REMOVING this matter from the Court's docket. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 7/3/2019. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (btm)
June 24, 2019 Filing 19 LETTER to Magistrate Judge Eifert, from Andrew Gutierrez and Bonnie Valigura dated 6/13/2019. (slr)
June 24, 2019 Filing 18 LETTER to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn, from Andrew Gutierrez and Bonnie Valigura dated 6/13/2019. (slr)
June 17, 2019 Filing 17 LETTER to Judge Berger, from Andrew Gutierrez and Bonnie Valigura dated 6/13/2019. (slr)
June 17, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION by Andrew Gutierrez, Bonnie Valigura to Stay and MOTION by Andrew Gutierrez, Bonnie Valigura to Seal Case Until Further Notice. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn. (slr)
June 10, 2019 Filing 15 EXHIBIT 1 by Andrew Gutierrez and Bonnie Valigura. (slr)
June 10, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by Andrew Gutierrez and Bonnie Valigura (slr)
June 3, 2019 Filing 13 SEALED MATERIALS pursuant to Court Order. Plaintiffs' Exhibit in Support of Proposed Amended Complaint filed under seal pursuant to the Court's Order entered 6/3/2019. (slr)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Directing the Clerk to file Plaintiffs' Exhibit in Support of Amended Complaint, which is photographs of minor children, under SEAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 6/3/2019. (cc: Plaintiffs, pro se; counsel of record) (slr)
June 3, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Andrew Gutierrez, Bonnie Valigura. (slr)
June 3, 2019 Filing 10 PROPOSED AMENDED COMPLAINT by Andrew Gutierrez and Bonnie Valigura (slr)
June 3, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE/MOTION by Andrew Gutierrez, Bonnie Valigura to Amend #3 Claim. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn. (slr)
June 3, 2019 Filing 8 OBJECTIONS to #7 Proposed Findings and Recommendations by Magistrate Judge, by Andrew Gutierrez, Bonnie Valigura, entitled "Notice." (slr)
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION: Recommending that the District Court DENY Plaintiff's #1 APPLICATION to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees or Costs, DISMISS Plaintiff's #3 , 4 Complaint and remove this matter from the Court's docket. This case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn. Objections to Proposed F&R due by 6/6/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 5/20/2019. (cc: pro se Plaintiff) (msa)
May 10, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Irene C. Berger. (klc)
May 10, 2019 Filing 6 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (msa)
May 10, 2019 Filing 5 SEALED EXHIBIT filed by Andrew Gutierrez, Bonnie Valigura: Filed Under SEAL pursuant to Court Order. (msa)
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT filed by Andrew Gutierrez, Bonnie Valigura: Filed Under SEAL pursuant to Court Order. (msa)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 REDACTED COMPLAINT: Filed pursuant to Court Order. (Attachments: #1 Cover Page) (msa)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: Directing that the Clerk file Plaintiffs' original Complaint under SEAL and to file the redacted copy of the Complaint for public access; further directing that Plaintiffs' Exhibit in Support shall be filed under SEAL; instructing Plaintiffs to redact or use only initials of the minor children in future filings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 5/10/2019. (cc: Pro Se Plaintiffs, counsel of record) (msa)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION by Andrew Gutierrez, Bonnie Valigura to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn. (msa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gutierrez et al v. Horton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Each Unnamed Wrongdoer (1-99)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Pauley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William F. Richmond, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Estep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffani Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Morrisey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry L. Kirkpatrick, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amber Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Principals and/or Agents of DHHR DFCS CPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coleen Brown-Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristen L. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Virginia Department of Health and Human Resources
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Valigura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?