Patterson v. Young

Plaintiff: Kevin Patterson
Defendant: D. L. Young
Case Number: 5:2019cv00384
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Omar J Aboulhosn
Referring Judge: Irene C Berger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 TRANSMITTED CERTIFIED COPY of #5 Memorandum Opinion and Order and #6 Judgment Order to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn, attorneys and any unrepresented party. (Attachment: #1 Certified Judgment Order) (slr)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 JUDGMENT ORDER directing that this case be DISMISSED and STRICKEN from the docket of this Court, in accordance with the #5 Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 7/9/2019. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (slr)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing that the #4 Proposed Findings and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge be ADOPTED, Plaintiff's #1 Complaint/Motion be DISMISSED and this matter REMOVED from the Court's docket. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 7/9/2019. (cc: Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn; attys; any unrepresented party) (slr)
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that the District Court DISMISS Plaintiff's #1 Complaint/Motion and remove this matter from the Court's docket. This case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn. Objections to Proposed F&R due by 6/28/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 6/11/2019. (cc: Plaintiff, pro se) (slr)
May 15, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Irene C. Berger. (klc)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (btm)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Kevin Patterson in support of #1 Combined Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (btm)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, entitled by Plaintiff as "Declaration in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and a Preliminary Injunction." (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Envelope) (btm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patterson v. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. L. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?