Wood v. Workman
Plaintiff: Michael Alan Wood
Defendant: Brandon Workman
Case Number: 5:2019cv00437
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Omar J Aboulhosn
Referring Judge: Irene C Berger
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER directing that Plaintiff show cause in writing by 7/23/2019 as to why this civil action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 7/16/2019. (cc: Plaintiff - pro se; counsel of record) (btm)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER directing that the Scheduling Conference previously scheduled for 7/24/2019, is CANCELLED and that this case shall proceed as follows: Joinder of Parties, amended pleadings due by 8/30/2019. Discovery requests to be completed by 1/17/2020, and all depositions by 3/13/2020. Expert Witness List by parties bearing the burden of proof due by 1/2/2020, by party not bearing burden of proof due by 2/3/2020, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due by 2/17/2020. Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 4/10/2020. Motions in Limine to be filed by 5/8/2020, with responses due by 5/15/2020. Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law due by 7/6/2020. Plaintiff's portion of proposed Pretrial Order to defendants due by 6/24/2020. Proposed integrated pretrial order due by 7/1/2020. Pretrial Conference/Final Settlement Conference at 1:30 PM on 7/15/2020 in Beckley. Bench Trial set for 6/27/2020 at 9:00 AM in Beckley before Judge Irene C. Berger. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 7/11/2019. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (msa)
July 10, 2019 Filing 12 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by Brandon Workman. (Mankins, Jennifer)
June 20, 2019 Filing 11 DOCKET SHEET and COURT RECORDS from Raleigh County Magistrate Court. (slr)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DENYING Defendant United States of America's #9 MOTION to Stay Deadlines in #5 Order and Notice. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 6/12/2019. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (btm)
June 11, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION by Brandon Workman to Stay Deadlines re: #5 Order and Notice. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn.(Mankins, Jennifer)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing Plaintiff to file any Response to the #3 MOTION by Brandon Workman to Substitute Party, and #6 MOTION by Brandon Workman to Dismiss Without Prejudice by 7/8/2019; advising Plaintiff that a failure to respond to Defendant's Motions may result in a recommendation of denial of the relief sought in the Complaint and dismissal of this suit; directing that Defendant have 7 business days following service of the response within which to file a reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 6/10/2019. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (slr)
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM by Brandon Workman in support of #6 MOTION by Brandon Workman to Dismiss Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal. (Mankins, Jennifer)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION by Brandon Workman to Dismiss Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn.(Mankins, Jennifer) (Modified on 6/10/2019 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (ts).
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 6/27/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 7/3/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 7/10/2019. Scheduling Conference at 3:00 PM on 7/24/2019 in Beckley. Entry of Scheduling Order 7/31/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 8/7/2019. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 6/7/2019. (cc:attys; any unrepresented party) (btm) (Modified on 6/11/2019 to correct signature date)(slr).
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM by Brandon Workman in support of #3 MOTION by Brandon Workman to Dismiss Brandon Workman, D.O. From This Civil Action and to Substitute Party (Mankins, Jennifer)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION by Brandon Workman to Dismiss Brandon Workman, D.O. From This Civil Action and to Substitute Party. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn.(Mankins, Jennifer)
June 7, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Irene C. Berger. (klc)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (slr) (Modified on 6/10/2019 to correct referral type)(slr).
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Brandon Workman with summons and complaint from Raleigh County Magistrate Court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Summons and Complaint from Raleigh County Magistrate Court, #2 Exhibit 2 Declaration of Meredith Torres, #3 Exhibit 3 Certification of U S. Attorney, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (slr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wood v. Workman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Workman
Represented By: Jennifer M. Mankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Alan Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?