Saleh v. Young

Petitioner: Mohammed A. Saleh
Respondent: D. Young
Case Number: 5:2019cv00468
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Omar J Aboulhosn
Referring Judge: Irene C Berger
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN RECEIPT CARD received from United States Attorney, signed by V. Dickerson on 7/25/2019, verifying receipt of #6 Order to Show Cause and #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241). (btm)
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN RECEIPT CARD received from D. Young, Warden, signed for on 7/25/2019 by signature illegible, verifying receipt of #6 Order to Show Cause and #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241). (btm)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing that Respondent shall by 8/26/2019, file an Answer to the allegations contained in the Petitioner's Petition and show cause, if any, why the Writ of Habeas Corpus sought by the Petitioner in this case should not be granted; advising that the Petitioner may, if he wishes, file a Reply or Objections to Respondent's Answer by 9/26/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 7/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipts) (cc: Respondent and Office of the United States Attorney with copy of Petitioner's #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 U.S.C. Section 2241 via Cert. Mail, RRR; Petitioner - pro se) (btm)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER to Clerk of the Court, from Mohammed Saleh dated 7/3/2019, re: Filing Fee. (btm)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 Filing Fee: $5.00, Receipt Number 5BECK004657. (btm)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
June 19, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Irene C. Berger. (klc)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE to Petitioner of Failure to Remit Filing Fee with Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs. (msa)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS by Mohammed A. Saleh against D. Young pursuant to Title 28, United States Code, Section 2241. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (msa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saleh v. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: D. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mohammed A. Saleh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?