O'Boyle v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Sheila O'Boyle and Martin O'Boyle
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 5:2019cv00445
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene C Berger
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 18 STIPULATED MOTION by Martin O'Boyle to Vacate and Reset Scheduling Conference or in the Alternative MOTION to Appear by Phone re: #12 Order and Notice (Frank, Robert) (Modified on 8/7/2019 to add second motion event) (ts).
August 5, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE by Martin O'Boyle in opposition to #10 MOTION by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company to Strike Allegations from the #1 Complaint. (Frank, Robert) (Modified on 8/5/2019 to correct link) (kew).
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER directing that the #14 JOINT MOTION to Separate and Stay Certain Claims be GRANTED, that the Second, Third, and Fourth claims for relief contained in the #1 Complaint be BIFURCATED from the First claim and STAYED pending resolution of the declaratory judgment action; further directing that Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company's #8 MOTION for Partial Dismissal, the #13 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to File a Response to Defendant's Motion for Partial Dismissal and the #15 Proposed Order Re: Joint Motion to Separate and Stay Certain Claims be TERMINATED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 8/2/2019. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (msa)
August 2, 2019 Filing 15 PROPOSED ORDER Joint Motion to Separate and Stay Certain Claims by Martin O'Boyle (Frank, Robert)
August 2, 2019 Filing 14 JOINT MOTION by Martin O'Boyle, Sheila O'Boyle, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company to Separate and Stay Certain Claims (Frank, Robert) (Modified to add party filers and correct relief code)(slr).
August 2, 2019 Filing 13 JOINT MOTION by Martin O'Boyle, Sheila O'Boyle, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to File a Response to Defendant's #8 Motion for Partial Dismissal (Frank, Robert) (Modified to add party filers and to add link to #8)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 8/12/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 8/22/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 8/29/2019. Scheduling Conference at 3:00 PM on 9/12/2019 in Beckley. Entry of Scheduling Order 9/19/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 9/26/2019. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 7/23/2019. (cc:attys; any unrepresented party) (btm)
July 22, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company in support of #10 MOTION by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company to Strike Allegations from the #1 Complaint (Shaffer, Carl)
July 22, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company to Strike Allegations from the #1 Complaint (Shaffer, Carl)
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company in support of #8 MOTION by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company fo Partial Dismissal of the #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Shaffer, Carl)
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company fo Partial Dismissal of the #1 Complaint. (Shaffer, Carl)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Shaffer, Carl)
July 5, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Personal Service for State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company served on 7/1/2019; answer due 7/22/2019. Summons served on Mr. Holroyd. (slr)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (btm)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Martin O'Boyle, Sheila O'Boyle for State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Frank, Robert)
June 11, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Irene C. Berger. (klc)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (slr)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (slr)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7277163. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (slr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Boyle v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila O'Boyle
Represented By: Robert J. Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin O'Boyle
Represented By: Robert J. Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Sabrena Olive Gillis
Represented By: Charles S. Piccirillo
Represented By: Carl W. Shaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?