Arredondo Velazquez v. Wolf et al
Plaintiff: Laura Arredondo Velazquez
Defendant: Michael Paul, Kenneth T Cuccinelli and Chad Wolf
Case Number: 2:2020cv00180
Filed: February 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Referring Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2020 Case Terminated pursuant to #6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (asc)
March 12, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Laura Arredondo Velazquez. (Chadwick, Theodore)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE ON CONSENT signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 2/13/2020. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph for all further proceedings. Judge J P Stadtmueller no longer assigned to case. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
February 12, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Defendants. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Warwick, Lisa)
February 12, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa T Warwick on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: AUSA Lisa T. Warwick (Warwick, Lisa)
February 6, 2020 Filing 2 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Chadwick, Theodore)
February 6, 2020 Summons Issued as to Chad Wolf. (asc)
February 6, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
February 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Laura Arredondo Velazquez. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3354011) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Chadwick, Theodore)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arredondo Velazquez v. Wolf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Paul
Represented By: Lisa T Warwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T Cuccinelli
Represented By: Lisa T Warwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Wolf
Represented By: Lisa T Warwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Arredondo Velazquez
Represented By: Theodore J Chadwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?