Boyd v. Bellin, et al
Plaintiff: Ivan Boyd
Defendant: C.O. Michalski, Austin J Korman, Long, Kira Labby, Cindy Barter, RN Debra J Bellin, Janelle R Garcia, Shari Klenke, Tom Larson and Ms. "K"
Case Number: 1:2020cv01464
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Filing 13 LETTER from the clerk to plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Joseph and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (jcl)
September 18, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
September 18, 2020 Filing 12 Case transferred in from District of Wisconsin Western; Case Number 3:20-cv-00288. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **Plaintiff Ivan Boyd, an inmate at Redgranite Correctional Institution ("RGCI") filed this proposed lawsuit under 42 U.S.C. 1983, claiming that employees at RGCI violated his constitutional rights. After filing his complaint, but before the court screened it pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A, Boyd moved to transfer this case to the Eastern District of Wisconsin, having recognized that he had filed his complaint in the wrong court. The court agrees since the incident giving rise to the complaint appears to have occurred at RGCI, where plaintiff is currently in custody and where all the named defendants are alleged to work. Accordingly, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406, plaintiff's motion (dkt. #10 ) is GRANTED. The clerk's office is directed to TRANSFER this case to the Eastern District of Wisconsin. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 9/18/2020. (nln),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 9/18/2020.]
September 10, 2020 Filing 10 Change of Venue to Eastern District of Wisconsin by Plaintiff Ivan Boyd. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 9/18/2020.]
June 3, 2020 Filing 9 Letter from clerk's office in response to #8 letter from plaintiff. (jef),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 9/18/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 8 Letter requesting clarification by Plaintiff Ivan Boyd. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 9/18/2020.]
May 1, 2020 Filing 7 Warden PLRA Letter. (aom),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 9/18/2020.]
May 1, 2020 Partial Filing fee received : $ 25.53, receipt number 34690036806 (aom),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 9/18/2020.]
April 15, 2020 Filing 6 Supplement naming Defendant Ms. K in #1 Complaint,,,, filed by Ivan Boyd (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (aom),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 9/18/2020.]
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 25.53 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 4/27/2020.(aom),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 9/18/2020.]
April 3, 2020 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff Ivan Boyd. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter Certification, #2 Envelope) (jef),(ps) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/6/2020: #3 IPP Calculation) (aom). [Transferred from wiwd on 9/18/2020.]
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff Ivan Boyd to submit Trust Fund Account Statement by 4/17/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 3/27/2020. (nln),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 9/18/2020.]
March 27, 2020 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Ivan Boyd. (nln),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 9/18/2020.]
March 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Ivan Boyd. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley.) (Attachments: #1 Amended Defendants Section, #2 Exhibit 1 - Health Service Request dated 12-13-19, #3 Exhibit 2 - Health Service Request dated 12-15-19, #4 Exhibit 3 - Memo from Health Service Unit, #5 Exhibit 4 - Health Service Request dated 12-18-19, #6 Exhibit 5 - Public Records Request, #7 Exhibit 6 - Offsite Service Request and other papers, #8 Exhibit 7 - Health Service Request dated 12-22-19, #9 Exhibit 8 - Health Service Request dated 12-22-19, #10 Exhibit 9 - Health Service Request dated 12-26-19, #11 Exhibit 10 - Health Service Request dated 12-28-19, #12 Exhibit 11 - Medical Supply Refill Request, #13 Exhibit 12 - Health Service Request dated 12-30-19, #14 Exhibit 13 - Health Service Request dated 1-3-20, #15 Exhibit 14 - Medication Refill Request, #16 Exhibit 15 - Health Service Request, Inmate Complaint Documents, #17 Exhibit 16 - Inmate Complaint Documents, #18 Cover Letter, #19 Envelope, #20 Envelope) (nln),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 9/18/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boyd v. Bellin, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. Michalski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austin J Korman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kira Labby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Barter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RN Debra J Bellin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janelle R Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shari Klenke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. "K"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivan Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?