Umberger v. The CBE Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Christopher L. Umberger
Defendant: The CBE Group, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00457
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Omar J Aboulhosn
Referring Judge: Irene C Berger
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER CANCELLING the Scheduling Conference previously set for 8/8/2019; directing that this case shall proceed as follows: Joinder of Parties, amended pleadings due by 8/29/2019. Discovery requests to be completed by 1/24/2020, and all depositions by 3/20/2020. Expert Witness List by parties bearing the burden of proof due by 12/30/2019, by party not bearing burden of proof due by 1/27/2020, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due by 2/17/2020. Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 4/17/2020. Motions in Limine to be filed by 6/5/2020, with responses due by 6/12/2020. Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law due by 7/6/2020. Plaintiff's portion of proposed Pretrial Order to defendants due by 7/8/2020. Proposed integrated pretrial order due by 7/15/2020. Pretrial Conference/Final Settlement Conference at 1:30 PM on 7/22/2020 in Beckley. Bench Trial set for 7/27/2020 at 9:00 AM in Beckley before Judge Irene C. Berger. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 7/30/2019. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (btm)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 DOCKET SHEET and MAGISTRATE COURT RECORDS from Raleigh County Magistrate Court. (slr)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 7/10/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 7/18/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 7/25/2019. Scheduling Conference at 3:30 PM on 8/8/2019 in Beckley. Entry of Scheduling Order 8/15/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 8/22/2019. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 6/18/2019. (cc:attys; any unrepresented party) (msa)
June 14, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Irene C. Berger. (klc)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (btm)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant The CBE Group, Inc. (btm)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The CBE Group, Inc. with summons and complaint from Magistrate Court of Raleigh County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7283482. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (btm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Umberger v. The CBE Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher L. Umberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The CBE Group, Inc.
Represented By: Albert C. Dunn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?