Chen v. Nielsen et al

Plaintiff: HUOYING NONE CHEN and Huoying Chen
Defendant: KAY LEOPOLD MILWAUKEE FIELD OFFICE DIRECTOR UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, LOREN MILLER DIRECTOR OF THE NEBRASKA SERVICE CENTER FOR UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, MIRASH DEDVUKAJ DISTRICT DIRECTOR UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, Francis Cissna Director of United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, DONALD NEUFELD ASSOCIATE DIRECTOR FOR SERVICE OPERATIONS, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICE, JEFFERSON SESSIONS ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE UNITED STATES, KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, CHRISTOPHER WRAY DIRECTOR OF THE FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, Loren Miller, Mirash Dedvukaj, Kay Leopold, Christopher Wray, Donald Neufeld, Jefferson Sessions and Francis Cissna
Case Number: 2:2018cv01760
Filed: November 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: David E Jones
Referring Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 08:1329
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Case Terminated per #10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1) (kah)
December 17, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Huoying Chen. (Zhang, Henry)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE ON CONSENT signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 11/20/2018. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge David E. Jones for all further proceedings. Judge Pamela Pepper no longer assigned to case. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
November 19, 2018 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Huoying Chen. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Zhang, Henry)
November 19, 2018 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #3 Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge filed by Huoying Chen; This document must contain the name of the assigned magistrate judge (Judge Jones), along with a signature. This document must be RE-FILED. (vkb)
November 16, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Huoying Chen. All Defendants. (Zhang, Henry)
November 16, 2018 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Defendants. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Warwick, Lisa)
November 16, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa T Warwick on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: AUSA Lisa T. Warwick (Warwick, Lisa)
November 7, 2018 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: One or more party names have been modified - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website - do not create parties that already exist, do not enter names using all capital letters, do not add addresses to any party and do not enter positions of the defendants into the last name field. Refer to the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance. (vkb)
November 7, 2018 Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (vkb)
November 6, 2018 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE Statement by HUOYING NONE CHEN. (Zhang, Henry)
November 6, 2018 Filing 3 BLANK Form to be Re-filed Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by HUOYING NONE CHEN (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Zhang, Henry) Modified on 11/19/2018 (vkb)
November 6, 2018 Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by HUOYING NONE CHEN (Zhang, Henry)
November 6, 2018 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Pamela Pepper ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Jones to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
November 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by HUOYING NONE CHEN. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2962689) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons)(Zhang, Henry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chen v. Nielsen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HUOYING NONE CHEN
Represented By: Henry Zhang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huoying Chen
Represented By: Henry Zhang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAY LEOPOLD MILWAUKEE FIELD OFFICE DIRECTOR UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOREN MILLER DIRECTOR OF THE NEBRASKA SERVICE CENTER FOR UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIRASH DEDVUKAJ DISTRICT DIRECTOR UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francis Cissna Director of United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD NEUFELD ASSOCIATE DIRECTOR FOR SERVICE OPERATIONS, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFERSON SESSIONS ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE UNITED STATES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIRSTJEN NIELSEN
Represented By: Lisa T Warwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER WRAY DIRECTOR OF THE FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loren Miller
Represented By: Lisa T Warwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mirash Dedvukaj
Represented By: Lisa T Warwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kay Leopold
Represented By: Lisa T Warwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Wray
Represented By: Lisa T Warwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Neufeld
Represented By: Lisa T Warwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson Sessions
Represented By: Lisa T Warwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francis Cissna
Represented By: Lisa T Warwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?