Mitchell v. Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation
Plaintiff: Elizabeth D. Mitchell and Timmy L. Mitchell
Defendant: Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation
Case Number: 5:2019cv00616
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene C Berger
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL With Prejudice by Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation, Elizabeth Mitchell, and Timmy Mitchell (Griffith, M.) (Modified on 9/18/2019 to add party filers)(slr).
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation (Griffith, M.)
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation in support of #4 MOTION by Continental Motors Services, Inc., Continental Motors, Inc. for Sanctions and Award of Attorney Fees and Costs. (Griffith, M.)
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION by Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation to Dismiss Complaint Attached to #1 Complaint. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Griffith, M.) (Modified on 9/3/2019 to add link to #1 complaint) (ts).
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 9/17/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 9/26/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 10/3/2019. Scheduling Conference at 3:30 PM on 10/17/2019 in Beckley. Entry of Scheduling Order 10/24/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 10/31/2019. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 8/27/2019. (cc:attys; any unrepresented party) (btm)
August 23, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Irene C. Berger. (klc)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (msa)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation with summons, docket sheet and complaint from Circuit Court of Wyoming County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7360770. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Modified text on 8/23/2019) (msa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell v. Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation
Represented By: M. David Griffith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth D. Mitchell
Represented By: David G. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timmy L. Mitchell
Represented By: David G. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?