Bloomfield v. Forest River, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Russell J. Bloomfield
Defendant: Forest River, Inc. and Camping World RV Supercenter - Katy
Case Number: 5:2023cv00535
Filed: August 10, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Frank W Volk
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2023 Filing 11 JOINT REPLY by Camping World RV Supercenter - Katy, Forest River, Inc. to #10 Singular Response In Opposition. (Palumbo, Corey)
August 29, 2023 Filing 10 SINGULAR RESPONSE by Russell J. Bloomfield in opposition to #3 MOTION by Forest River, Inc. to Dismiss Complaint, #5 MOTION by Camping World RV Supercenter - Katy to Dismiss Complaint (Salvatore, Anthony) (Modified on 8/29/2023 to remove links to #4 and #6 memoranda in support) (mk).
August 24, 2023 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #8 Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Camping World RV Supercenter - Katy. ERROR: Incorrect image attached. CORRECTION: Image replaced. (mk)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER AND NOTICE: Motions under FR Civ P 12(b) - 9/22/2023. Last day for Rule 26(f) meeting - 10/16/2023. Last day to file Report of Parties Planning Meeting and Scheduling Order Worksheet - 10/23/2023. Telephonic Scheduling Conference at 4:00 PM on 11/13/2023, before the undersigned, unless canceled. Entry of Scheduling Order - 11/16/2023. Last day to serve FR Civ P 26(a)(1) disclosures - 11/20/2023. Signed by Judge Frank W. Volk on 8/23/2023. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (lca)
August 22, 2023 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Camping World RV Supercenter - Katy (Palumbo, Corey) (Modified on 8/24/2023 to replace image) (mk).
August 22, 2023 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Forest River, Inc. (Palumbo, Corey)
August 15, 2023 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Camping World RV Supercenter - Katy in support of #5 MOTION by Camping World RV Supercenter - Katy to Dismiss Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Palumbo, Corey)
August 15, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION by Camping World RV Supercenter - Katy to Dismiss Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal. (Palumbo, Corey) (Modified on 8/16/2023 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (kew).
August 15, 2023 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Forest River, Inc. in support of #3 MOTION by Forest River, Inc. to Dismiss Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Palumbo, Corey)
August 15, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION by Forest River, Inc. to Dismiss Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal. (Palumbo, Corey) (Modified on 8/16/2023 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (kew).
August 10, 2023 CASE assigned to Judge Frank W. Volk. (klc)
August 10, 2023 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (jsa)
August 10, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Forest River, Inc. with summons, complaint, notices of bona fide defense, notice of consent, and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Raleigh County. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-8474742. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (jsa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bloomfield v. Forest River, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell J. Bloomfield
Represented By: Anthony M. Salvatore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forest River, Inc.
Represented By: Corey L. Palumbo
Represented By: J. Tyler Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camping World RV Supercenter - Katy
Represented By: Corey L. Palumbo
Represented By: J. Tyler Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?