T. N. v. John Doe et al
Plaintiff: T. N.
Defendant: John Doe, United PF LOM, LLC, Pla-Fit Franchise, LLC and Planet Fitness, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00558
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene C Berger
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United PF LOM, LLC for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Rhodes, Macel)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: CANCELLING the Scheduling Conference previously scheduled for 9/12/2019; directing that this case shall proceed as follows: Joinder of Parties, amended pleadings due by 11/4/2019. Discovery requests to be completed by 3/6/2020, and all depositions by 5/1/2020. Expert Witness List by parties bearing the burden of proof due by 2/7/2020, by party not bearing burden of proof due by 2/28/2020, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due by 3/20/2020. Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 5/29/2020. Motions in Limine to be filed by 6/12/2020, with responses due by 6/19/2020. Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law due by 7/27/2020. Plaintiffs portion of proposed Pretrial Order to defendants due by 7/29/2020. Proposed integrated pretrial order due by 8/5/2020. Pretrial Conference/Final Settlement Conference at 11:00 AM on 8/12/2020 in Beckley. Bench Trial set for 8/17/2020 at 9:00 AM in Beckley before Judge Irene C. Berger. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 9/4/2019. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (btm)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying the #9 MOTION to Stay. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 8/20/2019. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (slr)
August 13, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #10 Memorandum of Law by T. N. in support of #9 Motion by T. N. to Stay. ERROR: Incomplete image attached. CORRECTION: Image replaced. (ts)
August 13, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM by United PF LOM, LLC in opposition to #7 MOTION by T. N. to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Raleigh County (Rhodes, Macel)
August 12, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by T. N. in support of #9 MOTION by T. N. to Stay (Hewitt, Greg) (Modified on 8/13/2019 to replace image)(ts).
August 12, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION by T. N. to Stay (Hewitt, Greg)
August 9, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by T. N. in support of #7 MOTION by T. N. to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Raleigh County (Hewitt, Greg)
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION by T. N. to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Raleigh County (Hewitt, Greg)
August 7, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #5 Petition by Pla-Fit Franchise, LLC, United PF LOM, LLC to Compel Arbitration. ERROR: Exhibit A contained confidential information. CORRECTION: Image replaced with redacted version. (ts)
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Pla-Fit Franchise, LLC, United PF LOM, LLC in support of #5 MOTION by Pla-Fit Franchise, LLC, United PF LOM, LLC to Compel Arbitration and MOTION to Dismiss Complaint (Rhodes, Macel)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION by Pla-Fit Franchise, LLC, United PF LOM, LLC to Compel Arbitration and MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Rhodes, Macel) (Modified on 8/7/2019 to replace unredacted version of exhibit A, to add motion to dismiss event, and to add link to #1 notice of removal) (ts).
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Macel E. Rhodes on behalf of Pla-Fit Franchise, LLC, Planet Fitness, Inc., United PF LOM, LLC. (Rhodes, Macel)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 8/21/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 8/22/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 8/29/2019. Scheduling Conference at 2:00 PM on 9/12/2019 in Beckley. Entry of Scheduling Order 9/19/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 9/26/2019. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 8/1/2019. (cc:attys; any unrepresented party) (btm)
July 30, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Irene C. Berger. (klc)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (slr)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United PF LOM, LLC with summons, complaint, amended complaint and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Raleigh County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7334729. (Attachments: #1 State Docket Sheet, #2 State Court Documents, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (slr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: T. N. v. John Doe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United PF LOM, LLC
Represented By: Sharon Z. Hall
Represented By: Macel E. Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pla-Fit Franchise, LLC
Represented By: Macel E. Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Planet Fitness, Inc.
Represented By: Macel E. Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T. N.
Represented By: Anthony M. Salvatore
Represented By: Greg A. Hewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?