Reese v. Heckard
Petitioner: Victor Reese
Respondent: Katina Heckard
Case Number: 5:2022cv00033
Filed: January 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Cheryl A Eifert
Referring Judge: Frank W Volk
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federal)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing Petitioner to file a Reply to Respondent's #7 Response to Order to Show Cause within sixty (60) days after service of same. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 3/11/2022. (cc: Petitioner; counsel of record) (arb)
March 11, 2022 Filing 7 RESPONSE by Katina Heckard to the Court's #6 Order. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Bailey, Jason)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing Respondent to answer or otherwise respond to the #1 Petition within 60 days of the entry of this Order showing cause, if Respondent has any, why the relief sought by Petitioner should not be granted; Petitioner may, if he wishes, file a reply to the answer or response of the Respondent within 60 days after service of same by the Respondent. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 1/25/2022. (cc: Petitioner; United States Attorney for the Southern District of West Virginia with copy of #1 Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus) (btm)
January 24, 2022 Filing 5 Filing Fee: $5.00, Receipt Number CHAR019990. (btm)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing Petitioner within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, to either pay the requisite five dollar filing fee or submit to the Court an Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 1/24/2022. (cc: Petitioner with Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs) (msa)
January 19, 2022 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
January 18, 2022 CASE assigned to Judge Frank W. Volk. (klc)
January 18, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE TO PETITIONER OF FAILURE TO REMIT FILING FEE. (btm)
January 18, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS by Victor Reese against Katina Heckard pursuant to Title 28, United States Code, Section 2241. (btm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reese v. Heckard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Victor Reese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Katina Heckard
Represented By: Jason S. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?