Hamner v. Southern Regional Jail et al

Plaintiff: Barry N. Hamner
Defendant: West Virginia Division of Correction and Rehabilitation, Mike Francis, Prime Care Medical Inc, Southern Regional Jail and Ms Britney Foster
Case Number: 5:2019cv00376
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Omar J Aboulhosn
Referring Judge: Irene C Berger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 MAIL RETURNED AS UNDELIVERABLE: #4 Order with blank complaint and Pro Se Handbook sent to Barry N. Hamner at Southern Regional Jail, 1200 Airport Road, Beaver, WV 25813. Mail not resent to Barry N. Hamner - no current address available. (msa)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Directing that Plaintiff has until 6/17/2019 to file an Amended Complaint naming "persons" as defendants, specifically setting forth his constitutional claims, and stating specific facts as to how each defendant violated his constitutional rights. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 5/15/2019. (cc: Plaintiff - Pro Se w/ form Complaint and Pro Se Handbook) (btm)
May 13, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Irene C. Berger. (ts)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (msa)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT. (msa)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION by Barry N. Hamner to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees or Costs Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn. (msa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamner v. Southern Regional Jail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Virginia Division of Correction and Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prime Care Medical Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Regional Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms Britney Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry N. Hamner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?