Feather-Gorbey v. Warden
Defendant: Warden
Petitioner: (Chief) Col. Michael S. Owl Feather-Gorbey
Case Number: 5:2022cv00007
Filed: January 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Dwane L Tinsley
Referring Judge: Frank W Volk
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federal)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2022 Filing 6 LETTER to Michael S. Owl Feather Gorbey, from Rory L. Perry II dated 2/15/2022, re: #5 Notice to Clerk regarding amending #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (klc)
February 15, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO CLERK by Michael S. Owl Feather-Gorbey, re: #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (msa)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order MEMORANDUM OPINION AND INJUNCTION ORDER directing that the Clerk is to present any new filings in Mr. Feather-Gorbeys open cases to the presiding judicial officer for review prior to docketing, and as more fully set forth in ECF #30 docketed in Lead Case Number 5:21-cv-00367. Signed by Judge Frank W. Volk on 2/4/2022. (ts)
January 24, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION by Michael S. Owl Feather-Gorbey for the Court to Take Judicial Notice to Related Subsequent Events and New Evidence Related to This Habeas Petition. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley. (msa)
January 5, 2022 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
January 4, 2022 CASE assigned to Judge Frank W. Volk. (klc)
January 4, 2022 Filing 2 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS by Michael S. Owl Feather-Gorbey against Warden, FCI Beckley pursuant to Title 28, United States Code, Section 2241. (msa)
January 4, 2022 Filing 1 APPLICATION by Michael S. Owl Feather-Gorbey to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. (msa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Feather-Gorbey v. Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: (Chief) Col. Michael S. Owl Feather-Gorbey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?