Ebe et al v. Johnson Controls Inc
Plaintiff: United Automobile Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America, Rick Joe Limbaugh, Michae Oscar Brown, Jack Ebe and Michael Oscar Brown
Defendant: Johnson Controls Inc
Case Number: 2:2021cv00180
Filed: February 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 704
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 3/17/2021 GRANTING #8 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time. By 4/30/2021, Defendant to RESPOND to #4 Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
March 12, 2021 Filing 8 Expedited MOTION to Enlarge Time to Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Johnson Controls Inc. (Bobber, Bernard)
March 12, 2021 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE Statement by Johnson Controls Inc. (Bobber, Bernard)
March 12, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Bernard J Bobber on behalf of Johnson Controls Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Bernard J. Bobber (Bobber, Bernard)
March 1, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Johnson Controls Inc served on 2/24/2021. (Parsons, William)
February 23, 2021 Filing 4 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Johnson Controls Inc filed by Jack Ebe, Michael Oscar Brown, Rick Joe Limbaugh.(Saks, Richard) Modified on 2/24/2021 (bx).
February 17, 2021 Summons Issued as to Johnson Controls Inc. (bx)
February 17, 2021 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #2 Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge filed by Jack Ebe, United Automobile Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America, Rick Joe Limbaugh, Michae Oscar Brown ; Document must completely filled out and marked consent or refusal. This document must be RE-FILED; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (bx)
February 17, 2021 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #1 Complaint filed by Jack Ebe, United Automobile Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America, Rick Joe Limbaugh, Michae Oscar Brown ; Electronically filed documents should not be scanned whenever possible i.e Civil Cover Sheet. This document does not need to be re-filed; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (bx)
February 17, 2021 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: One or more party names have been modified (Do not add addresses or punctuation); All names on docket should match what is on the complaint - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (bx)
February 16, 2021 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE Statement by Michae Oscar Brown, Jack Ebe, Rick Joe Limbaugh, United Automobile Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America. (Saks, Richard)
February 16, 2021 Filing 2 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Saks, Richard)
February 16, 2021 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)
February 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by United Automobile Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America, Jack Ebe, Michae Oscar Brown, Rick Joe Limbaugh. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-3735229) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Saks, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ebe et al v. Johnson Controls Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Automobile Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America
Represented By: Richard Saks
Represented By: William E Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Joe Limbaugh
Represented By: Richard Saks
Represented By: William E Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michae Oscar Brown
Represented By: Richard Saks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Ebe
Represented By: Richard Saks
Represented By: William E Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Oscar Brown
Represented By: Richard Saks
Represented By: William E Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Controls Inc
Represented By: Bernard J Bobber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?