Trinity Holdings, LLC v. WV Crossroads Realty LLC et al
Plaintiff: Trinity Holdings, LLC
Defendant: WV Crossroads Hassim LLC, WV Crossroads CH LLC, WV Crossroads Realty LLC and WV Crossroads Nassim LLC
Case Number: 5:2021cv00238
Filed: April 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Frank W Volk
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER TO #1 Complaint With Jury Demand by WV Crossroads Nassim LLC, WV Crossroads Realty LLC, WV Crossroads CH LLC and COUNTERCLAIM by WV Crossroads Nassim LLC, WV Crossroads Realty LLC, WV Crossroads CH LLC against Plaintiff, Trinity Holdings, LLC. (Cullop, Geoffrey) (Modified on 5/28/2021 to add jury demand) (mk).
May 13, 2021 Filing 9 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME for WV Crossroads Realty LLC, WV Crossroads CH LLC and WV Crossroads Nassim LLC to file a Responsive Pleading to May 28, 2021 by WV Crossroads CH LLC, WV Crossroads Nassim LLC, WV Crossroads Realty LLC, Trinity Holdings, LLC (Cullop, Geoffrey)
May 13, 2021 RESET ANSWER DEADLINE for WV Crossroads Realty LLC, WV Crossroads CH LLC and WV Crossroads Nassim LLC to 5/28/2021 pursuant to #9 Stipulation. (mk)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER AND NOTICE. Pursuant to LR Civ P 16.1, it is ORDERED that the following dates are hereby fixed as the time by or on which certain events must occur: Motions under FR Civ P 12(b) - 6/9/2021. Last day for Rule 26(f) meeting - 7/6/2021. Last day to file Report of Parties Planning Meeting and Scheduling Order Worksheet - 7/12/2021. Telephonic Scheduling Conference at 3:30 PM on 7/26/2021, before the undersigned, unless canceled. Entry of Scheduling Order - 8/5/2021. Last day to serve FR Civ P 26(a)(1) disclosures - 8/9/2021. Signed by Judge Frank W. Volk on 5/10/2021. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (btm)
May 7, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Geoffrey A. Cullop on behalf of WV Crossroads CH LLC, WV Crossroads Nassim LLC, WV Crossroads Realty LLC. (Cullop, Geoffrey)
April 22, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 4/21/2021 as to WV Crossroads Nassim LLC. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100003113502. (slr)
April 22, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 4/21/2021 as to WV Crossroads Realty LLC. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100003113519. (slr)
April 22, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 4/21/2021 as to WV Crossroads CH LLC. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100003113496. (slr)
April 16, 2021 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (slr)
April 16, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to WV Crossroads CH LLC, WV Crossroads Nassim LLC, WV Crossroads Realty LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachments: #1 Summons WV Crossroads CH, #2 Summons WV Crossroads Nassim) (slr) (Modified on 4/16/2021 to remove and replace images of Attachments 1 and 2)(slr).
April 16, 2021 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to WV Crossroads CH LLC, WV Crossroads Nassim LLC, WV Crossroads Realty LLC, re: #1 Complaint. ERROR: Images of Attachments 1 and 2 were incorrect. CORRECTION: Removed and replaced images of Attachments 1 and 2. (slr)
April 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7926038. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Signed Contract, #2 Signed Verification, #3 Proposed Summons WV Crossroads CH, #4 Proposed Summons WV Crossroads Nassim, #5 Proposed Summons WV Crossroads Realty, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (slr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trinity Holdings, LLC v. WV Crossroads Realty LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WV Crossroads Hassim LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WV Crossroads CH LLC
Represented By: Geoffrey A. Cullop
Represented By: Kelly G. Pawlowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WV Crossroads Realty LLC
Represented By: Geoffrey A. Cullop
Represented By: Kelly G. Pawlowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WV Crossroads Nassim LLC
Represented By: Geoffrey A. Cullop
Represented By: Kelly G. Pawlowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trinity Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Russell D. Jessee
Represented By: James E. McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?