Walker v. Amerihost Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Yolonda Denise Walker
Defendant: Wright Management, LLC, United States Department of Housing and Urban Development, Amerihost Services, LLC and United States
Case Number: 5:2019cv00425
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene C Berger
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER directing that the #11 MOTION by United States Department of Housing and Urban Development to Substitute the United States as the Proper Party in Its Place be GRANTED and that the United States be substituted in place of the Department of Housing Urban Development as a Defendant in this matter; further directing that the #4 MOTION by United States of America to Strike Plaintiff's Demand for A Jury Trial be GRANTED and that the jury demand be STRICKEN as to the United States. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 7/15/2019. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (msa)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER: CANCELLING the Scheduling Conference previously scheduled for 7/24/2019; directing that this case shall proceed as follows: Joinder of Parties, amended pleadings due by 7/29/2019. Discovery requests to be completed by 12/3/2019, and all depositions by 2/11/2020. Expert Witness List by parties bearing the burden of proof due by 11/18/2019, by party not bearing burden of proof due by 12/18/2019, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due by 1/3/2020. Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 3/20/2020. Motions in Limine to be filed by 4/17/2020, with responses due by 4/24/2020. Proposed Voir Dire, Jury Instructions, and Verdict Form due by 5/22/2020. Plaintiff's portion of proposed Pretrial Order to defendants due by 5/27/2020. Proposed integrated pretrial order due by 6/3/2020. Pretrial Conference/Final Settlement Conference at 9:00 AM on 6/10/2020 in Beckley. Jury Trial set for 6/15/2020 at 9:00 AM in Beckley before Judge Irene C. Berger. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 7/15/2019. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (btm)
July 10, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of Count I Only in Cross-claim Against Amerihost Services, LLC With Prejudice by Wright Management, LLC pursuant to Rule 41, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Tyree, Unaiza)
July 10, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE by Wright Management, LLC in opposition to #16 MOTION by Amerihost Services, LLC to Dismiss #9 Crossclaim (Tyree, Unaiza) (Modified on 7/11/2019 to remove link to #17 memorandum in support) (ts).
July 10, 2019 Filing 19 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by United States Department of Housing and Urban Development, Amerihost Services, LLC, Wright Management, LLC, Yolonda Denise Walker. (Westfall, Fred) (Modified on 7/10/2019 to add party filers)(ts).
July 1, 2019 Filing 18 SUPPLEMENTAL EXHIBIT 1 by United States Department of Housing and Urban Development in support of #15 Reply to Response. (Bailey, Jason)
June 26, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Amerihost Services, LLC in support of #16 MOTION by Amerihost Services, LLC to Dismiss 9 Crossclaim. (Biser, Rita)
June 26, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION by Amerihost Services, LLC to Dismiss #9 Crossclaim (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1 - Property Management Agreement)(Biser, Rita) (Modified on 7/2/2019 to add link to #9 crossclaim)(ts).
June 21, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY MEMORANDUM by United States Department of Housing and Urban Development to #14 Response In Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Bailey, Jason)
June 17, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE by Yolonda Denise Walker in opposition to #6 MOTION by United States Department of Housing and Urban Development to Dismiss Complaint (Dunlap, Robert)
June 13, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY INFORMATION by Unaiza Riaz Tyree updating name and/or firm information on behalf of Wright Management, LLC. (Tyree, Unaiza)
June 10, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM by United States Department of Housing and Urban Development in support of #11 MOTION by United States Department of Housing and Urban Development to Substitute Party (Westfall, Fred)
June 10, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION by United States Department of Housing and Urban Development to Substitute Party (Westfall, Fred)
June 10, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United States Department of Housing and Urban Development.(Westfall, Fred) (Modified on 6/11/2019 to add link to #1 Notice of Removal)(ts).
June 7, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wright Management, LLC and CROSSCLAIM by Defendant Wright Management, LLC against Defendant Amerihost Services, LLC .(Adkins, J.) (Modified on 6/10/2019 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (ts).
June 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by J. Mark Adkins and Unaiza Riaz on behalf of Wright Management, LLC. (Adkins, J.)
June 4, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United States Department of Housing and Urban Development with summons, complaint, docket sheet and other miscellaneous documents from Circuit Court of Raleigh County. ERROR: State Court document inadvertently omitted from original filing. CORRECTION: Added attachment #5, Answer of Amerihost Services, LLC, to Notice of Removal entry. (slr)
June 4, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM by United States Department of Housing and Urban Development in support of #6 MOTION by United States Department of Housing and Urban Development to Dismiss Complaint. (Bailey, Jason)
June 4, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION by United States Department of Housing and Urban Development to Dismiss Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal. (Bailey, Jason) (Modified on 6/4/2019 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (ts).
June 4, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM by United States Department of Housing and Urban Development in support of #4 MOTION by United States Department of Housing and Urban Development to Strike Demand for A Jury Trial (Bailey, Jason)
June 4, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION by United States Department of Housing and Urban Development to Strike Demand for A Jury Trial (Bailey, Jason)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 6/24/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 7/3/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 7/10/2019. Scheduling Conference at 2:00 PM on 7/24/2019 in Beckley. Entry of Scheduling Order 7/31/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 8/7/2019. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 6/4/2019. (cc:attys; any unrepresented party) (btm)
June 3, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Irene C. Berger. (klc)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (btm)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United States Department of Housing and Urban Development with summons, amended complaint, docket sheet and other miscellaneous documents from Circuit Court of Raleigh County. (Attachments: #1 State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Docket Sheet, #3 Certification, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Answer to Amended Complaint) (btm) (Modified on 6/4/2019 to add Answer of Amerihost Services, LLC)(slr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Amerihost Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolonda Denise Walker
Represented By: Robert Dunlap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright Management, LLC
Represented By: Unaiza Riaz Tyree
Represented By: J. Mark Adkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Housing and Urban Development
Represented By: Jason Bailey
Represented By: Fred B. Westfall, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerihost Services, LLC
Represented By: Lynnette S. Marshall
Represented By: Rita Massie Biser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Represented By: Jason Bailey
Represented By: Fred B. Westfall, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?