Archer v. Chisholm et al
Plaintiff: Cynthia Archer
Defendant: David Budde, Bruce Landgraf, David Robles, John Chisholm, Robert Stelter and Aaron Weiss
Amicus Curiae: State of Wisconsin
Case Number: 2:2015cv00922
Filed: July 30, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Rock
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2017 Filing 93 USCA Mandate (certified copy) USCA Number 16-2417 The judgment of the District Court is AFFIRMED, with costs, in accordance with the decision of this court entered on this date. (dl)
November 23, 2016 Filing 92 Certified Record on Appeal 16-2417 Transmitted to US Court of Appeals re #84 Notice of Appeal, consisting of 2 vol pldgs 6 loose pldgs (cc: all counsel) (Attachments: #1 docket sheet)(dl)
November 22, 2016 Filing 91 Appeal Record Request received from 7th Cir. Re: USCA Case Number 16-2417. (dl)
November 4, 2016 Docket Annotation Exhibits received under seal from counsel. (cms)
November 2, 2016 Filing 90 NOTICE by David Budde, Robert Stelter, Aaron Weiss of Submission of a Copy of Evidence by Hand-Delivery (Leib, Samuel)
July 12, 2016 Filing 89 TRANSCRIPT of Oral Argument held on April 13, 2016 before Judge Lynn Adelman Court Reporter/Transcriber Heidi J. Trapp, Contact at 414-297-3074. Transcripts may be purchased using the Transcript Order Form found #on our website or viewed at the court public terminal. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: If necessary, within 7 business days each party shall inform the Court of their intent to redact personal identifiers by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact. Please read the policy located on our website # www.wied.uscourts.gov Redaction Statement due 8/5/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/15/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/14/2016. (Trapp, Heidi)
June 10, 2016 Filing 88 USCA Case Number 16-2417 Seventh Circuit re: #84 Notice of Appeal, filed by Cynthia Archer. (dmm)
June 9, 2016 Filing 87 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #84 Notice of Appeal, (dmm)
June 9, 2016 Filing 86 Attorney Cover Letter re: #84 Notice of Appeal, (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(dmm)
June 9, 2016 Filing 85 Docketing Statement by Cynthia Archer re #84 Notice of Appeal, (cc: all counsel) (Rivkin, David)
June 9, 2016 Filing 84 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #83 Judgment, #82 Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, Order on Motion for Leave to File,, Order on Motion to Seal Document,, Order on Motion to Supplement, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,, Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Cynthia Archer. Filing Fee PAID $505, receipt number 0757-2357001 (cc: all counsel) (Rivkin, David)
May 26, 2016 Filing 83 JUDGMENT signed by Deputy Clerk on 5/26/16. (cc: all counsel)(dm)
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 82 DECISION AND ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 5/26/16 that prosecutor defendants motion to dismiss #20 is GRANTED. The Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly. Further ordering that investigator defendants motion for judgment on the pleadings #36 is GRANTED. The Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly. Further ordering that defendants motions for order preserving evidence #49 , #50 are GRANTED in part. Defendants may, in addition to complying with the Wisconsin Supreme Courts order regarding the John Doe 2 records, file a copy of all materials filed with the Wisconsin Supreme Court with the Clerk of Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin. The Clerk shall not docket any of these materials and shall maintain the materials under seal until further order of this court. Further ordering that the parties motions to seal ECF Nos. #51 , #53 , #57 are GRANTED. Further ordering that the parties motions to cite supplemental authority #68 , #75 are GRANTED. Further ordering that investigator defendants motion to supplement response to the State of Wisconsins amicus curiae brief #70 is GRANTED. Further ordering that plaintiffs motion to amend/correct her opposition #72 is GRANTED. (cc: all counsel) (dm)
May 23, 2016 Filing 81 AFFIDAVIT of Michael P. Russart in Support of Order Regarding Motion to Preserve Evidence. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Russart, Michael)
May 23, 2016 Filing 80 REPLY filed by John Chisholm, Bruce Landgraf, David Robles re #76 Proposed Document In Support of Order Regarding Motion to Preserve Evidence. (Russart, Michael)
May 23, 2016 Filing 79 RESPONSE to Motion filed by John Chisholm, Bruce Landgraf, David Robles re #75 MOTION To Cite Supplemental Authority . (Russart, Michael)
May 13, 2016 Filing 78 RESPONSE to Motion filed by David Budde, Robert Stelter, Aaron Weiss re #75 MOTION To Cite Supplemental Authority . (Leib, Samuel)
May 11, 2016 Filing 77 RESPONSE filed by Cynthia Archer re #76 Proposed Document (Rivkin, David)
May 6, 2016 Filing 76 PROPOSED Order Requiring Defendants to Preserve John Doe I Records filed by John Chisholm, Bruce Landgraf, David Robles. (Russart, Michael)
May 6, 2016 Filing 75 MOTION To Cite Supplemental Authority by Cynthia Archer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Heffernan v. City of Paterson Slip Opinion)(Rivkin, David)
May 6, 2016 Filing 74 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Cynthia Archer re #70 MOTION to Supplement the Response to the State of Wisconsin's Amicus Curiae Brief . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Unreported Decision, #2 Exhibit B Unreported Decision)(Rivkin, David)
April 19, 2016 Filing 73 NOTICE by David Budde, Robert Stelter, Aaron Weiss of Substitution of Firm (Knott, Douglas)
April 15, 2016 Filing 72 MOTION to Amend/Correct Opposition to Dispositive Motions by Cynthia Archer. (Attachments: #1 Unreported Decision)(Rivkin, David)
April 13, 2016 Filing 71 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lynn Adelman:Oral Argument Hearing held on 4/13/2016; The parties presented oral argument on prosecutor defendant's motion to dismiss, investigator defendants' motion for judgment on the pleadings, and defendants' motion for order preserving evidence. See transcript for details (Court Reporter Heidi Trapp) (jcl) Modified on 4/14/2016 (jcl).
April 12, 2016 Filing 70 MOTION to Supplement the Response to the State of Wisconsin's Amicus Curiae Brief by David Budde, Robert Stelter, Aaron Weiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Milwaukee Journal-Sentinel Article)(Leib, Samuel)
April 8, 2016 Filing 69 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Cynthia Archer re #68 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION To Cite Additional Authority . (Rivkin, David)
April 7, 2016 Filing 68 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION To Cite Additional Authority by John Chisholm, Bruce Landgraf, David Robles. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Bianchi v McQueen case)(Fertl, Jeffrey)
March 24, 2016 Filing 67 RESPONSE filed by John Chisholm, Bruce Landgraf, David Robles re #66 Brief (Non-Motion) to Brief of the State of Wisconsin as Amicus Curiae (Kuzmanovic, Tomislav)
March 16, 2016 Filing 65 TRANSCRIPT of Status hearing held on March 3, 2016 before Judge Lynn Adelman Court Reporter/Transcriber Sheryl Stawski, Contact at 414/881-0922. Transcripts may be purchased using the Transcript Order Form found #on our website or viewed at the court public terminal. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: If necessary, within 7 business days each party shall inform the Court of their intent to redact personal identifiers by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact. Please read the policy located on our website # www.wied.uscourts.gov Redaction Statement due 4/11/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/21/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/17/2016. (Stawski, Sheryl)
March 3, 2016 Filing 66 State of Wisconsin's Amicus BRIEF in opposition to motion to preserve evidence. (kmm)
March 3, 2016 Filing 64 Minute Order Proceedings held before Judge Lynn Adelman:Telephonic Status Conference held on 3/3/2016; The court GRANTED defendant's motion to stay discovery (ECF No #24 )with no objections; The court GRANTED the state's Motion to File an Amicus Brief (ECF No #56 ) with no objections. Defendants may file a response within 21 days; The Court GRANTED plaintiff's Motion for Oral Argument (ECF No. #28 );Motion for Order preserving evidence is scheduled for 4/13/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 390, 517 E Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI 53202 before Judge Lynn Adelman; See transcript and minutes for further details (Court Reporter Sheryl Stawski.) (jcl)
March 3, 2016 NOTICE by the Court re: 3/3/16 11:45 AM CST telephone status conference. The court was to initiate the call however, due to the amount of participants it is necessary to proceed as follows: parties should dial access number 1-877-336-1839. You will be prompted for an access code (4144803) and a security code (1234). Once that information is entered participants will be placed on hold until we access the call. (dm)
February 19, 2016 Filing 63 LETTER from Attorney Tomislav Z. Kuzmanovic . (Kuzmanovic, Tomislav)
February 19, 2016 Filing 62 RESPONSE to Motion filed by David Budde, Robert Stelter, Aaron Weiss re #56 MOTION to File Amicus Brief by the State of Wisconsin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Response to the State of Wisconsin's Amicus Curiae Brief, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Samuel J. Leib, #3 Exhibit 1 - Stelter Memo to Schimel 1-30-12, #4 Exhibit 2 - Wiesmueller Public Reprimand, #5 Exhibit 3 - Journal-Sentinel Article, #6 Exhibit 4 - Journal-Sentinel Article, #7 Exhibit 5 - Van Hollen Letter, #8 Exhibit 6 - Jordahl-Johnson Letter, #9 Exhibit 7 - Wisconsin Watchdog Blog, #10 Exhibit 8 - Schimel Press Release 7-16-15, #11 Exhibit 9 - Schimel Press Release 12-3-15, #12 Exhibit 10 - Schimel Press Release 1-29-16, #13 Exhibit 11 - Sykes Interview, #14 Exhibit 12 - McKenna Interview)(Leib, Samuel)
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 2/18/16 that defendants motion for judgment on the pleadings #8 , motion to stay discovery #10 , motion to stay 26(f) conference and initial disclosures #12 , and motion for order of preservation #38 are DENIED as MOOT. Further ordering telephone status conference set for 3/3/2016 11:45 AM CST. The court will initiate the call. Counsel should call 414/297-1285 to provide contact information. (cc: all counsel) (dm)
February 16, 2016 Filing 60 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by John Chisholm, Bruce Landgraf, David Robles re #49 MOTION to Adopt CoDefendants' Motion to Preserve Evidence , #38 MOTION for Order of Preservation . (Kuzmanovic, Tomislav)
February 15, 2016 Filing 59 DECLARATION of Samuel J. Leib in Support of Motion to Preserve Evidence (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- WSC Order Denying Petition to Intervene)(Leib, Samuel)
February 15, 2016 Filing 58 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by David Budde, Robert Stelter, Aaron Weiss re #50 MOTION for Order Preserving Evidence . (Leib, Samuel)
January 29, 2016 Filing 57 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION to Seal Document (Brief in Response to Motion for Preservation Order) by Cynthia Archer. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Brief, #2 Restricted Brief, #3 Brief Att. 1, #4 Brief Att. 2)This document and/or certain attachments are SEALED and only viewable by permission of the court(Rivkin, David)
January 29, 2016 Filing 56 MOTION to File Amicus Brief by State of Wisconsin. (Attachments: #1 State of Wisconsin's Amicus Curiae Brief in Opp. to Mtn. to Preserve Evidence)(Kawski, Clayton)
January 28, 2016 Filing 55 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by David Budde, Robert Stelter, Aaron Weiss re #36 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Plaintiff's Reliance on Exhibits in Amending Complaint, #2 Supplement 1, #3 Supplement 2, #4 Supplement 3, #5 Supplement 4, #6 Supplement 5, #7 Supplement 6, #8 Supplement 7, #9 Supplement 8, #10 Supplement 9, #11 Supplement 10, #12 Supplement 11, #13 Supplement 12, #14 Supplement 13)(Leib, Samuel)
January 7, 2016 Filing 54 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Cynthia Archer re #36 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Attachment 4, #5 Attachment 5, #6 Attachment 6, #7 Attachment 7, #8 Attachment 8, #9 Attachment 9, #10 Attachment 10, #11 Attachment 11, #12 Attachment 12, #13 Attachment 13, #14 Attachment 14, #15 Attachment 15, #16 Attachment 16, #17 Attachment 17, #18 Attachment 18, #19 Attachment 19, #20 Attachment 20, #21 Attachment 21, #22 Attachment 22, #23 Attachment 23)(Rivkin, David)
December 21, 2015 Filing 53 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Leave to File Declaration of Samuel J. Leib in Support of Motion to Preserve Evidence Under Seal by David Budde, Robert Stelter, Aaron Weiss. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Samuel J. Leib, #2 Exhibit 1 - MSJ Article, #3 Exhibit 2 - Budde and Stelter Petition to Intervene, #4 Exhibit 3 - Weiss Petition to Intervene, #5 Exhibit 4 - WSC Order Denying Petitions to Intervene, #6 Exhibit 5 - WSC Decision Denying Reconsideration Motion, #7 Exhibit 6 - Dissemination Order for John Doe II, #8 Exhibit 7 - Unnamed Movants' Brief, #9 Exhibit 8 - 8-21-15 Knott letter, #10 Exhibit 9 - 8-27-15 DeLaquil letter)(Leib, Samuel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/22/2016: #11 SEALED Exhibt 2, #12 SEALED Exhibit 3, #13 SEALED Exhibit 7) (vkb).
December 21, 2015 Filing 52 DECLARATION of Robert Stelter in Support of Motion to Preserve Evidence (Leib, Samuel)
December 21, 2015 Filing 51 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum in Support of Motion to Preserve Evidence Under Seal by David Budde, Robert Stelter, Aaron Weiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum in Support of Motion to Preserve Evidence)(Leib, Samuel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/22/2016: #2 SEALED Unredacted Brief in Support) (vkb).
December 21, 2015 Filing 50 MOTION for Order Preserving Evidence by David Budde, Robert Stelter, Aaron Weiss. (Leib, Samuel)
December 21, 2015 Filing 49 MOTION to Adopt CoDefendants' Motion to Preserve Evidence by John Chisholm, Bruce Landgraf, David Robles. (Fertl, Jeffrey)
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Approving #46 AMENDED Stipulation filed by David Robles, John Chisholm, Bruce Landgraf signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 12/9/15. (cc: all counsel)(dm)
December 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Approving #45 Stipulation for briefing filed by David Robles, John Chisholm, Bruce Landgraf signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 12/7/15. (cc: all counsel)(dm)
December 7, 2015 Filing 46 STIPULATION Amended Stipulation for Briefing on the Amended Motion for Protective Order for Preservation of Evidence by John Chisholm, Bruce Landgraf, David Robles. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Russart, Michael)
December 4, 2015 Filing 45 STIPULATION for Briefing on the Amended Motion for Protective Order for Preservation of Evidence by John Chisholm, Bruce Landgraf, David Robles. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Russart, Michael)
December 4, 2015 Filing 44 LETTER from Michael P. Russart regarding the Stipulation and Order for Briefing on the Amended Motion for Protective Order for Preservation of Evidence. (Russart, Michael)
November 25, 2015 Filing 43 BRIEF in Support filed by David Budde, Robert Stelter, Aaron Weiss re #36 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Search Warrant dated 12-17-2010, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit dated 12-17-2010, #3 Exhibit C - Search Warrant dated 09-13-2011, #4 Exhibit D - Affidavit dated 09-13-2011, #5 Exhibit E - Affidavit dated 07-11-11)(Leib, Samuel)
November 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Approving #41 Stipulation re briefing filed by David Budde, Aaron Weiss, Robert Stelter signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 11/25/15. (cc: all counsel)(dm)
November 25, 2015 Filing 41 STIPULATION Regarding Briefing on Investigator Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings by David Budde, Robert Stelter, Aaron Weiss. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Leib, Samuel)
November 24, 2015 Filing 40 DECLARATION of Michael P. Russart (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - email exchange between the Prosecutors' counsel and plaintiff's counsel discussing whether would join in a motion for a protective order, #2 Exhibit B - August 21, 2015 letter from Attorney Knott to Plaintiff's counsel asking plaintiff to stipulate to a protective order, #3 Exhibit C - August 27, 2015 letter from plaintiff's counsel declining to stipulate to a protective order, #4 Exhibit D - email exchange between Co-Defendants' counsel and Plaintiff's counsel asking for further clarification of plaintiff's response)(Kuzmanovic, Tomislav)
November 24, 2015 Filing 39 BRIEF in Support filed by John Chisholm, Bruce Landgraf, David Robles re #38 MOTION for Order of Preservation . (Kuzmanovic, Tomislav)
November 24, 2015 Filing 38 MOTION for Order of Preservation by John Chisholm, Bruce Landgraf, David Robles. (Kuzmanovic, Tomislav)
November 23, 2015 Filing 37 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by David Budde, Robert Stelter, Aaron Weiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Memorandum in Support of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, #2 Exhibit A to Proposed Memorandum, #3 Exhibit B to Proposed Memorandum, #4 Exhibit C to Proposed Memorandum, #5 Exhibit D to Proposed Memorandum, #6 Exhibit E to Proposed Memorandum)(Leib, Samuel)
November 23, 2015 Filing 36 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by David Budde, Robert Stelter, Aaron Weiss. (Leib, Samuel)
November 23, 2015 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Brent A Simerson on behalf of David Budde, Robert Stelter, Aaron Weiss. Attorney(s) appearing: Brent A. Simerson (Simerson, Brent)
November 16, 2015 Filing 34 BRIEF in Support filed by John Chisholm, Bruce Landgraf, David Robles re #20 MOTION to Dismiss . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E)(Russart, Michael)
November 13, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #33 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Oversized Reply Brief filed by David Robles, John Chisholm, Bruce Landgraf signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 11/13/15. (cc: all counsel)(dm)
November 12, 2015 Filing 33 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Oversized Reply Brief by John Chisholm, Bruce Landgraf, David Robles. (Russart, Michael)
November 3, 2015 Filing 32 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by Cynthia Archer re #28 MOTION for Oral Argument . (Rivkin, David)
October 30, 2015 Filing 31 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Cynthia Archer re #24 MOTION to Stay Renewed Motion to Stay Discovery . (Rivkin, David)
October 27, 2015 Filing 30 BRIEF in Opposition filed by John Chisholm, Bruce Landgraf, David Robles re #28 MOTION for Oral Argument . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Russart, Michael)
October 23, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #29 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION to Enlarge Time to File Reply Brief in Support of the Prosecutors' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by David Robles, John Chisholm, Bruce Landgraf signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 10/23/15. (cc: all counsel)(dm)
October 22, 2015 Filing 29 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION to Enlarge Time to File Reply Brief in Support of the Prosecutors' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by John Chisholm, Bruce Landgraf, David Robles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Emails)(Fertl, Jeffrey)
October 22, 2015 Filing 28 MOTION for Oral Argument by Cynthia Archer. (Rivkin, David)
October 21, 2015 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven M Puiszis on behalf of John Chisholm, Bruce Landgraf, David Robles. Attorney(s) appearing: Steven M. Puiszis (Puiszis, Steven)
October 19, 2015 Filing 26 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Cynthia Archer re #20 MOTION to Dismiss . (Rivkin, David)
October 19, 2015 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard B Raile on behalf of Cynthia Archer. Attorney(s) appearing: Richard B. Raile (Raile, Richard)
October 6, 2015 Filing 24 MOTION to Stay Renewed Motion to Stay Discovery by John Chisholm, Bruce Landgraf, David Robles. (Russart, Michael)
October 5, 2015 Filing 23 ANSWER to #17 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Aaron Weiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Use & Dissemination Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - John Doe Petition and Affidavit, #3 Exhibit 3 - Order Commencing John Doe, #4 Exhibit 4 - Kavanaugh Complaint, #5 Exhibit 5 - Russell Complaint, #6 Exhibit 6 - Pierick Complaint, #7 Exhibit 7 - Rindfleisch Complaint, #8 Exhibit 8 - Wink Complaint, #9 Exhibit 9 - Gardner Complaint, #10 Exhibit 10 - Secrecy Order, #11 Exhibit 11 - Search Warrant and Affidavit dated 12-17-2010, #12 Exhibit 12 - Fifth Petition and Affidavit, #13 Exhibit 13 - Order on Fifth Petition, #14 Exhibit 14 - Eighth Petition, #15 Exhibit 15 - Order on Eighth Petition, #16 Exhibit 16 - Tenth Petition and Affidavit, #17 Exhibit 17 - Order on Tenth Petition, #18 Exhibit 18 - Search Warrant and Affidavit dated 09-13-2011, #19 Exhibit 19 - 02-28-2011 Affidavit, #20 Exhibit 20 - 07-11-11 Affidavit, #21 Exhibit 21 - 09-13-11 Affidavit, #22 Exhibit 22 - Search Warrant Report, #23 Exhibit 23 - Audio Recording, #24 Exhibit 24 - Heer Letter, #25 Exhibit 25 - Proffer Letter)(Leib, Samuel)
October 5, 2015 Filing 22 DISCLOSURE Statement by David Budde, Robert Stelter, Aaron Weiss. (Leib, Samuel)
September 23, 2015 Filing 21 BRIEF in Support filed by John Chisholm, Bruce Landgraf, David Robles re #20 MOTION to Dismiss Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Group Exhibit B - Petition for Commencement of a JD Proceeding and Order, #3 Exhibit Group Exhibit C - Part 1 - Search Warrant & Affidavit, #4 Exhibit Group Exhibit C - Part 2 - Search Warrant & Affidavit, #5 Exhibit D - Search Warrant for Cindy Archer office and Affidavit)(Russart, Michael)
September 23, 2015 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss by John Chisholm, Bruce Landgraf, David Robles. (Russart, Michael)
September 17, 2015 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #19 Answer to Amended Complaint filed by David Budde and Robert Stelter; The description of the attachments contains duplicate text. In the future, when attaching documents to the main document you may select a description from the category drop-down list but then you should not repeat that word in the description text box. For example, if you choose Exhibit from the drop-down list, then you may simply type A in the description text box and Exhibit A will appear on the docket. This document does not need to be re-filed; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (vkb)
September 16, 2015 Filing 19 ANSWER to #17 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by David Budde, Robert Stelter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Use & Dissemination Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - John Doe Petition and Affidavit, #3 Exhibit 3 - Order Commencing John Doe, #4 Exhibit 4 - Kavanaugh Complaint, #5 Exhibit 5 - Russell Complaint, #6 Exhibit 6 - Pierick Complaint, #7 Exhibit 7 - Rindfleisch Complaint, #8 Exhibit 8 - Wink Complaint, #9 Exhibit 9 - Gardner Complaint, #10 Exhibit 10 - Secrecy Order, #11 Exhibit 11 - Search Warrant and Affidavit dated 12-17-2010, #12 Exhibit 12 - Fifth Petition and Affidavit, #13 Exhibit 13 - Order on Fifth Petition, #14 Exhibit 14 - Eighth Petition, #15 Exhibit 15 - Order on Eighth Petition, #16 Exhibit 16 - Tenth Petition and Affidavit, #17 Exhibit 17 - Order on Tenth Petition, #18 Exhibit 18 - Search Warrant and Affidavit dated 09-13-2011, #19 Exhibit 19 - 02-28-2011 Affidavit, #20 Exhibit 20 - 07-11-11 Affidavit, #21 Exhibit 21 - 09-13-11 Affidavit, #22 Exhibit 22 - Search Warrant Report, #23 Exhibit 23 - Audio Recording, #24 Exhibit 24 - Heer Letter, #25 Exhibit 25 - Proffer Letter)(Leib, Samuel)
September 4, 2015 Summons Issued as to Aaron Weiss (vkb)
September 3, 2015 Filing 18 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Cynthia Archer (Baisch, Krista)
September 2, 2015 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Cynthia Archer.(Rivkin, David)
August 21, 2015 Filing 16 LETTER from Douglas S. Knott re: clarification of minute entry . (Knott, Douglas)
August 20, 2015 Filing 15 LETTER from Jeffrey S. Fertl re: clarification of minute entry. (Fertl, Jeffrey)
August 19, 2015 Filing 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lynn Adelman:Telephonic Status Conference held on 8/19/2015; The September 28, 2015 scheduling conference is canceled. Plaintiff may file any amended pleadings within 14 days without prejudicing the filing of future amended pleadings consistent with the federal rules. (jcl)
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #13 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for a Status Conference filed by Cynthia Archer signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 8/18/15. Telephone status conference set for 8/19/15 1:10 PM CST. The court will initiate the call. Counsel should call 414-297-1285 to provide contact information. (cc: all counsel)(dm)
August 17, 2015 Filing 13 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for a Status Conference by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(DeLaquil, Mark)
August 14, 2015 Filing 12 MOTION to Stay 26(F) Conference and Initial Disclosures under Rule 26(a)(1) by John Chisholm, Bruce Landgraf, David Robles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Delaquil Email)(Fertl, Jeffrey)
August 12, 2015 Filing 11 Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by John Chisholm, Bruce Landgraf, David Robles. (Fertl, Jeffrey)
August 7, 2015 Filing 10 MOTION to Stay Discovery by John Chisholm, Bruce Landgraf, David Robles. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Russart, Michael)
August 7, 2015 Filing 9 BRIEF in Support filed by John Chisholm, Bruce Landgraf, David Robles re #8 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Answer to Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Search Warrant and Affidavit, #4 Certificate of Service)(Russart, Michael)
August 7, 2015 Filing 8 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by John Chisholm, Bruce Landgraf, David Robles. (Russart, Michael)
August 5, 2015 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by John Chisholm, Bruce Landgraf, David Robles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Order Permitting Use and Dissemination of John Doe Information and Materials, #2 Exhibit 2 - September 13, 2011 Search Warrant and Affidavit, #3 Certificate of Service)(Russart, Michael)
August 5, 2015 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark W DeLaquil on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney(s) appearing: Mark W. DeLaquil (DeLaquil, Mark)
August 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 8/4/15. Rule 16(b) telephone scheduing conference set for 9/28/2015 11:00 AM CST before Judge Lynn Adelman. The court will initiate the call. The name and contact information of the attorney who will be participating in the conference call should be noted in the Rule 26(f) report. (cc: all counsel)(dm)
July 31, 2015 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by David Budde, Robert Stelter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Use and Dissemination Order, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - John Doe Petition and Affidavit, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - Order Commencing John Doe, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4 - Kavanaugh Complaint, #5 Exhibit Ex. 5 - Russell Complaint, #6 Exhibit Ex. 6 - Pierick Complaint, #7 Exhibit Ex. 7 - Rindfleisch Complaint, #8 Exhibit Ex. 8 - Wink Complaint, #9 Exhibit Ex. 9 - Garnder Complaint, #10 Exhibit Ex. 10 - Secrecy Order, #11 Exhibit Ex. 11 - Fifth Petition and Affidavit, #12 Exhibit Ex. 12 - Order on Fifth Petition, #13 Exhibit Ex. 13 - Search Warrant and Affidavit dated 12-17-2010, #14 Exhibit Ex. 14 - Eighth Petition, #15 Exhibit Ex. 15 - Order on Eighth Petition, #16 Exhibit Ex. 16 - Tenth Petition and Affidavit, #17 Exhibit Ex. 17 - Order on Tenth Petition, #18 Exhibit Ex. 18 - Search Warrant and Affidavit dated 09-13-11, #19 Exhibit Ex. 19 - Affidavits Dated 02-28-2011 and 09-13-2011, #20 Exhibit Ex. 20 - Search Warrant Report, #21 Exhibit Ex. 21 - Audio Recording, #22 Exhibit Ex. 22 - Proffer Letter)(Leib, Samuel)
July 31, 2015 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE Statement by David Budde, Robert Stelter. (Leib, Samuel)
July 31, 2015 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Lynn Adelman ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our web site (jcl)
July 30, 2015 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by John Chisholm, Bruce Landgraf, David Robles. (Fertl, Jeffrey)
July 30, 2015 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bruce Landgraf, David Robles, John Chisholm from Milwaukee County Circuit Court, Case Number: 15-CV-5334 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2151986) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - 7-27-15 Ltr from Atty. Leib, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fertl, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Archer v. Chisholm et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Budde
Represented By: Samuel J Leib
Represented By: Douglas S Knott
Represented By: Brent A Simerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Landgraf
Represented By: Jeffrey S Fertl
Represented By: Tomislav Z Kuzmanovic
Represented By: Steven M Puiszis
Represented By: Michael P Russart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Robles
Represented By: Jeffrey S Fertl
Represented By: Tomislav Z Kuzmanovic
Represented By: Steven M Puiszis
Represented By: Michael P Russart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Chisholm
Represented By: Jeffrey S Fertl
Represented By: Tomislav Z Kuzmanovic
Represented By: Steven M Puiszis
Represented By: Michael P Russart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Stelter
Represented By: Samuel J Leib
Represented By: Douglas S Knott
Represented By: Brent A Simerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Weiss
Represented By: Samuel J Leib
Represented By: Douglas S Knott
Represented By: Brent A Simerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Archer
Represented By: James B Barton
Represented By: Krista K Baisch
Represented By: Mark W DeLaquil
Represented By: Richard B Raile
Represented By: David B Rivkin, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Wisconsin
Represented By: Clayton P Kawski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?