Medline industries Inc v. Diversey Inc et al
Plaintiff: Medline industries Inc
Defendant: Peter Melchior, Diversey Inc. and Diversey Inc
Interested Party: Wypetech, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv01579
Filed: October 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2020 Filing 69 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Diversey Inc re #26 MOTION to Seal Document (Medline Industries, Inc.'s Motion to Seal Proposed Supplemental Brief and Exhibits), #55 MOTION to Restrict Document , #51 MOTION to Restrict Document (Medline Industries, Inc.'s Motion to Seal Medline Industries, Inc.'s Amended Complaint for Injunctive and Other Relief) . (Baish, Anthony)
December 9, 2020 Filing 68 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Wypetech, LLC re #60 MOTION to Seal Document , #26 MOTION to Seal Document (Medline Industries, Inc.'s Motion to Seal Proposed Supplemental Brief and Exhibits), #55 MOTION to Restrict Document , #51 MOTION to Restrict Document (Medline Industries, Inc.'s Motion to Seal Medline Industries, Inc.'s Amended Complaint for Injunctive and Other Relief) . (Baish, Anthony)
December 9, 2020 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony S Baish on behalf of Wypetech, LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Anthony S. Baish (Baish, Anthony)
December 3, 2020 Filing 66 DECLARATION of Peter Melchior (Baish, Anthony)
December 3, 2020 Filing 65 DECLARATION of Carolyn Cooke (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)This document and/or certain attachments are restricted to case participants and attorneys of record should use their efiling login and password to view this document(Baish, Anthony)
December 3, 2020 Filing 64 DECLARATION of Anthony Baish in Support of Diversey, Inc.'s Opposition to Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunctive Relief (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit X, #26 Exhibit Y, #27 Exhibit Z, #28 Exhibit AA, #29 Exhibit BB)This document and/or certain attachments are restricted to case participants and attorneys of record should use their efiling login and password to view this document(Baish, Anthony)
December 3, 2020 Filing 63 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Diversey Inc re #16 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunctive Relief MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Corrected Filing to Restrict to Case Participants). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)This document and/or certain attachments are restricted to case participants and attorneys of record should use their efiling login and password to view this document(Baish, Anthony)
December 3, 2020 Filing 62 UNPUBLISHED Decision Index of Unpublished Cases Cited in Diversey, Inc.'s Opposition to Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunctive Relief filed by Diversey Inc (Baish, Anthony)
December 3, 2020 Filing 61 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Diversey Inc re #16 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunctive Relief MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)This document and/or certain attachments are SEALED and only viewable by permission of the court(Baish, Anthony)
December 3, 2020 Filing 60 MOTION to Seal Document by Diversey Inc. (Baish, Anthony)
December 1, 2020 Filing 59 UNPUBLISHED Decision (Medline Industries, Inc.'s Table of Unpublished Authorities) filed by Medline industries Inc (Trigg, Stephen)
December 1, 2020 Filing 58 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Medline industries Inc re #34 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), or in the Alternative, Motion to Strike Pursuant to Rule 12(f), #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or in the Alternative, Motion to Strike Pursuant to Rule 12(f) MOTION to Strike . (Trigg, Stephen)
December 1, 2020 Filing 57 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Medline industries Inc re #37 MOTION to Stay (Redacted). (Weber, Ralph)
December 1, 2020 Filing 56 UNPUBLISHED Decision (Medline Industries, Inc.'s Table of Unpublished Authorities) filed by Medline industries Inc (Weber, Ralph)
December 1, 2020 Filing 55 MOTION to Restrict Document by Medline industries Inc. (Weber, Ralph)
December 1, 2020 Filing 54 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Medline industries Inc re #37 MOTION to Stay . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)This document and/or certain attachments are restricted to case participants and attorneys of record should use their efiling login and password to view this document(Weber, Ralph)
November 30, 2020 Filing 53 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Medline Industries, Inc,'s Amended Complaint for injunctive and Other Relief (Redacted)) with Jury Demand against Medline industries Inc filed by Medline industries Inc.(Weber, Ralph)
November 30, 2020 Filing 52 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Medline Industries, Inc.'s Amended Complaint for Injunctive and Other Relief) with Jury Demand against Medline industries Inc filed by Medline industries Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 01, #2 Exhibit 01a, #3 Exhibit 01b, #4 Exhibit 01c, #5 Exhibit 02, #6 Exhibit 03, #7 Exhibit 04, #8 Exhibit 05, #9 Exhibit 06, #10 Exhibit 07)This document and/or certain attachments are restricted to case participants and attorneys of record should use their efiling login and password to view this document(Weber, Ralph)
November 30, 2020 Filing 51 MOTION to Restrict Document (Medline Industries, Inc.'s Motion to Seal Medline Industries, Inc.'s Amended Complaint for Injunctive and Other Relief) by Medline industries Inc. (Weber, Ralph)
November 27, 2020 Filing 50 DECLARATION of Matthew W. O'Neill (O'Neill, Matthew)
November 27, 2020 Filing 49 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Peter Melchior re #42 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Discovery . (O'Neill, Matthew)
November 27, 2020 Filing 48 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Medline industries Inc re #40 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Order for Briefing Schedule . (Trigg, Stephen)
November 27, 2020 Filing 47 DECLARATION of Anthony S. Baish (Baish, Anthony)
November 27, 2020 Filing 46 UNPUBLISHED Decision Cited in Diversey's Opposition to Plaintiff's Civil L.R. 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive Motion for Expedited Discovery filed by Diversey Inc (Baish, Anthony)
November 27, 2020 Filing 45 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Diversey Inc re #42 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Discovery . (Baish, Anthony)
November 24, 2020 Filing 44 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Diversey Inc re #27 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Medline Industries, Inc.'s Civil L.R. 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief) . (Baish, Anthony)
November 20, 2020 Filing 43 DECLARATION of Ralph A. Weber (Trigg, Stephen)
November 20, 2020 Filing 42 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Discovery by Medline industries Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Discovery)(Trigg, Stephen)
November 20, 2020 Filing 41 DECLARATION of Anthony S. Baish (Baish, Anthony)
November 20, 2020 Filing 40 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Order for Briefing Schedule by Diversey Inc. (Baish, Anthony)
November 20, 2020 Filing 39 UNPUBLISHED Decision Cited in Defendants' Brief in Support of Motion to Stay filed by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P)(Baish, Anthony)
November 20, 2020 Filing 38 BRIEF in Support filed by All Defendants re #37 MOTION to Stay . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M)(Baish, Anthony)
November 20, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION to Stay by All Defendants. (Baish, Anthony)
November 19, 2020 Filing 36 UNPUBLISHED Decision in Support of Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), or in the Alternative, Motion to Strike Pursuant to Rule 12(f) filed by Peter Melchior (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Assembly Component v. Platinum Equity, #2 Exhibit Brabec v. Delmar Thomson Learning, #3 Exhibit Brice v. Resch, #4 Exhibit DRM, Inc. v. BLM Land, LLC, #5 Exhibit Fabert v. Hot Spur Partners, #6 Exhibit Raburn v. Am. Champion Aircraft, #7 Exhibit Richmond v. Advanced Pain)(O'Neill, Matthew)
November 19, 2020 Filing 35 BRIEF in Support filed by Peter Melchior re #34 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), or in the Alternative, Motion to Strike Pursuant to Rule 12(f) . (O'Neill, Matthew)
November 19, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), or in the Alternative, Motion to Strike Pursuant to Rule 12(f) by Peter Melchior. (O'Neill, Matthew)
November 19, 2020 Filing 33 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Peter Melchior. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (O'Neill, Matthew)
November 19, 2020 Filing 32 DISCLOSURE Statement by Peter Melchior. (O'Neill, Matthew)
November 19, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew W O'Neill on behalf of Peter Melchior. Attorney(s) appearing: Matthew W. O'Neill (O'Neill, Matthew)
November 18, 2020 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Medline industries Inc (Weber, Ralph)
November 18, 2020 Filing 29 ATTACHMENTS (Restricted Exhibits) by Medline industries Inc re #27 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Medline Industries, Inc.'s Civil L.R. 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 14, #2 Exhibit 15, #3 Exhibit 16, #4 Exhibit 17, #5 Envelope 18, #6 Exhibit 19, #7 Exhibit 22, #8 Exhibit 23, #9 Exhibit 24, #10 Exhibit 25, #11 Exhibit 26, #12 Exhibit 28, #13 Exhibit 29, #14 Exhibit 30, #15 Exhibit 32, #16 Exhibit 33, #17 Exhibit 34, #18 Exhibit 37)This document and/or certain attachments are restricted to case participants and attorneys of record should use their efiling login and password to view this document(Weber, Ralph)
November 18, 2020 Filing 28 ATTACHMENTS (Sealed Exhibits) by Medline industries Inc re #27 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Medline Industries, Inc.'s Civil L.R. 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 20, #2 Exhibit 21, #3 Exhibit 27, #4 Exhibit 31, #5 Exhibit 35, #6 Exhibit 36)This document and/or certain attachments are SEALED and only viewable by permission of the court(Weber, Ralph)
November 18, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Medline Industries, Inc.'s Civil L.R. 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief) by Medline industries Inc. (Weber, Ralph)
November 18, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION to Seal Document (Medline Industries, Inc.'s Motion to Seal Proposed Supplemental Brief and Exhibits) by Medline industries Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Weber, Ralph)
November 17, 2020 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Medline industries Inc (Weber, Ralph)
November 17, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE by Medline industries Inc (Notice of Withdrawal of Medline Industries, Inc.'s Civil L.R. (H) Expediated Non-Dispositive Motion for Expediated Discovery [Dkt. No. 20]) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Weber, Ralph)
November 16, 2020 Filing 23 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Diversey Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Carrino, Christie)
November 13, 2020 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Medline industries Inc (Weber, Ralph)
November 13, 2020 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Ralph A. Weber (Weber, Ralph)
November 13, 2020 Filing 20 WITHDRAWN; PURSUANT TO #24 NOTICE EXPEDITED MOTION to Expedite Discovery(Civil L.R. (H) Expediated Non-Dispositive Motion for Expediated Discovery by Medline industries Inc. (Weber, Ralph) Modified on 11/16/2020 (asc). Modified on 11/17/2020 (asc).
November 13, 2020 NOTICE of Hearing: Motion Hearing on #4 plaintiff's motion for protective order, #14 defendant's motion to dismiss/strike, #16 plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order/preliminary injunction set for 1/14/2021 at 9:30 AM by telephone before Chief Judge Pamela Pepper. Parties are to appear by calling the court's conference line at 888-557-8511 and using access code 4893665#. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
November 12, 2020 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Medline industries Inc (Weber, Ralph)
November 12, 2020 Filing 18 BRIEF in Support filed by Medline industries Inc re #16 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunctive Relief . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)(Weber, Ralph)
November 12, 2020 Filing 17 UNPUBLISHED Decision (Medline Industries, Inc.'s Table of Unpublished Authorities) filed by Medline industries Inc (Weber, Ralph)
November 12, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION Preliminary Injunctive Relief by Medline industries Inc. (Weber, Ralph). Added MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on 11/13/2020 (asc).
November 10, 2020 Filing 15 BRIEF in Support filed by Diversey Inc re #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or in the Alternative, Motion to Strike Pursuant to Rule 12(f) . (Baish, Anthony)
November 10, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or in the Alternative, MOTION to Strike Pursuant to Rule 12(f) by Diversey Inc. (Baish, Anthony). Added MOTION to Strike on 11/12/2020 (asc).
November 6, 2020 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE Statement by Diversey Inc. (Carrino, Christie)
November 3, 2020 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Timothy J. Cullen; Summons and Complaint served on 10/29/2020 on defendant. . (Trigg, Stephen) Modified on 11/4/2020 (asc).
November 3, 2020 Filing 11 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Medline industries Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Trigg, Stephen)
November 2, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Christie B Carrino on behalf of Diversey Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Christie B. Carrino (Carrino, Christie)
November 2, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony S Baish on behalf of Diversey Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Anthony S. Baish (Baish, Anthony)
November 2, 2020 Filing 8 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Diversey Inc re #4 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Protective Order . (Baish, Anthony)
November 2, 2020 NOTICE from the clerk to DEFENDANT; Diversey Inc. requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin be filed within 21 days; the form is available #here. (asc)
October 23, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Medline industries Inc (Trigg, Stephen)
October 22, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Medline industries Inc (Weber, Ralph)
October 22, 2020 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Ralph A. Weber iso Medline LR 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive Motion for Entry of Confidentiality Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-IL Action Dkt # 36, #2 Exhibit 2-IL Action Dkt # 52, #3 Exhibit 3-IL Action Dkt # 57, #4 Exhibit 4-IL Action Dkt # 111, #5 Exhibit 5-IL Action Dkt # 191)(Weber, Ralph)
October 22, 2020 Filing 4 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Protective Order by Medline industries Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proposed Confidentiality Order)(Weber, Ralph)
October 22, 2020 Filing 3 ADMISSION OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint on 10/21/2020 by Registered Agent for Diversey (Trigg, Stephen)
October 15, 2020 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The county code has been modified - please remember to choose the county for the first named plaintiff. One or more party names have been modified - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (asc)
October 15, 2020 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (asc)
October 14, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Medline industries Inc. (Weber, Ralph)
October 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Medline industries Inc by Medline industries Inc. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3603757) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 1A, #3 Exhibit 1B, #4 Exhibit 1C, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Summons Diversey, #11 Summons Melchior, #12 Civil Cover Sheet)(Weber, Ralph)
October 14, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge Pamela Pepper; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (cmb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Medline industries Inc v. Diversey Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Melchior
Represented By: Matthew W O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diversey Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diversey Inc
Represented By: Christie B Carrino
Represented By: Anthony S Baish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Medline industries Inc
Represented By: Ralph A Weber
Represented By: Stephen T Trigg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Wypetech, LLC
Represented By: Anthony S Baish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?