Strohmetz v. Warden
Petitioner: Richard Strohmetz
Respondent: United States of America and Warden
Case Number: 5:2022cv00008
Filed: January 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Cheryl A Eifert
Referring Judge: Frank W Volk
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federal)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing Respondent to answer or otherwise respond to the #1 Petition within 60 days of the entry of this Order showing cause, if Respondent has any, why the relief sought by Petitioner should not be granted; Petitioner may, if he wishes, file a reply to the answer or response of the Respondent within 60 days after service of same by the Respondent; the Clerk shall amend the style as indicated herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 2/28/2022. (cc: Petitioner; USA for the SDWV with copy of #1 Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus) (btm)
February 25, 2022 Filing 7 Filing Fee: $5.00, Receipt Number 5BECK005378. (ts)
January 31, 2022 Filing 6 LETTER to Richard Strohmetz, from Rory L. Perry II dated 1/31/2022, re: #5 letter requesting status of payment. (klc)
January 31, 2022 Filing 5 LETTER to Clerk of Court, from Richard Strohmetz dated 1/27/2022, re: status of payment (ts)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing that Petitioner pay the filing fee within 30 days or submit to the Court an Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 1/24/2022. (cc: Petitioner with enclosures) (lca)
January 5, 2022 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
January 4, 2022 CASE assigned to Judge Frank W. Volk. (klc)
January 4, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE TO PETITIONER OF FAILURE TO REMIT FILING FEE. (btm)
January 4, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS by Richard Strohmetz against United States of America pursuant to Title 28, United States Code, Section 2241. (btm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strohmetz v. Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Richard Strohmetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?