Bain v. Heckard
Petitioner: Tamien Derrick Bain
Respondent: K. Heckard
Case Number: 5:2023cv00346
Filed: April 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Dwane L Tinsley
Referring Judge: Frank W Volk
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federal)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RETURN RECEIPT CARD received from K Heckard, FCI Beckley re: #6 Order to Show Cause. Signed for on 6/13/2023. (msa)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RETURN RECEIPT CARD received from the United States Attorney re: #6 Order to Show Cause. Signed for on 6/12/2023. (msa)
June 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE granting Petitioner's #5 MOTION to File a Supplemental Petition to the extent that the additional claim(s) addressed in the Supplemental Petition shall be treated as part of Petitioner's 2241 petition; directing that by 7/14/2023, Respondent shall file an Answer to Petitioner's allegations and to show cause, if any, why the writ of habeas corpus sought by the petitioner should not be granted; Petitioner may file a Reply to Respondent's Answer by 8/4/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley on 6/9/2023. (cc: Petitioner, Respondent and USA w/ECF No(s) 1, 5 via certified mail return receipt requested) (msa)
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUPPLEMENTAL WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS UNDER 28 USC 2241 by Tamien Derrick Bain against K. Heckard. (msa)
April 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Filing Fee: $5.00, Receipt Number 5000203. (mfo)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order CASE assigned to Judge Frank W. Volk. (klc)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE TO PETITIONER OF FAILURE TO REMIT FILING FEE re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241). (msa)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS by Tamien Derrick Bain against K. Heckard pursuant to Title 28, United States Code, Section 2241. (msa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bain v. Heckard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tamien Derrick Bain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: K. Heckard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?