Vallandingham v. Bob Evans Restaurants LLC Long-Term Disability Plan
Plaintiff: Tom R. Vallandingham
Defendant: Bob Evans Restaurants LLC Long-Term Disability Plan and The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 5:2019cv00535
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene C Berger
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Mychal S. Schulz, Attorney on 08/19/2019. Prudential Insurance Company of America waiver mailed on 8/19/2019, answer due 10/18/2019. (Gould, Terry)
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Tom R. Vallandingham against The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (msa)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY on behalf of Tom R. Vallandingham. Local counsel: Timothy R. Miley. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7357513. (Gould, Terry)
July 22, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Irene C. Berger. (klc)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (btm)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bob Evans Restaurants LLC Long-Term Disability Plan, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (btm)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7326185. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (btm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vallandingham v. Bob Evans Restaurants LLC Long-Term Disability Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Evans Restaurants LLC Long-Term Disability Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom R. Vallandingham
Represented By: Terry Keith Gould
Represented By: Benjamin W. Glass, III
Represented By: Timothy R. Miley
Represented By: Douglas R. Miley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?