Walton v. Young
Plaintiff: Delmar Walton
Defendant: D. L. Young
Case Number: 5:2019cv00374
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Omar J Aboulhosn
Referring Judge: Irene C Berger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 TRANSMITTED CERTIFIED COPY of #5 Memorandum Opinion and Order and #6 Judgment Order to attorneys, any unrepresented party and Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn. (Attachments: #1 Judgment Order) (btm)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 JUDGMENT ORDER DISMISSING this case and STRIKING it from the docket of this Court in accordance with the #5 Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 7/9/2019. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (btm)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER ADOPTING the #4 Proposed Findings and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge, DISMISSING the Plaintiff's #1 Complaint/Motion and REMOVING this matter from the Court's docket. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 7/9/2019. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party; Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn) (btm)
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that the District Court DISMISS Plaintiff's #1 Complaint/Motion and remove this matter from the Court's docket. This case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn. Objections to Proposed F&R due by 6/28/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 6/11/2019. (cc: Plaintiff, pro se) (slr)
May 13, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Irene C. Berger. (ts)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (msa)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in support of #1 Combined Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Delmar Walton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (msa)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, titled by Plaintiff as "Declaration in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and a Preliminary Injunction." (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Envelope) (msa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walton v. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delmar Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. L. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?