Walker v. Wisconsin Department of Corrections et al

Plaintiff: Tony D Walker
Defendant: Wisconsin Department of Corrections, Edward Wall, Deirdre Morgan, Cathy Jess, Charles Facktor, Amy Basten, Michael Baenen, Michael Delvaux, Captain Pusich, Jessica Legois, Michael Mohr and Officer Hotierman
Case Number: 2:2013cv00003
Filed: January 2, 2013
Court: Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Brown
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 4, 2016 105 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION AND ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 1/4/2016 DENYING 98 plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration; GRANTING 99 plaintiff's Motion for the Court to Apply the Prison Mailbox Rule; DENYING AS MOOT 102 plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Complaint; and DENYING 103 plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend his Complaint. (cc: all counsel; by US Mail to plaintiff) (pwm)
September 21, 2015 96 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION AND ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 9/21/2015 GRANTING 58 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and DENYING 72 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. The court ORDERS that the docket reflect that the Plaintiff has incurred a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. sec. 1915(g). (cc: all counsel; by US Mail to plaintiff) (pwm)
August 29, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION AND ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 8/29/14 denying as moot 42 Motion for Leave to File; denying 27 Motion for Summary Judgment. (cc: all counsel, via USPS to plaintiff) (dm)
February 13, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION AND ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 2/13/14 granting 32 Motion for Extension of Time; denying 24 Motion for Reconsideration; denying 25 Motion for Preliminary Injunction/Motion for TRO. (cc: all counsel, via USPS to plaintiff) (dm)
October 23, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION AND ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 10/23/13 denying 12 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration; denying without prejudice 15 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (cc: all counsel, via USPS to plaintiff) (dm)
April 25, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 4/25/13 granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying 6 Motion to Appoint Counsel; granting 8 Motion for Reconsideration. Further ordering that defendants DOC, Delvaux, Pusich, and Hotierman are DISMISSED. Further ordering defendants to file a responsive pleading to the complaint within sixty days of receiving electronic notice of this order. Further ordering the Secretary of the Wisconsin Department of Corrections or his designee to collect from plaintiffs prison trust account the $350.00 balance of the filing fee as set forth in the order. (cc: all counsel, via USPS to plaintiff, Warden-GBCI) (dm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Wisconsin Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony D Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wisconsin Department of Corrections
Represented By: Wisconsin Dept of Justice - 1983 Actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deirdre Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathy Jess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Facktor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Basten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Baenen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Delvaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Pusich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Legois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Mohr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Hotierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?