Western Energy Alliance et al v. United States Department of Interior Secretary et al
Defendant: Deb Haaland and United States Bureau of Land Management
Petitioner: Western Energy Alliance and Petroleum Association of Wyoming
Respondent: United States Department of Interior Secretary
Intervenor: Center for Biological Diversity, Citizens for a Healthy Community, Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment, Food & Water Watch, Friends of the Earth, Montana Environmental Information Center, National Parks Conservation Association, Powder River Basin Resource Council, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, The Wilderness Society, Valley Organic Growers Association, Western Colorado Alliance, Western Organization of Resource Councils, Western Watersheds Project, WildEarth Guardians and Wilderness Workshop
Case Number: 1:2023cv00001
Filed: January 3, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Referring Judge: Scott W Skavdahl
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 30 U.S.C. ยง 181 Environment: Review of Agency Action
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2023 Filing 28 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Rose Rushing on behalf of Center for Biological Diversity, Citizens for a Healthy Community, Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment, Food & Water Watch, Montana Environmental Information Center, Powder River Basin Resource Council, Western Organization of Resource Councils, WildEarth Guardians (Rushing, Rose)
February 14, 2023 Filing 27 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Melissa A Hornbein on behalf of Center for Biological Diversity, Citizens for a Healthy Community, Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment, Food & Water Watch, Montana Environmental Information Center, Powder River Basin Resource Council, Western Organization of Resource Councils, WildEarth Guardians (Hornbein, Melissa)
February 14, 2023 Filing 26 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Kyle James Tisdel on behalf of Center for Biological Diversity, Citizens for a Healthy Community, Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment, Food & Water Watch, Montana Environmental Information Center, Powder River Basin Resource Council, Western Organization of Resource Councils, WildEarth Guardians (Tisdel, Kyle)
February 10, 2023 Filing 25 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Thomas R. Delehanty on behalf of Friends of the Earth, National Parks Conservation Association, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, The Wilderness Society, Valley Organic Growers Association, Western Colorado Alliance, Western Watersheds Project, Wilderness Workshop (Delehanty, Thomas)
February 10, 2023 Filing 24 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Michael S Freeman on behalf of Friends of the Earth, National Parks Conservation Association, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, The Wilderness Society, Valley Organic Growers Association, Western Colorado Alliance, Western Watersheds Project, Wilderness Workshop (Freeman, Michael)
February 10, 2023 FINANCIAL ENTRY: PAYMENT OF $100 RECEIVED FOR PRO HAC VICE FEE FOR ROSE E RUSHING. RECEIPT 1-109. (Court Staff, sjk)
February 10, 2023 FINANCIAL ENTRY: PAYMENT OF $100 RECEIVED FOR PRO HAC VICE FEE FOR MICHAEL S FREEMAN. RECEIPT 1-108. (Court Staff, sjk)
February 10, 2023 FINANCIAL ENTRY: PAYMENT OF $100 RECEIVED FOR PRO HAC VICE FEE FOR THOMAS R DELEHANTY. RECEIPT 1-108. (Court Staff, sjk)
February 10, 2023 FINANCIAL ENTRY: PAYMENT OF $100 RECEIVED FOR PRO HAC VICE FEE FOR KYLE TISDEL. RECEIPT 1-109. (Court Staff, sjk)
February 10, 2023 FINANCIAL ENTRY: PAYMENT OF $100 RECEIVED FOR PRO HAC VICE FEE FOR MELISSA HORNBEIN. RECEIPT 1-109. (Court Staff, sjk)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #17 Motion to Intervene. (Court Staff, sjdl)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #16 MOTION for Thomas R. Delehanty to appear pro hac vice filed by Powder River Basin Resource Council, Wilderness Workshop, Montana Environmental Information Center, Sierra Club, Western Organization of Resource Councils, Food & Water Watch, Western Watersheds Project, Center for Biological Diversity, National Parks Conservation Association, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, Friends of the Earth, The Wilderness Society, Citizens for a Healthy Community, Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment, WildEarth Guardians, Western Colorado Alliance, Valley Organic Growers Association. (cc: Counsel via email)(Court Staff, stbd)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #15 MOTION for Rose E. Rushing to appear pro hac vice filed by Powder River Basin Resource Council, Wilderness Workshop, Montana Environmental Information Center, Sierra Club, Western Organization of Resource Councils, Food & Water Watch, Western Watersheds Project, Center for Biological Diversity, National Parks Conservation Association, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, Friends of the Earth, The Wilderness Society, Citizens for a Healthy Community, Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment, WildEarth Guardians, Western Colorado Alliance, Valley Organic Growers Association. (cc: Counsel via email)(Court Staff, stbd)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #14 MOTION for Melissa Hornbein to appear pro hac vice filed by Powder River Basin Resource Council, Wilderness Workshop, Montana Environmental Information Center, Sierra Club, Western Organization of Resource Councils, Food & Water Watch, Western Watersheds Project, Center for Biological Diversity, National Parks Conservation Association, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, Friends of the Earth, The Wilderness Society, Citizens for a Healthy Community, Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment, WildEarth Guardians, Western Colorado Alliance, Valley Organic Growers Association. (cc: Counsel via email)(Court Staff, stbd)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #13 MOTION for Michael S. Freeman to appear pro hac vice filed by Powder River Basin Resource Council, Wilderness Workshop, Montana Environmental Information Center, Sierra Club, Western Organization of Resource Councils, Food & Water Watch, Western Watersheds Project, Center for Biological Diversity, National Parks Conservation Association, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, Friends of the Earth, The Wilderness Society, Citizens for a Healthy Community, Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment, WildEarth Guardians, Western Colorado Alliance, Valley Organic Growers Association. (cc: Counsel via email) (Court Staff, stbd)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #12 MOTION for Kyle Tisdel to appear pro hac vice filed by Powder River Basin Resource Council, Wilderness Workshop, Montana Environmental Information Center, Sierra Club, Western Organization of Resource Councils, Food & Water Watch, Western Watersheds Project, Center for Biological Diversity, National Parks Conservation Association, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, Friends of the Earth, The Wilderness Society, Citizens for a Healthy Community, Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment, WildEarth Guardians, Western Colorado Alliance, Valley Organic Growers Association. (cc: Counsel via email)(Court Staff, stbd)
February 8, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION to Intervene filed by Intervenor Respondents Center for Biological Diversity, Citizens for a Healthy Community, Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment, Food & Water Watch, Friends of the Earth, Montana Environmental Information Center, National Parks Conservation Association, Powder River Basin Resource Council, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, The Wilderness Society, Valley Organic Growers Association, Western Colorado Alliance, Western Organization of Resource Councils, Western Watersheds Project, WildEarth Guardians, Wilderness Workshop. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Supporting Declarations, #2 Proposed Order)(Anderson, Shannon)
February 7, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Thomas R. Delehanty to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Intervenor Respondents Center for Biological Diversity, Citizens for a Healthy Community, Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment, Food & Water Watch, Friends of the Earth, Montana Environmental Information Center, National Parks Conservation Association, Powder River Basin Resource Council, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, The Wilderness Society, Valley Organic Growers Association, Western Colorado Alliance, Western Organization of Resource Councils, Western Watersheds Project, WildEarth Guardians, Wilderness Workshop. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Thomas R. Delehanty, #2 Proposed Order)(Anderson, Shannon)
February 7, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Rose E. Rushing to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Intervenor Respondents Center for Biological Diversity, Citizens for a Healthy Community, Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment, Food & Water Watch, Friends of the Earth, Montana Environmental Information Center, National Parks Conservation Association, Powder River Basin Resource Council, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, The Wilderness Society, Valley Organic Growers Association, Western Colorado Alliance, Western Organization of Resource Councils, Western Watersheds Project, WildEarth Guardians, Wilderness Workshop. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Rose E. Rushing, #2 Proposed Order)(Anderson, Shannon)
February 7, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Melissa Hornbein to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Intervenor Respondents Center for Biological Diversity, Citizens for a Healthy Community, Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment, Food & Water Watch, Friends of the Earth, Montana Environmental Information Center, National Parks Conservation Association, Powder River Basin Resource Council, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, The Wilderness Society, Valley Organic Growers Association, Western Colorado Alliance, Western Organization of Resource Councils, Western Watersheds Project, WildEarth Guardians, Wilderness Workshop. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Melissa Hornbein, #2 Proposed Order)(Anderson, Shannon)
February 7, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Michael S. Freeman to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Intervenor Respondents Center for Biological Diversity, Citizens for a Healthy Community, Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment, Food & Water Watch, Friends of the Earth, Montana Environmental Information Center, National Parks Conservation Association, Powder River Basin Resource Council, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, The Wilderness Society, Valley Organic Growers Association, Western Colorado Alliance, Western Organization of Resource Councils, Western Watersheds Project, WildEarth Guardians, Wilderness Workshop. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Michael S. Freeman, #2 Proposed Order)(Anderson, Shannon)
February 7, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Kyle Tisdel to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Intervenor Respondents Center for Biological Diversity, Citizens for a Healthy Community, Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment, Food & Water Watch, Friends of the Earth, Montana Environmental Information Center, National Parks Conservation Association, Powder River Basin Resource Council, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, The Wilderness Society, Valley Organic Growers Association, Western Colorado Alliance, Western Organization of Resource Councils, Western Watersheds Project, WildEarth Guardians, Wilderness Workshop. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Kyle Tisdel, #2 Proposed Order)(Anderson, Shannon)
February 7, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shannon Anderson on behalf of Center for Biological Diversity, Citizens for a Healthy Community, Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment, Food & Water Watch, Friends of the Earth, Montana Environmental Information Center, National Parks Conservation Association, Powder River Basin Resource Council, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, The Wilderness Society, Valley Organic Growers Association, Western Colorado Alliance, Western Organization of Resource Councils, Western Watersheds Project, WildEarth Guardians, Wilderness Workshop (Anderson, Shannon)
January 26, 2023 Filing 10 Summonses Issued. (Court Staff, skb)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 MOTION for Michael S. Sawyer to appear pro hac vice; filed by United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of Interior Secretary by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin.(Court Staff, stbd) Modified text on 1/30/2023 (Court Staff, stbd).
January 26, 2023 Filing 8 DISREGARD - FILED IN ERROR - ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #6 MOTION for Michael S. Sawyer to appear pro hac vice; filed by United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of Interior Secretary. (Court Staff, stbd) Modified on 1/26/2023 (Court Staff, stbd). Modified text on 1/30/2023 (Court Staff, stbd).
January 26, 2023 Filing 7 Praecipe for Summons for Petition for Review of Government Action filed by Petitioners Petroleum Association of Wyoming, Western Energy Alliance (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit) (Obrecht, Alexander) (Attachments 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6 replaced to correct fillable forms on 1/26/2023)
January 25, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Michael S. Sawyer to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Respondents United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of Interior Secretary. (Attachments: #1 Sawyer Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Martin, C)
January 25, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by C Levi Martin on behalf of United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of Interior Secretary (Martin, C)
January 3, 2023 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Scott W. Skavdahl (presiding) and the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin (referral). (Court Staff, sal)
January 3, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Related Case by Petitioners Petroleum Association of Wyoming, Western Energy Alliance (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 12/5/22 Petition for Review (Case No. 22-cv-252)) (Obrecht, Alexander) Modified text on 1/13/2023 (Court Staff, skb).
January 3, 2023 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by Petroleum Association of Wyoming, Western Energy Alliance. (Obrecht, Alexander) Modified text on 1/10/2023 (Court Staff, skb).
January 3, 2023 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REVIEW. ( Filing fee $402 receipt #AWYDC-2205206.), filed by Western Energy Alliance, Petroleum Association of Wyoming. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Obrecht, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Western Energy Alliance et al v. United States Department of Interior Secretary et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Department of Interior Secretary
Represented By: C Levi Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Western Energy Alliance
Represented By: Lyle Poe Leggette
Represented By: Mark S Barron
Represented By: Alexander Karl Obrecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Petroleum Association of Wyoming
Represented By: Alexander Karl Obrecht
Represented By: Lyle Poe Leggette
Represented By: Mark S Barron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deb Haaland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Bureau of Land Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Melissa A Hornbein
Represented By: Rose Rushing
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Represented By: Kyle James Tisdel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Citizens for a Healthy Community
Represented By: Kyle James Tisdel
Represented By: Melissa A Hornbein
Represented By: Rose Rushing
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment
Represented By: Melissa A Hornbein
Represented By: Rose Rushing
Represented By: Kyle James Tisdel
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Food & Water Watch
Represented By: Kyle James Tisdel
Represented By: Melissa A Hornbein
Represented By: Rose Rushing
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Friends of the Earth
Represented By: Michael S Freeman
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Represented By: Thomas R. Delehanty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Montana Environmental Information Center
Represented By: Melissa A Hornbein
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Represented By: Rose Rushing
Represented By: Kyle James Tisdel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: National Parks Conservation Association
Represented By: Michael S Freeman
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Represented By: Thomas R. Delehanty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Powder River Basin Resource Council
Represented By: Melissa A Hornbein
Represented By: Kyle James Tisdel
Represented By: Rose Rushing
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Sierra Club
Represented By: Michael S Freeman
Represented By: Thomas R. Delehanty
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance
Represented By: Michael S Freeman
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Represented By: Thomas R. Delehanty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: The Wilderness Society
Represented By: Thomas R. Delehanty
Represented By: Michael S Freeman
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Valley Organic Growers Association
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Represented By: Thomas R. Delehanty
Represented By: Michael S Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Western Colorado Alliance
Represented By: Michael S Freeman
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Represented By: Thomas R. Delehanty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Western Organization of Resource Councils
Represented By: Kyle James Tisdel
Represented By: Melissa A Hornbein
Represented By: Rose Rushing
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Western Watersheds Project
Represented By: Michael S Freeman
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Represented By: Thomas R. Delehanty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: WildEarth Guardians
Represented By: Rose Rushing
Represented By: Kyle James Tisdel
Represented By: Melissa A Hornbein
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Wilderness Workshop
Represented By: Michael S Freeman
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Represented By: Thomas R. Delehanty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?