Hobbs v. Willis et al
Plaintiff: Lawrence Houston Hobbs
Defendant: Nicholas Willis, Alejandro Padilla, Tim Zarzecki, Christopher Smith, Brian Smith, John/ Doe and Mount Pleasant Police Department
Case Number: 2:2022cv00467
Filed: April 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2022 FILING FEE Received: $402.00, receipt number 89666; Service Packet Issued jcl)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 5/26/2022. #2 Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed without prepaying filing fee DENIED; plaintiff to pay full $402 filing fee by end of day 6/17/2022, failure to pay by deadline may result in dismissal. #3 Plaintiff's motion for leave to file electronically and use certain electronics in the courtroom DENIED. (cc: all counsel and mailed to Lawrence Hobbs)(cb)
April 15, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Order to File Electronically and to Use Certain Electronic Devices in the Courtroom by Lawrence Houston Hobbs. (asc)
April 15, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Lawrence Houston Hobbs. (asc)
April 15, 2022 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Lawrence Houston Hobbs. Consent forms distributed for Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate of Service)(asc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hobbs v. Willis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Houston Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Padilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Zarzecki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/ Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mount Pleasant Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?