Holland v. Aramark Commissary
Plaintiff: Willie Holland
Defendant: Aramark Commissary
Case Number: 2:2020cv01678
Filed: November 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that on or before December 23, 2020, Holland is to submit a check or money order made payable to the Clerk of Court in the amount of $74.16 or advise the court in writing why he is not able to submit the assessed amount. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party, Sheriff, Dennis Brand)(asc)
November 23, 2020 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Willie Holland. (asc)
November 23, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Willie Holland. (asc)
November 23, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Willie Holland. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (asc)
November 10, 2020 Filing 2 LETTER from the clerk to plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. Also requesting payment of the full filing fee or that a petition to proceed without prepayment of the full filing fee and six-month certified trust account statement be filed within 21 days. (asc) (Main Document 2 replaced on 11/10/2020) (asc).
November 6, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT against Aramark Commissary by Willie Holland. (asc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holland v. Aramark Commissary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aramark Commissary
Represented By: Milwaukee County - 550, 555
Represented By: Milwaukee County - 550, 555, 2241
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?