Stamm et al v. Target Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Barbara L. Stamm, Molina Healthcare of Wisconsin Inc and Dean Health Plan Inc
Defendant: ACE American Insurance Company, ABC Insurance Company, Target Corporation and DEF Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv00758
Filed: May 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 7/14/20 for Dismissal of Ace American Insurance Company. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
July 16, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION for Dismissal of Ace American Insurance Company by ACE American Insurance Company, Target Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Dismissal of Ace American Insurance Company)(Mills, Sara)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 6/30/20. Amended Pleadings due by 8/14/2020. Discovery due by 3/30/1931. Plaintiffs Expert Witness List due by 10/16/2020. Defendants Expert Witness List due by 1/8/2021. Motions due by 1/29/2021. Rule 26(a) Disclosures to be exchanged by 7/14/2020. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
June 30, 2020 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lynn Adelman: Scheduling Conference held on 6/30/2020. Proposed schedule does not state a date certain for close of discovery. Parties agree that discovery will close March 30, 2021. Court otherwise adopts parties proposed schedule. Parties are interested in mediation after some discovery. If parties wish to use court mediation services, they may contact the court at any time. Telephonic Status conference will be set for March 31, 2021 at 11:15 a.m. The court will initiate the call. (jad)
June 25, 2020 Filing 10 LETTER from Gruber Law Offices Regarding Scheduling Conference Telephone Number Update. (Knurr, Timothy)
June 11, 2020 Filing 9 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan and Proposed Discovery Plan by Barbara L Stamm. (Hermann, Nicholas)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 5/22/20. IT IS ORDERED that a telephonic Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) scheduling conference will be held on June 30, 2020 at 11:30 a.m. The court will initiate the call. The participation of the attorney who will be handling the case is required and their telephone number should be provided in the Rule 26(f) report. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
May 21, 2020 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Barbara L. Stamm. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Knurr, Timothy)
May 21, 2020 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE Statement by Barbara L. Stamm. (Knurr, Timothy)
May 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy S Knurr on behalf of Barbara L. Stamm. Attorney(s) appearing: Timothy S. Knurr (Knurr, Timothy)
May 20, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Lynn Adelman ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
May 20, 2020 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE Statement by Target Corporation. (Mills, Sara)
May 20, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara C Mills on behalf of ACE American Insurance Company, Target Corporation. Attorney(s) appearing: Sara C. Mills (Mills, Sara)
May 20, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey T Nichols on behalf of ACE American Insurance Company, Target Corporation. Attorney(s) appearing: Jeffrey T. Nichols (Nichols, Jeffrey)
May 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Target Corporation, ACE American Insurance Company from Waukesha County Circuit Court, Case Number: 20-cv-632 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3456540) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Confirmation of Service, #3 Exhibit C - Answer and Affirmative Defenses, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nichols, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stamm et al v. Target Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACE American Insurance Company
Represented By: Sara C Mills
Represented By: Jeffrey T Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Sara C Mills
Represented By: Jeffrey T Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEF Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara L. Stamm
Represented By: Nicholas L Hermann
Represented By: Patrick K Ritter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Molina Healthcare of Wisconsin Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean Health Plan Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?