Ott et al v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Ott and Susan Ott
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00670
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Frank W Volk
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER AND NOTICE: The following dates are hereby fixed as the time by or on which certain events must occur: 12/2/2019 - Rule 12(b) Motions. 12/16/2019 - Last day for Rule 26(f) Meeting. 12/23/2019 - Last day to file Report of Parties' Planning Meeting. 12/30/2019 - Telephonic Scheduling Conference at 2:00 PM before Judge Frank W. Volk. 1/6/2020 - Entry of Scheduling Order. 1/13/2020 - Last day to serve Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures. Signed by Judge Frank W. Volk on 11/12/2019. (cc:attys; any unrepresented party) (msa)
November 8, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER TO #3 Amended Complaint by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC and COUNTERCLAIM by Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC against Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Manning, Jason)
October 29, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. For reasons appearing to the court, this action is reassigned from Judge Irene C. Berger to Judge Frank W. Volk. Signed by Clerk of Court Rory L. Perry II on 10/29/2019. (cc: Judge Berger; Judge Volk; counsel of record; unrepresented parties) (klc)
October 25, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT by Jeffrey Ott, Susan Ott amending #1 Complaint against Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A) (lca) (Modified on 11/6/2019 to add link to #1 Complaint)(slr).
September 18, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Irene C. Berger. (klc)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (btm)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7385587. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (btm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ott et al v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Jason E. Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Ott
Represented By: James G. Bordas, Jr.
Represented By: Jason E. Causey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Ott
Represented By: James G. Bordas, Jr.
Represented By: Jason E. Causey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?