Greenbrier Hotel Corporation et al v. Goodman-Gable-Gould/Adjusters International
Plaintiff: Oakhurst Club LLC, Old White Charities, Inc., The Greenbrier Sporting Club, Inc., Greenbrier Hotel Corporation, Greenbrier Sporting Club Developement Company, Inc. and Greenbrier Sporting Club Development Company, Inc.
Defendant: Goodman-Gable-Gould/Adjusters International
Case Number: 5:2019cv00795
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Johnston
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2019 Filing 25 CLERK'S ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. For reasons appearing to the court, this action is reassigned from Judge Frank W. Volk to Judge Thomas E. Johnston. Signed by Clerk of Court Rory L. Perry II on 12/26/2019. (cc: Judge Volk; Judge Johnston; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (klc)
November 12, 2019 CASES ASSOCIATED: Create association to 5:19-cv-00772. (slr)
November 12, 2019 THIS CASE HAS BEEN CONSOLIDATED WITH CIVIL ACTION NO. 5:19-cv-00772 AS OF 11/12/2019. ALL FURTHER ENTRIES SHALL BE DOCKETED IN CIVIL ACTION NO. 5:19-cv-00772. (slr)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER directing that Civil Action No. 5:19-cv-00772 and Civil Action No. 5:19-cv-00795 be consolidated; designating 5:19-cv-00772 as the lead case and directing that the matter proceed under that styling. Signed by Judge Frank W. Volk on 11/12/2019. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (slr)
November 5, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Frank W. Volk. (klc)
November 5, 2019 Filing 23 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (slr)
November 5, 2019 Filing 22 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the Virginia Eastern; Case Number 3:19-cv-00623. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 4, 2019 Case electronically transferred to the Southern District of West Virginia. (sbea, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 11/5/2019.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM ORDER Transferring Case. In the interests of justice and for the convenience of the parties and any witnesses, the Court TRANSFERS this matter to the Southern District of West Virginia pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). See Order for details. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Senior United States District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 10/23/2019. (sbea, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 11/5/2019.]
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING #18 Motion by Greenbrier Hotel Corporation, Greenbrier Sporting Club Development Company, Inc., Oakhurst Club LLC, Old White Charities, Inc. and The Greenbrier Sporting Club, Inc. for the Admission of Danielle Harlan, Esquire Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 10/16/2019. (walk, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 11/5/2019.]
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING #17 Motion by Greenbrier Hotel Corporation, Greenbrier Sporting Club Development Company, Inc., Oakhurst Club LLC, Old White Charities, Inc. and The Greenbrier Sporting Club, Inc. for the Admission of Richard A, Getty, Esquire Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 10/16/2019. (walk, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 11/5/2019.]
October 13, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Danielle Harlan and Certification of Local Counsel Aaron B. Houchens Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6885324 by Greenbrier Hotel Corporation, Greenbrier Sporting Club Development Company, Inc., Oakhurst Club LLC, Old White Charities, Inc., The Greenbrier Sporting Club, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Pro Hac Vice Application)(Houchens, Aaron) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 11/5/2019.]
October 13, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard Getty and Certification of Local Counsel Aaron B. Houchens Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6885320 by Greenbrier Hotel Corporation, Greenbrier Sporting Club Development Company, Inc., Oakhurst Club LLC, Old White Charities, Inc., The Greenbrier Sporting Club, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Pro Hac Vice Application)(Houchens, Aaron) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 11/5/2019.]
October 10, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 First MOTION to Dismiss filed by Goodman-Gable-Gould/Adjusters International. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Robbins, C.) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 11/5/2019.]
October 4, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition to #8 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue filed by Greenbrier Hotel Corporation, Greenbrier Sporting Club Development Company, Inc., Oakhurst Club LLC, Old White Charities, Inc., The Greenbrier Sporting Club, Inc.. (Houchens, Aaron). Modified docket entry on 10/10/2019. (walk, ). [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 11/5/2019.]
September 24, 2019 Filing 14 FINANCIAL INTEREST DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (Local Rule 7.1) by Oakhurst Club LLC. (Houchens, Aaron) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 11/5/2019.]
September 24, 2019 Filing 13 FINANCIAL INTEREST DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (Local Rule 7.1) by Old White Charities, Inc. (Houchens, Aaron) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 11/5/2019.]
September 24, 2019 Filing 12 FINANCIAL INTEREST DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (Local Rule 7.1) by The Greenbrier Sporting Club, Inc. (Houchens, Aaron) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 11/5/2019.]
September 24, 2019 Filing 11 FINANCIAL INTEREST DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (Local Rule 7.1) by Greenbrier Sporting Club Development Company, Inc. (Houchens, Aaron) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 11/5/2019.]
September 24, 2019 Filing 10 FINANCIAL INTEREST DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (Local Rule 7.1) by Greenbrier Hotel Corporation. (Houchens, Aaron) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 11/5/2019.]
September 20, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #8 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(3) and 28 U.S.C. 1406 or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404 filed by Goodman-Gable-Gould/Adjusters International. (Robbins, C.). Modified docket entry on 09/23/2019. (walk, ). [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 11/5/2019.]
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(3) and 28 U.S.C. Section 1406 or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404 by Goodman-Gable-Gould/Adjusters International. (Robbins, C.) Modified docket entry on 09/23/2019. (walk, ).[Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 11/5/2019.]
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 FINANCIAL INTEREST DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Goodman-Gable-Gould/Adjusters International. (Robbins, C.). Corrected docket entry on 09/23/2019 and regenerated NEF. (walk, ). [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 11/5/2019.]
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #5 First MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(3) and 28 USC Section 1406, or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 USC Section 1404 filed by Goodman-Gable-Gould/Adjusters International. (Robbins, C.) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 11/5/2019.]
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(3) and 28 U.S.C. Section 1406 or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404 by Goodman-Gable-Gould/Adjusters International. (Robbins, C.). Modified docket entry on 09/23/2019. (walk, ).[Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 11/5/2019.]
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint with Exhibits and other filings served on C. Thomas Brown on September 3, 2019, filed by Greenbrier Hotel Corporation, Greenbrier Sporting Club Development Company, Inc., Oakhurst Club LLC, Old White Charities, Inc., The Greenbrier Sporting Club, Inc.. (Houchens, Aaron) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 11/5/2019.]
August 28, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Goodman-Gable-Gould/Adjusters International, re: #1 Complaint. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for the Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon the Defendant. Please ask your process server to return the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (walk, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 11/5/2019.]
August 27, 2019 [PLEASE DISREGARD] Notice of Correction re: Document #2 ; the filing user is notified that the document only includes one proposed summons instead of five proposed summonses. (walk, ). NEF regenerated on 08/28/2019. (walk, ). [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 11/5/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Greenbrier Hotel Corporation, Greenbrier Sporting Club Development Company, Inc., Oakhurst Club LLC, Old White Charities, Inc., The Greenbrier Sporting Club, Inc. (Houchens, Aaron)[Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 11/5/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Notice to Counsel for Plaintiffs: The filing user is requested to submit proposed summonses using the filing event, Proposed Summons or, to notify the Clerk's Office by letter using the filing event, Letter, if Waivers of Service of Summons will be mailed to the Defendants. The filing user is further requested to include all of the proposed summonses in one filing instead of 5 separate filings. Plaintiff may contact the Clerks Office if further assistance is needed. (walk, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 11/5/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Henry E. Hudson. (walk, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 11/5/2019.]
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Other Relief filed by Old White Charities, Inc., Greenbrier Hotel Corporation, Greenbrier Sporting Club Development Company, Inc., The Greenbrier Sporting Club, Inc. and Oakhurst Club LLC against Goodman-Gable-Gould/Adjusters International. (Filing Fee Paid: $400.00, Receipt Number: 0422-6804842). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C and #4 Civil Cover Sheet). (Houchens, Aaron). Modified docket entry on 08/26/2019. (walk, ).[Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 11/5/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greenbrier Hotel Corporation et al v. Goodman-Gable-Gould/Adjusters International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oakhurst Club LLC
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Represented By: Danielle Harlan
Represented By: Aaron Houchens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Old White Charities, Inc.
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Represented By: Danielle Harlan
Represented By: Aaron Houchens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Greenbrier Sporting Club, Inc.
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Represented By: Danielle Harlan
Represented By: Aaron Houchens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greenbrier Hotel Corporation
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Represented By: Danielle Harlan
Represented By: Aaron Houchens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greenbrier Sporting Club Developement Company, Inc.
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Represented By: Danielle Harlan
Represented By: Aaron Houchens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greenbrier Sporting Club Development Company, Inc.
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Represented By: Danielle Harlan
Represented By: Aaron Houchens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodman-Gable-Gould/Adjusters International
Represented By: C. Jay Robbins, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?