Western Energy Alliance v. Biden et al
Petitioner: Western Energy Alliance, Petroleum Association of Wyoming and State of Wyoming
Respondent: United States of America President, United States Acting Secretary of Interior, Scott De La Vega, Joseph R Biden, Jr, United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of Interior Acting Secretary, United States Department of Interior Secretary, Deb Haaland, Bureau of Land Management Wyoming State Office Acting Director, Bureau of Land Management Acting Director, Nada Culver, Kim Liebhauser, United States Department of Interior and Bureau of Land Management
Intervenor: Conservation Colorado, Western Colorado Alliance, Western Watersheds Project, Alterra Mountain Company, Roan Creek Ranch, Hunt to Eat, Citizens for a Healthy Community, Western Spirit Cycling, Valley Organic Growers Association, Food & Water Watch, Sierra Club, WildEarth Guardians, Aspen Skiing Company, Thistle Whistle Farm, National Parks Conservation Association, Powder River Basin Resource Council, Earthworks, Montana Environmental Information Center, The Wilderness Society, Western Organization of Resource Councils, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, Center for Biological Diversity, Wilderness Workshop, Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment, Friends of the Earth, Indian People's Action and Great Old Broads for Wilderness
Amicus Curiae: Western Leaders Network
Case Number: 2:2021cv00013
Filed: January 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Referring Judge: Scott W Skavdahl
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2022 Filing 118 NOTICE by Petitioner State of Wyoming of Withdrawal of Counsel Associated Cases: 2:21-cv-00013-SWS, 2:21-cv-00056-SWS (Kaste, James)
September 20, 2022 Filing 117 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by D. David DeWald on behalf of State of Wyoming Associated Cases: 2:21-cv-00013-SWS, 2:21-cv-00056-SWS (DeWald, D. David)
September 2, 2022 Filing 116 JUDGMENT in favor of Respondents against Petitioners by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl. Associated Cases: 2:21-cv-00013-SWS, 2:21-cv-00056-SWS (Court Staff, skb) The AO133 Bill of Cost form is available at https://www.wyd.uscourts.gov/forms/bill-costs.
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER UPHOLDING AGENCY ACTION ON JUDICIAL REVIEW re (1 in 2:21-cv-00013-SWS) Petition for Review filed by Western Energy Alliance by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl. It is ORDERED that Petitioners lack standing to challenge the DOI's failure to conduct second-quarter 2021 oil and gas lease sales, and the DOI's decisions to postpone the March 2021 oil and gas lease sales are hereby AFFIRMED. Associated Cases: 2:21-cv-00013-SWS, 2:21-cv-00056-SWS (Court Staff, skb)
September 1, 2022 Filing 114 NOTICE of Response to Federal Respondents' Second Rule 28(j) Letter by Petitioners Petroleum Association of Wyoming, Western Energy Alliance re (113 in 2:21-cv-00013-SWS) Associated Cases: 2:21-cv-00013-SWS, 2:21-cv-00056-SWS (Barron, Mark) Modified text on 9/2/2022 (Court Staff, skb).
August 31, 2022 Filing 113 NOTICE by Respondents Bureau of Land Management, Bureau of Land Management Acting Director, Bureau of Land Management Wyoming State Office Acting Director, United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of Interior, United States Department of Interior Secretary, United States of America President, Bureau of Land Management, Bureau of Land Management Acting Director, Bureau of Land Management Wyoming State Office Acting Director, United States Department of Interior, United States Department of Interior Secretary of Letter under Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 28(j) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Fifth Circuit Opinion, #2 Exhibit B - Western District of Louisiana Opinion) Associated Cases: 2:21-cv-00013-SWS, 2:21-cv-00056-SWS (Sawyer, Michael)
June 2, 2022 Filing 112 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Hearing Proceedings, Oral Arguments on Review of Agency Action held on 5/13/2022 before Judge Scott W. Skavdahl. To purchase a copy of this transcript, please contact Court Reporter Jan Davis, phone (307) 433-2154 or email jbd.davis@gmail.com. A party must file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction within 7 calendar days. If a party fails to request redaction, the unredacted transcript attached to this entry will be made available electronically without redaction. Notice of Intent to Redact due 6/9/2022. Notice of Redaction Request due 6/23/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/4/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/31/2022. Associated Cases: 2:21-cv-00013-SWS, 2:21-cv-00056-SWS (Davis, Jan)
May 26, 2022 Filing 111 NOTICE by Petitioners Petroleum Association of Wyoming, Western Energy Alliance re (117 in 2:21-cv-00056-SWS) of Response to Federal Respondents' Rule 28(j) Letter Associated Cases: 2:21-cv-00013-SWS, 2:21-cv-00056-SWS (Barron, Mark) Modified text and removed excess punctuation on 5/27/2022 (Court Staff, skb).
May 24, 2022 Filing 110 NOTICE by Respondents Bureau of Land Management, Bureau of Land Management Acting Director, Bureau of Land Management Wyoming State Office Acting Director, United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of Interior, United States Department of Interior Secretary, United States of America President, Bureau of Land Management, Bureau of Land Management Acting Director, Bureau of Land Management Wyoming State Office Acting Director, United States Department of Interior, United States Department of Interior Secretary of Letter under Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 28(j) (Attachments: #1 Protest) Associated Cases: 2:21-cv-00013-SWS, 2:21-cv-00056-SWS (Sawyer, Michael)
May 13, 2022 Filing 109 MINUTES for proceedings held before Honorable Scott W Skavdahl: Court will take matter under advisement.In Court Hearing held on 5/13/2022. (Court Reporter Jan Davis.) (Court Staff, smxb)
April 22, 2022 Filing 108 NOTICE by Respondents Bureau of Land Management, Bureau of Land Management Acting Director, Bureau of Land Management Wyoming State Office Acting Director, United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of Interior, United States Department of Interior Secretary, United States of America President, Bureau of Land Management, Bureau of Land Management Acting Director, Bureau of Land Management Wyoming State Office Acting Director, United States Department of Interior, United States Department of Interior Secretary of Competitive Lease Sale Activity (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Utah Notice of Sale, #2 Exhibit B - Nevada Notice of Sale, #3 Exhibit C - New Mexico Notice of Sale, #4 Exhibit D - Colorado Notice of Sale, #5 Exhibit E - Wyoming Notice of Sale, #6 Exhibit F - Montana Notice of Sale, #7 Exhibit G - BLM Fact Sheet, #8 Exhibit H - Declaration of Peter Cowan, #9 Exhibit I - Declaration of Dominic J. Mancini, #10 Exhibit J - Motion to Stay, #11 Exhibit K - Rehearing Denial) Associated Cases: 0:21-cv-00013-SWS, 0:21-cv-00056-SWS (Sawyer, Michael) (Attachment 3 replaced on 4/29/2022 to correct pagination) (Court Staff, skb).
April 5, 2022 Filing 107 (TEXT-ONLY) NOTICE of Hearing: IN-PERSON Oral Arguments RESET for 5/13/2022 09:30 AM in Cheyenne Courtroom No. 3 (Room No. 2104) before Honorable Scott W Skavdahl. Associated Cases: 0:21-cv-00013-SWS, 0:21-cv-00056-SWS (Court Staff, scat)
March 14, 2022 Filing 106 (TEXT-ONLY) ORDER SETTING HEARING: by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl. REQUEST for hearing on merits (Document 105 in 21-CV-13 and Document 112 in 21-CV-56) is GRANTED. ) Oral Arguments set for 5/13/2022 10:00 AM in Casper Courtroom No. 2 (Room No. 204) before Honorable Scott W Skavdahl. E-mail will be sent to counsel advising of time that will be allowed. Associated Cases: 0:21-cv-00013-SWS, 0:21-cv-00056-SWS (Court Staff, scat)
March 10, 2022 Filing 105 REQUEST for hearing on merits by Petitioners Petroleum Association of Wyoming, Western Energy Alliance. Associated Cases: 0:21-cv-00013-SWS, 0:21-cv-00056-SWS (Barron, Mark)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl granting (100) Motion to File Excess Pages in case 0:21-cv-00013-SWS; granting (107) Motion to File Excess Pages in case 0:21-cv-00056-SWS Associated Cases: 0:21-cv-00013-SWS, 0:21-cv-00056-SWS. Petitioners may file a reply memorandum in support of Petitioners' arguments on the merits of 7,163 words (excluding the caption page, signature block, and certificate of service). (Court Staff, skb)
October 20, 2021 Filing 103 Amicus BRIEF filed by Amicus Western Leaders Network. Associated Cases: 0:21-cv-00013-SWS, 0:21-cv-00056-SWS (Hayes, Megan)
October 19, 2021 Filing 102 ERRATA re (100 in 0:21-cv-00013-SWS) MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages regarding Reply in Support of Petition for Review of Government Action by Petitioners Petroleum Association of Wyoming, Western Energy Alliance. Associated Cases: 0:21-cv-00013-SWS, 0:21-cv-00056-SWS (Barron, Mark)
October 19, 2021 Filing 101 REPLY BRIEF re (73 in 0:21-cv-00013-SWS) Brief in Support of Petitioners' Arguments on the Merits filed by Petitioners Petroleum Association of Wyoming, Western Energy Alliance. Associated Cases: 0:21-cv-00013-SWS, 0:21-cv-00056-SWS (Barron, Mark)
October 19, 2021 Filing 100 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages regarding Reply in Support of Petition for Review of Government Action filed by Petitioners Petroleum Association of Wyoming, Western Energy Alliance. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Exceed Word Limits)Associated Cases: 0:21-cv-00013-SWS, 0:21-cv-00056-SWS(Barron, Mark)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting (91) Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief in case 0:21-cv-00013-SWS. Western Leaders Network shall file the Amicus Curiae Brief within 3 business days of this Order. Associated Cases: 0:21-cv-00013-SWS, 0:21-cv-00056-SWS(Court Staff, sag)
October 19, 2021 Filing 98 REPLY BRIEF in Support of Petition for Agency Review filed by Petitioner State of Wyoming. Associated Cases: 0:21-cv-00013-SWS, 0:21-cv-00056-SWS (Jordan, Travis)
October 18, 2021 Filing 97 RESPONSE to (91 in 0:21-cv-00013-SWS) Motion for Order, filed by Respondents Bureau of Land Management Acting Director, Bureau of Land Management Wyoming State Office Acting Director, United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of Interior, United States Department of Interior Secretary, United States of America President. Associated Cases: 0:21-cv-00013-SWS, 0:21-cv-00056-SWS (Sawyer, Michael)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl granting (95) Motion to File Excess Pages in case 0:21-cv-00013-SWS; granting (102) Motion to File Excess Pages in case 0:21-cv-00056-SWS. Associated Cases: 0:21-cv-00013-SWS, 0:21-cv-00056-SWS. It is ORDERED Petitioner, State of Wyoming may file a 7,250 word reply brief (excluding the caption page, tables of contents and authorities, signature block and certificate of service) in support of its Petition for Review of Agency Action. (Court Staff, skb)
October 15, 2021 Filing 95 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages regarding Reply Brief in Support of Petition for Review of Final Agency Action filed by Petitioner State of Wyoming. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 0:21-cv-00013-SWS, 0:21-cv-00056-SWS(Jordan, Travis)
October 15, 2021 Filing 94 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Wyatt Gregory Sassman on behalf of Western Leaders Network Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AWYDC-2012188. Associated Cases: 0:21-cv-00013-SWS, 0:21-cv-00056-SWS (Sassman, Wyatt) Modified on 10/18/2021 to correct receipt number, missing "A" (Court Staff, sjk).
October 13, 2021 Filing 93 (TEXT-ONLY) ORDER re (91 in 0:21-cv-00013-SWS) MOTION for Order Leave to file amicus brief filed by Western Leaders Network by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin. The Court orders Respondents to state their position on Western Leaders Network's proposed Amicus Curiae Brief on or before 10/18/21.Associated Cases: 0:21-cv-00013-SWS, 0:21-cv-00056-SWS(Court Staff, sag)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting (90) MOTION for Wyatt Sassman to appear pro hac vice & (97) MOTION for Wyatt Sassman to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered. Associated Cases: 0:21-cv-00013-SWS, 0:21-cv-00056-SWS(Email to Counsel)(Court Staff, stbd)
October 12, 2021 Filing 91 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Order Leave to file amicus brief filed by Amicus Western Leaders Network. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 0:21-cv-00013-SWS, 0:21-cv-00056-SWS(Hayes, Megan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/12/2021: #2 Proposed Amicus Brief) (Court Staff, szf).
October 12, 2021 Filing 90 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Wyatt Sassman to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Amicus Western Leaders Network. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 0:21-cv-00013-SWS, 0:21-cv-00056-SWS(Hayes, Megan)
October 12, 2021 Filing 89 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Megan Hayes on behalf of Western Leaders Network Associated Cases: 0:21-cv-00013-SWS, 0:21-cv-00056-SWS (Hayes, Megan)
October 5, 2021 Filing 88 RESPONSE to (73 in 0:21-cv-00013-SWS) Brief, (74 in 0:21-cv-00013-SWS) Brief filed by Intervenor Respondents Alterra Mountain Company, Aspen Skiing Company, Hunt to Eat, Roan Creek Ranch, Thistle Whistle Farm, Western Spirit Cycling. Associated Cases: 0:21-cv-00013-SWS, 0:21-cv-00056-SWS (Matsumoto, Sarah)
October 5, 2021 Filing 87 RESPONSE to (74 in 0:21-cv-00013-SWS) Brief filed by Respondents Bureau of Land Management, Bureau of Land Management Acting Director, Bureau of Land Management Wyoming State Office Acting Director, United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of Interior, United States Department of Interior Secretary, United States of America President. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Merry Gamper, #2 Exhibit 1 - Senate Hearing, #3 Exhibit 2 - House Hearing, #4 Exhibit 3 - Stipulation of Dismissal, #5 Exhibit 4 - BLM Manual, #6 Exhibit 5 - Letter, #7 Exhibit 6 - Letter) Associated Cases: 0:21-cv-00013-SWS, 0:21-cv-00056-SWS (Sawyer, Michael)
October 5, 2021 Filing 86 RESPONSE to (73 in 0:21-cv-00013-SWS) Brief filed by Respondents Bureau of Land Management, Bureau of Land Management Acting Director, Bureau of Land Management Wyoming State Office Acting Director, United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of Interior, United States Department of Interior Secretary, United States of America President. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Merry Gamper, #2 Exhibit 1 - Senate Hearing, #3 Exhibit 2 - House Hearing, #4 Exhibit 3 - Stipulation of Dismissal, #5 Exhibit 4 - BLM Manual) Associated Cases: 0:21-cv-00013-SWS, 0:21-cv-00056-SWS (Sawyer, Michael)
October 5, 2021 Filing 85 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Susan Cook on behalf of Alterra Mountain Company, Aspen Skiing Company, Hunt to Eat, Roan Creek Ranch, Thistle Whistle Farm, Western Spirit Cycling Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AWYDC-2007530. Associated Cases: 0:21-cv-00013-SWS, 0:21-cv-00056-SWS (Cook, Susan) Modified on 10/5/2021 to edit receipt number as it was missing a letter(Court Staff, sjk).
October 5, 2021 Filing 84 BRIEF Conservation Groups' Response Brief on Merits re (73 in 0:21-cv-00013-SWS) Brief, (74 in 0:21-cv-00013-SWS) Brief filed by Intervenor Respondents Center for Biological Diversity, Citizens for a Healthy Community, Conservation Colorado, Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment, Earthworks, Food & Water Watch, Friends of the Earth, Great Old Broads for Wilderness, Indian People's Action, Montana Environmental Information Center, National Parks Conservation Association, Powder River Basin Resource Council, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, The Wilderness Society, Valley Organic Growers Association, Western Colorado Alliance, Western Organization of Resource Councils, Western Watersheds Project, WildEarth Guardians, Wilderness Workshop. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -Senate Report 100-188) Associated Cases: 0:21-cv-00013-SWS, 0:21-cv-00056-SWS (Freeman, Michael)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting (82) Motion for Extension of Time in case 0:21-cv-00013-SWS. The time to file responsive briefs is extended to October 5, 2021. Associated Cases: 0:21-cv-00013-SWS, 0:21-cv-00056-SWS(Court Staff, sag)
September 22, 2021 Filing 82 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of Response Brief Deadline filed by Respondents Bureau of Land Management, Bureau of Land Management Acting Director, Bureau of Land Management Wyoming State Office Acting Director, United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of Interior, United States Department of Interior Secretary, United States of America President. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 0:21-cv-00013-SWS, 0:21-cv-00056-SWS(Sawyer, Michael)
September 15, 2021 Filing 81 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Sarah Matsumoto on behalf of Alterra Mountain Company, Aspen Skiing Company, Hunt to Eat, Roan Creek Ranch, Thistle Whistle Farm, Western Spirit Cycling, Aspen Skiing Company, Hunt to Eat, Roan Creek Ranch, Thistle Whistle Farm, Western Spirit Cycling Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AWYDC-1995852. Associated Cases: 0:21-cv-00013-SWS, 0:21-cv-00056-SWS (Matsumoto, Sarah)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER GRANTING ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF SARAH A. MATSUMOTO AS COUNSEL FOR THE INTERVENOR-RESPONDENTS ALTERRA MOUNTAIN COMPANY, ASPEN SKIING COMPANY, HUNT TO EAT, ROAN CREEK RANCH, THISTLE WHISTLE FARM & WESTERN SPIRIT CYCLING by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting (79) First MOTION for Sarah A. Matsumoto to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Roan Creek Ranch, Western Spirit Cycling, Thistle Whistle Farm, Aspen Skiing Company, Alterra Mountain Company, Hunt to Eat in case 0:21-cv-00013-SWSAssociated Cases: 0:21-cv-00013-SWS, 0:21-cv-00056-SWS(cc: Email to Counsel)(Court Staff, stbd) Modified text on 9/14/2021 (Court Staff, stbd).
September 13, 2021 Filing 79 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. First MOTION for Sarah A. Matsumoto to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Intervenor Respondents Alterra Mountain Company, Aspen Skiing Company, Hunt to Eat, Roan Creek Ranch, Thistle Whistle Farm, Western Spirit Cycling. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Sarah A. Matsumoto, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting)Associated Cases: 0:21-cv-00013-SWS, 0:21-cv-00056-SWS(Moats, Bruce)
September 9, 2021 Filing 78 NOTICE by Intervenor Respondent Alterra Mountain Company Withdrawal of Kellan Smith Associated Cases: 0:21-cv-00013-SWS, 0:21-cv-00056-SWS (Smith, Kellan)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER GRANTING ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF SUSAN P. COOK AS COUNSEL FOR THE INTERVENOR-RESPONDENTS ALTERRA MOUNTAIN COMPANY,ASPEN SKIING COMPANY, HUNT TO EAT, ROAN CREEK RANCH, THISTLE WHISTLE FARM & WESTERN SPIRIT CYCLING by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin re (76) First MOTION for Susan P. Cook to appear pro hac vice. Associated Cases: 0:21-cv-00013-SWS, 0:21-cv-00056-SWS(cc: Email to Counsel)(Court Staff, stbd)
September 8, 2021 Filing 76 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. First MOTION for Susan P. Cook to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Intervenor Respondents Alterra Mountain Company, Aspen Skiing Company, Hunt to Eat, Roan Creek Ranch, Thistle Whistle Farm, Western Spirit Cycling. Associated Cases: 0:21-cv-00013-SWS, 0:21-cv-00056-SWS(Moats, Bruce) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/8/2021: #1 Affidavit Susan P. Cook) (Court Staff, stbd).
September 8, 2021 Filing 75 DOCKETED INCORRECTLY - MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. First MOTION for Susan P. Cook to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Intervenor Respondents Alterra Mountain Company, Aspen Skiing Company, Hunt to Eat, Roan Creek Ranch, Thistle Whistle Farm, Western Spirit Cycling. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)Associated Cases: 0:21-cv-00013-SWS, 0:21-cv-00056-SWS(Moats, Bruce) Modified text on 9/8/2021 (Court Staff, stbd).
August 30, 2021 Filing 74 Petitioner State of Wyoming's Opening BRIEF filed by Petitioner State of Wyoming. Associated Cases: 0:21-cv-00013-SWS, 0:21-cv-00056-SWS (Jordan, Travis)
August 30, 2021 Filing 73 Petitioner's Opening BRIEF filed by Petitioner Western Energy Alliance. Associated Cases: 0:21-cv-00013-SWS, 0:21-cv-00056-SWS (Barron, Mark)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting (70) Motion for Extension of Time in case 0:21-cv-00013-SWS. Petitioners have until August 11, 2021 to file a motion to complete the administrative record pursuant to Local Rule 83.6(b)(3).Associated Cases: 0:21-cv-00013-SWS, 0:21-cv-00056-SWS. (Court Staff, smh)
August 4, 2021 Filing 71 NOTICE of Filing Supplemental Administrative Record by Respondents Bureau of Land Management, Bureau of Land Management Acting Director, Bureau of Land Management Wyoming State Office Acting Director, United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of Interior, United States Department of Interior Secretary, United States of America President, Bureau of Land Management, Bureau of Land Management Acting Director, Bureau of Land Management Wyoming State Office Acting Director, United States Department of Interior, United States Department of Interior Secretary (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Merry Gamper, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 BLM_I001185-1913, #4 BLM_I001914-2414, #5 BLM_I002415-2683) Associated Cases: 0:21-cv-00013-SWS, 0:21-cv-00056-SWS (Sawyer, Michael) Modified text on 8/10/2021 (Court Staff, skb).
August 4, 2021 Filing 70 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. Third MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of Motion to Complete the Administrative Record Deadline of Petitioner State of Wyoming filed by Petitioner State of Wyoming. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 0:21-cv-00013-SWS, 0:21-cv-00056-SWS(Jordan, Travis)
July 30, 2021 Filing 69 NOTICE by Intervenor Respondents Alterra Mountain Company, Aspen Skiing Company, Hunt to Eat, Roan Creek Ranch, Thistle Whistle Farm, Western Spirit Cycling of Withdrawal of Neil Levine as Counsel Associated Cases: 0:21-cv-00013-SWS, 0:21-cv-00056-SWS (Levine, Neil)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting (67) Motion for Extension of Time in case 0:21-cv-00013-SWS. Petitioners have until August 4, 2021 to file amotion to complete the administrative record pursuant to Local Rule 83.6(b)(3).IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioners have until September 7, 2021 to file opening briefs in the above-captioned case. Associated Cases: 0:21-cv-00013-SWS, 0:21-cv-00056-SWS(Court Staff, smh) Modified text on 7/23/2021 (Court Staff, sjlg).
July 19, 2021 Filing 67 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. Second MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of the deadline to file a Motion to Complete the Administrative Record filed by Petitioner State of Wyoming. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 0:21-cv-00013-SWS, 0:21-cv-00056-SWS(Jordan, Travis)
July 7, 2021 Filing 66 (TEXT-ONLY) ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #65 Motion for Extension of Time in case 0:21-cv-00013-SWS. Petitioners have until July 21, 2021, to file a motion to complete the administrative record pursuant to Local Rule 83.6(b)(3).It is further Ordered that Petitioners have until August 23, 2021, to file opening briefs in the above-captioned case. Associated Cases: 0:21-cv-00013-SWS, 0:21-cv-00056-SWS(Court Staff, smh) Modified text on 7/26/2021 (Court Staff, stbd).
July 6, 2021 Filing 65 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of deadline to file Motion to Complete the Administrative Record filed by Petitioner State of Wyoming. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 0:21-cv-00013-SWS, 0:21-cv-00056-SWS(Jordan, Travis)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl DISMISSED AS MOOT WITHOUT PREJUDICE (41) Motion for Preliminary Injunction in case 0:21-cv-00013-SWS; DISMISSED AS MOOT WITHOUT PREJUDICE (44) Motion for Preliminary Injunction in case 0:21-cv-00056-SWS. Petitioners may renew their requests for preliminary relief if the current preliminary injunction issued by the Western District of Louisiana is vacated, withdrawn, or otherwise altered in a material manner. This judicial review of administrative action is not stayed, and the parties should continue to proceed in accordance with Local Civil Rule 83.6. Associated Cases: 0:21-cv-00013-SWS, 0:21-cv-00056-SWS (Court Staff, skb) Modified text on 6/30/2021 (Court Staff, skb).
June 23, 2021 Filing 63 RESPONSE to (55 in 0:21-cv-00013-SWS, 55 in 0:21-cv-00013-SWS) Order, filed by Respondents Bureau of Land Management, Bureau of Land Management Acting Director, Bureau of Land Management Wyoming State Office Acting Director, United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of Interior, United States Department of Interior Secretary, United States of America President. Associated Cases: 0:21-cv-00013-SWS, 0:21-cv-00056-SWS (Sawyer, Michael)
June 23, 2021 Filing 62 NOTICE of Filing Administrative Record by Respondents Bureau of Land Management, Bureau of Land Management Acting Director, Bureau of Land Management Wyoming State Office Acting Director, United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of Interior, United States Department of Interior Secretary, United States of America President, Bureau of Land Management, Bureau of Land Management Acting Director, Bureau of Land Management Wyoming State Office Acting Director, United States Department of Interior, United States Department of Interior Secretary (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Merry Gamper, #2 Exhibit 1 - Administrative Record Index, #3 BLM_I000001-796, #4 BLM_I000797-1132, #5 BLM_I001133-1184) Associated Cases: 0:21-cv-00013-SWS, 0:21-cv-00056-SWS (Sawyer, Michael)
June 23, 2021 Filing 61 RESPONSE to (55 in 0:21-cv-00013-SWS, 55 in 0:21-cv-00013-SWS) Order, (Proposed Stay of Proceedings) filed by Petitioners Petroleum Association of Wyoming, Western Energy Alliance. Associated Cases: 0:21-cv-00013-SWS, 0:21-cv-00056-SWS (Barron, Mark)
June 23, 2021 Filing 60 NON-PUBLIC DOCUMENT pursuant to the Judicial Conference Policy on Privacy and Public Access - RESPONSE to (55 in 0:21-cv-00013-SWS, 55 in 0:21-cv-00013-SWS) Order, filed by Intervenor Respondents Center for Biological Diversity, Citizens for a Healthy Community, Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment, Earthworks, Food & Water Watch, Indian People's Action, Montana Environmental Information Center, Powder River Basin Resource Council, Western Organization of Resource Councils, Wild Earth Guardians, Conservation Colorado, Friends of the Earth, Great Old Broads for Wilderness, National Parks Conservation Association, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, The Wilderness Society, Valley Organic Growers Association, Western Colorado Alliance, Western Watersheds Project, Wilderness Workshop. Associated Cases: 0:21-cv-00013-SWS, 0:21-cv-00056-SWS (Freeman, Michael) Modified restriction and filers per request of counsel on 6/24/2021 (Court Staff, scat).
June 23, 2021 Filing 59 RESPONSE to (55 in 0:21-cv-00013-SWS, 55 in 0:21-cv-00013-SWS) Order, filed by Petitioner State of Wyoming. Associated Cases: 0:21-cv-00013-SWS, 0:21-cv-00056-SWS (Jordan, Travis)
June 23, 2021 Filing 58 RESPONSE to (55 in 0:21-cv-00013-SWS, 55 in 0:21-cv-00013-SWS) Order, filed by Intervenor Respondent Alterra Mountain Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) Associated Cases: 0:21-cv-00013-SWS, 0:21-cv-00056-SWS (Levine, Neil)
June 17, 2021 Filing 57 REPLY BRIEF re (41 in 0:21-cv-00013-SWS) Motion for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Petitioners Petroleum Association of Wyoming, Western Energy Alliance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attach. D, Ballard Decl.) Associated Cases: 0:21-cv-00013-SWS, 0:21-cv-00056-SWS (Barron, Mark)
June 17, 2021 Filing 56 REPLY to (51 in 0:21-cv-00013-SWS) Response in Opposition to Motion, (52 in 0:21-cv-00013-SWS) Opposition, (50 in 0:21-cv-00013-SWS) Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Petitioner State of Wyoming. Associated Cases: 0:21-cv-00013-SWS, 0:21-cv-00056-SWS (Jordan, Travis) Modified text on 6/18/2021 (Court Staff, skb).
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER FOR LIMITED BRIEFING ON STAY OF PROCEEDINGS by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl. See Order for details. Associated Cases: 0:21-cv-00013-SWS, 0:21-cv-00056-SWS (Court Staff, skb)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER AMENDING #48 GLOBAL BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION MOTIONS (48 in 0:21-cv-00013-SWS, 48 in 0:21-cv-00013-SWS) by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl. See Order for detail. Associated Cases: 0:21-cv-00013-SWS, 0:21-cv-00056-SWS(Court Staff, stbd)
June 10, 2021 Filing 53 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re (1 in 0:21-cv-00013-SWS) Petition for Review (Attorney), (4 in 0:21-cv-00013-SWS) Amended Complaint, (2 in 0:21-cv-00013-SWS) Corporate Disclosure, (6 in 0:21-cv-00013-SWS) Summons Issued, (3 in 0:21-cv-00013-SWS) Notice of Judge Assignment and Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge Form by Petitioners Petroleum Association of Wyoming, Western Energy Alliance (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certified Mail Receipts) Associated Cases: 0:21-cv-00013-SWS, 0:21-cv-00056-SWS (Barron, Mark)
June 7, 2021 Filing 52 OPPOSITION to (41 in 0:21-cv-00013-SWS) Motion for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Respondents Bureau of Land Management, Bureau of Land Management Acting Director, Bureau of Land Management Wyoming State Office Acting Director, United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of Interior, United States Department of Interior Secretary, United States of America President. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Mustafa Haque, #2 Affidavit of Peter Cowan, #3 Affidavit of James Tichenor, #4 Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit F) Associated Cases: 0:21-cv-00013-SWS, 0:21-cv-00056-SWS (Sawyer, Michael)
June 7, 2021 Filing 51 RESPONSE in Opposition re (41 in 0:21-cv-00013-SWS) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Intervenor Respondents Alterra Mountain Company, Aspen Skiing Company, Hunt to Eat, Roan Creek Ranch, Thistle Whistle Farm, Western Spirit Cycling. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Affidavit Korenblat, #7 Affidavit Putelis) Associated Cases: 0:21-cv-00013-SWS, 0:21-cv-00056-SWS (Levine, Neil)
June 7, 2021 Filing 50 RESPONSE in Opposition re (41 in 0:21-cv-00013-SWS) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Intervenor Respondents Center for Biological Diversity, Citizens for a Healthy Community, Conservation Colorado, Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment, Earthworks, Food & Water Watch, Friends of the Earth, Great Old Broads for Wilderness, Indian People's Action, Montana Environmental Information Center, National Parks Conservation Association, Powder River Basin Resource Council, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, The Wilderness Society, Valley Organic Growers Association, Western Colorado Alliance, Western Organization of Resource Councils, Western Watersheds Project, WildEarth Guardians, Wilderness Workshop. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Thomas Delehanty, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Laura Zachary) Associated Cases: 0:21-cv-00013-SWS, 0:21-cv-00056-SWS (Freeman, Michael)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl granting in Civil Action No. 21-CV-56 ECF No. 52 Motion to Consolidate Cases for Trial. It is ORDERED that the State of Wyoming's Motion to Consolidate Civil Cases (21CV56 Doc. 52 ) is GRANTED. Case Numbers 21-CV-13-SWS and 21-CV-56- SWS are hereby consolidated under Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Case No. 21-CV-13-SWS shall be the lead case, as reflected in the caption above. For ease of administration, all further pleadings shall be filed in Case No. 21-CV-13-SWS, and no further pleadings should be filed in Case No. 21-CV-56. Any further pleadings received by the Clerk of Court for Case No. 21-CV-56 shall be filed in Case No. 21-CV-13. (Court Staff, skb)
May 20, 2021 Filing 48 GLOBAL BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR PRELIMINARY-INJUNCTION MOTIONS (Doc. 41 in 0:21-cv-00013-SWS; Doc. 44 in 0:21-cv-00056) by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl. See Order for details. Associated Cases: 0:21-cv-00013-SWS, 0:21-cv-00056-SWS (Court Staff, skb)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #45 Motion for Extension of Time. The Conservation Groups must file their response brief to Petitioners' motion for preliminary injunction by June 7, 2021. (Court Staff, smh)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #44 Motion for Extension of Time. Business Coalition shall file their brief in response to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction on or before June 7, 2021. (Court Staff, smh)
May 18, 2021 Filing 45 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of Response to Petitioner's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Intervenor Respondents Center for Biological Diversity, Citizens for a Healthy Community, Conservation Colorado, Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment, Earthworks, Food & Water Watch, Friends of the Earth, Great Old Broads for Wilderness, Indian People's Action, Montana Environmental Information Center, National Parks Conservation Association, Powder River Basin Resource Council, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, The Wilderness Society, Valley Organic Growers Association, Western Colorado Alliance, Western Organization of Resource Councils, Western Watersheds Project, WildEarth Guardians, Wilderness Workshop. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Delehanty, Thomas)
May 18, 2021 Filing 44 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of Deadline to Respond to Preliminary Injunction filed by Intervenor Respondent Alterra Mountain Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Kellan)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER GRANTING THE CONSERVATION GROUPS' MOTION TO INTERVENE #22 AND GRANTING THE BUSINESS-COLITION'S MOTION TO INTERVENE #23 by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin.(Court Staff, smxb)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl granting #40 Joint Motion to Adopt Briefing Plan on Motion for Preliminary Injunction. It is ORDERED that the following deadlines and page limitations shall govern the parties' preliminary injunction briefing: (1) Petitioners filed a motion for preliminary injunction on May 10, 2021 (Doc. #41 ); (2) Respondents' response (up to 40 pages) must be filed on or before June 7, 2021; (3) Petitioners may file a reply (up to 15 pages) on or before June 17, 2021. (Court Staff, skb)
May 10, 2021 Filing 41 NON-PUBLIC DOCUMENT pursuant to the Judicial Conference Policy on Privacy and Public Access - MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Petitioner Western Energy Alliance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Sgamma Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - Obermueller Declaration, #3 Exhibit C - Boswell Declaration)(Barron, Mark) Modified document security on 5/11/2021 (Court Staff, skb).
May 10, 2021 Filing 40 NON-PUBLIC DOCUMENT pursuant to the Judicial Conference Policy on Privacy and Public Access - Joint MOTION to Adopt Briefing Plan on #41 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Petitioner Western Energy Alliance. (Barron, Mark) Modified to add link and modify document security on 5/11/2021 (Court Staff, skb).
May 5, 2021 Filing 39 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Melissa A Hornbein on behalf of Center for Biological Diversity, Citizens for a Healthy Community, Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment, Earthworks, Food & Water Watch, Indian People's Action, Montana Environmental Information Center, Powder River Basin Resource Council, Western Organization of Resource Councils, WildEarth Guardians (Hornbein, Melissa)
April 27, 2021 Filing 38 RESPONSE to #23 Proposed MOTION to Intervene filed by Alterra Mountain Company, Aspen Skiing Company, Hunt to Eat, Roan Creek Ranch, Thistle Whistle Farm, Western Spirit Cycling, filed by Respondents United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of Interior Secretary, United States of America President. (Sawyer, Michael) Modified text on 4/29/2021 (Court Staff, sjlg). Modified text on 4/29/2021 (Court Staff, skb).
April 27, 2021 Filing 37 RESPONSE to #22 MOTION to Intervene filed by Center for Biological Diversity, Citizens for a Healthy Community, Conservation Colorado, Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment, Earthworks, Food & Water Watch, Friends of the Earth, Great Old Broads for Wilderness, Indian People's Action, Montana Environmental Information Center, National Parks Conservation Association, Powder River Basin Resource Council, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, The Wilderness Society, Valley Organic Growers Association, Western Colorado Alliance, Western Organization of Resource Councils, Western Watersheds Project, WildEarth Guardians, Wilderness Workshop filed by Respondents United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of Interior Secretary, United States of America President. (Sawyer, Michael) Modified text on 4/29/2021 (Court Staff, sjlg).
April 26, 2021 Filing 36 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Kellan Richard Smith on behalf of Alterra Mountain Company, Aspen Skiing Company, Hunt to Eat, Roan Creek Ranch, Thistle Whistle Farm, Western Spirit Cycling (Smith, Kellan) Modified to add movants on 4/29/2021 (Court Staff, skb).
April 22, 2021 Filing 35 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Kyle James Tisdel on behalf of Center for Biological Diversity, Citizens for a Healthy Community, Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment, Earthworks, Food & Water Watch, Indian People's Action, Montana Environmental Information Center, Powder River Basin Resource Council, Western Organization of Resource Councils, WildEarth Guardians (Tisdel, Kyle)
April 21, 2021 Filing 34 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Michael Sawyer on behalf of United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of Interior Secretary, United States of America President (Sawyer, Michael)
April 20, 2021 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $200 received for pro hac vice fees for Kellan Richard Smith and Neil Levine. Receipt CAS002550. (Court Staff, sjk)
April 20, 2021 Filing 33 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Neil Levine on behalf of Alterra Mountain Company, Aspen Skiing Company, Hunt to Eat, Roan Creek Ranch, Thistle Whistle Farm, Western Spirit Cycling (Levine, Neil) Modified on 4/20/2021 (Court Staff, stbd).
April 19, 2021 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $200 received for pro hac vice fees for Melissa Hornbein and Kyle Tisdel. Receipt CHY034599 (Court Staff, sjk)
April 19, 2021 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $300 received for pro hac vice fees for Robin Cooley, Thomas Delehanty & Michael Freeman. Receipt CHY034600. (Court Staff, sjk)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #19 Motion for Melissa Hornbein to appear pro hac vice; granting #20 Motion for Kyle Tisdel to appear pro hac vice. (Email sent to counsel.) (Court Staff, skb)
April 19, 2021 Filing 31 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Thomas R. Delehanty on behalf of Conservation Colorado, Friends of the Earth, Great Old Broads for Wilderness, National Parks Conservation Association, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, The Wilderness Society, Valley Organic Growers Association, Western Colorado Alliance, Western Watersheds Project, Wilderness Workshop (Delehanty, Thomas)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF KELLAN RICHARD SMITH & NEIL LEVINE AS COUNSEL FOR PROPOSED INTERVENOR-RESPONDENTS, ALTERRA MOUNTAINCOMPANY, ASPEN SKIING COMPANY, HUNT TO EAT, ROAN CREEK RANCH, THISTLEWHISTLE FARM & WESTERN SPIRIT CYCLING by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin re #25 Motion to appear pro hac vice & #26 Motion to appear pro hac vice. (cc: Email sent to Counsel)(Court Staff, stbd)
April 19, 2021 Filing 29 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Robin Cooley on behalf of Conservation Colorado, Friends of the Earth, Great Old Broads for Wilderness, National Parks Conservation Association, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, The Wilderness Society, Valley Organic Growers Association, Western Colorado Alliance, Western Watersheds Project, Wilderness Workshop (Cooley, Robin)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #16 Motion for Robin Cooley to appear pro hac vice; granting #17 Motion for Thomas Delehnty to appear pro hac vice; granting #18 Motion for Michael Freeman to appear pro hac vice. (Email sent to counsel.) (Court Staff, skb)
April 19, 2021 Filing 27 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Michael S Freeman on behalf of Conservation Colorado, Friends of the Earth, Great Old Broads for Wilderness, National Parks Conservation Association, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, The Wilderness Society, Valley Organic Growers Association, Western Colorado Alliance, Western Watersheds Project, Wilderness Workshop (Freeman, Michael)
April 19, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Neil Levine to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Movants Alterra Mountain Company, Aspen Skiing Company, Hunt to Eat, Roan Creek Ranch, Thistle Whistle Farm, Western Spirit Cycling. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Moats, Bruce) Modified text on 4/19/2021 (Court Staff, stbd). Modified text on 4/29/2021 (Court Staff, skb).
April 19, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Kellan Smith to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Movants Alterra Mountain Company, Aspen Skiing Company, Hunt to Eat, Roan Creek Ranch, Thistle Whistle Farm, Western Spirit Cycling. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Moats, Bruce) Modified text on 4/19/2021 (Court Staff, stbd). Modified text on 4/29/2021 (Court Staff, skb).
April 19, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bruce T Moats on behalf of Alterra Mountain Company, Aspen Skiing Company, Hunt to Eat, Roan Creek Ranch, Thistle Whistle Farm, Western Spirit Cycling (Moats, Bruce)
April 19, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION to Intervene, attorney Bruce T. Moats P.C. appearing for Alterra Mountain Company, Aspen Skiing Company, Hunt to Eat, Roan Creek Ranch, Thistle Whistle Farm, Western Spirit Cycling, filed by Movants Alterra Mountain Company, Aspen Skiing Company, Hunt to Eat, Roan Creek Ranch, Thistle Whistle Farm, Western Spirit Cycling (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit, #4 Affidavit, #5 Affidavit, #6 Affidavit) (Moats, Bruce) Modified text on 4/19/2021 (Court Staff, sbh). Modified text on 4/23/2021 (Court Staff, sjlg).
April 19, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION to Intervene, attorney Shannon Anderson appearing for Center for Biological Diversity, Citizens for a Healthy Community, Conservation Colorado, Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment, Earthworks, Food & Water Watch, Friends of the Earth, Great Old Broads for Wilderness, Indian People's Action, Montana Environmental Information Center, National Parks Conservation Association, Powder River Basin Resource Council, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, The Wilderness Society, Valley Organic Growers Association, Western Colorado Alliance, Western Organization of Resource Councils, Western Watersheds Project, WildEarth Guardians, Wilderness Workshop, filed by Movants Center for Biological Diversity, Citizens for a Healthy Community, Conservation Colorado, Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment, Earthworks, Food & Water Watch, Friends of the Earth, Great Old Broads for Wilderness, Indian People's Action, Montana Environmental Information Center, National Parks Conservation Association, Powder River Basin Resource Council, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, The Wilderness Society, Valley Organic Growers Association, Western Colorado Alliance, Western Organization of Resource Councils, Western Watersheds Project, WildEarth Guardians, Wilderness Workshop. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declarations in Support of Motion to Intervene, #2 Proposed Order)(Anderson, Shannon) Modified text on 4/20/2021 (Court Staff, skb). Modified text on 4/23/2021 (Court Staff, sjlg).
April 19, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shannon Anderson on behalf of Center for Biological Diversity, Citizens for a Healthy Community, Conservation Colorado, Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment, Earthworks, Food & Water Watch, Friends of the Earth, Great Old Broads for Wilderness, Indian People's Action, Montana Environmental Information Center, National Parks Conservation Association, Powder River Basin Resource Council, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, The Wilderness Society, Valley Organic Growers Association, Western Colorado Alliance, Western Organization of Resource Councils, Western Watersheds Project, WildEarth Guardians, Wilderness Workshop (Anderson, Shannon)
April 19, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Kyle Tisdel to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Movants Powder River Basin Resource Council, Center for Biologic Diversity, Citizens for a Healthy Community, Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment, Earthworks, Food & Water Watch, Indian People's Action, Montana Environmental Information Center, Western Organization of Recourse Councils, WildEarth Guardians. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Anderson, Shannon) Modified to add movants on 4/29/2021 (Court Staff, skb).
April 19, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Melissa Hornbein to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Movants Powder River Basin Resource Council, Center for Biologic Diversity, Citizens for a Healthy Community, Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment, Earthworks, Food & Water Watch, Indian People's Action, Montana Environmental Information Center, Western Organization of Recourse Councils, WildEarth Guardians. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Anderson, Shannon) Modified to add movants on 4/29/2021 (Court Staff, skb).
April 19, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Mike Freeman to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Movant Powder River Basin Resource Council, Conservation Colorado, Great Old Broads for Wilderness, National Parks Conservation Association, Sierra Club, Friends of the Earth, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, The Wilderness Society, Valley Organic Growers Association, Western Colorado Alliance, Western Watersheds Project, Wilderness Workshop. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Anderson, Shannon) Modified to add movants on 4/29/2021 (Court Staff, skb).
April 19, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Tom Delehanty to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Movant Powder River Basin Resource Council, Conservation Colorado, Great Old Broads for Wilderness, National Parks Conservation Association, Sierra Club, Friends of the Earth, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, The Wilderness Society, Valley Organic Growers Association, Western Colorado Alliance, Western Watersheds Project, Wilderness Workshop. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Anderson, Shannon) Modified to add movants on 4/29/2021 (Court Staff, skb).
April 19, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Robin Cooley to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Movants Powder River Basin Resource Council, Conservation Colorado, Great Old Broads for Wilderness, National Parks Conservation Association, Sierra Club, Friends of the Earth, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, The Wilderness Society, Valley Organic Growers Association, Western Colorado Alliance, Western Watersheds Project, Wilderness Workshop. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Robin Cooley, #2 Proposed Order)(Anderson, Shannon) Modified to add movants on 4/29/2021 (Court Staff, skb).
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #14 Motion for Michael S. Sawyer to appear pro hac vice. (Email sent to counsel.) (Court Staff, skb)
April 6, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Michael S. Sawyer to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Respondents United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of Interior Acting Secretary, United States Department of Interior Secretary, United States of America President. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael S. Sawyer, #2 Proposed Order)(Vassallo, Nicholas)
April 6, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicholas Vassallo on behalf of United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of Interior Secretary, United States of America President (Vassallo, Nicholas)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #10 Motion for Mark S. Barron to appear pro hac vice. (Court Staff, skb)
March 23, 2021 Filing 11 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Mark S Barron on behalf of Western Energy Alliance and Petroleum Association of Wyoming (Barron, Mark) Modified text on 3/25/2021 (Court Staff, skb).
March 22, 2021 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $100 received for pro hac vice fee for Mark S Barron. Receipt CHY034476. (Court Staff, sjk)
March 19, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Mark S. Barron to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Petitioner Western Energy Alliance and Petroleum Association of Wyoming. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Mark Barron, #2 Proposed Order)(Barron, Mark) Modified text on 3/25/2021 (Court Staff, skb).
March 17, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alexander Karl Obrecht on behalf of Western Energy Alliance and Petroleum Association of Wyoming (Obrecht, Alexander) Modified to add additional Petitioner on 3/25/2021 (Court Staff, skb).
March 17, 2021 Filing 8 SECOND AMENDED PETITION FOR REVIEW OF GOVERNMENT ACTION against Defendant United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of Interior Secretary, United States of America President, filed by Western Energy Alliance, Petroleum Association of Wyoming. (Leggette, Lyle) Modified text on 3/18/2021 (Court Staff, skb). Modified on 3/25/2021 to add filer (Court Staff, skb).
March 17, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE by Petitioner Western Energy Alliance in Support of #8 Second Amended Petition (Leggette, Lyle) Modified to add link on 3/25/2021 (Court Staff, skb).
March 11, 2021 Filing 6 Summonses Issued. (9 summonses issued and emailed to counsel) (Court Staff, skb)
March 11, 2021 Filing 5 Praecipe for Summonses to Defendants filed by Petitioner Western Energy Alliance (Attachments: #1 Summons to Joseph R. Biden, Jr., #2 Summons to Biden c/o US Attorney General, #3 Summons to Biden c/o US Attorney - District of Wyoming, #4 Summons to Scott de la Vega, #5 Summons to de la Vega c/o US Attorney General, #6 Summons to de la Vega c/o US Attorney District of Wyoming, #7 Summons to US Bureau of Land Management, #8 Summons to US BLM c/o US Attorney General, #9 Summons to US BLM c/o US Attorney District of Wyoming) (Leggette, Lyle) Modified text on 3/11/2021 (Court Staff, skb).
February 23, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED PETITION FOR REVIEW OF GOVERNMENT ACTION against Defendant United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of Interior Acting Secretary, United States of America President, filed by Western Energy Alliance. (Leggette, Lyle) Modified text on 2/23/2021 (Court Staff, skb).
January 27, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Judge Assignment. The case has been assigned to the Honorable Scott W. Skavdahl. (Court Staff, skb)
January 27, 2021 Filing 2 NON-PUBLIC DOCUMENT pursuant to the Judicial Conference Policy on Privacy and Public Access - CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by Western Energy Alliance,. (Leggette, Lyle) Modified document security on 1/27/2021 (Court Staff, stmo).
January 27, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REVIEW. ( Filing fee $402 receipt #AWYDC-1884194.), filed by Western Energy Alliance. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Leggette, Lyle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Western Energy Alliance v. Biden et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America President
Represented By: Michael Sawyer
Represented By: Nicholas Vassallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Acting Secretary of Interior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Scott De La Vega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Joseph R Biden, Jr
Represented By: Michael Sawyer
Represented By: Nicholas Vassallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Bureau of Land Management
Represented By: Michael Sawyer
Represented By: Nicholas Vassallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Department of Interior Acting Secretary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Department of Interior Secretary
Represented By: Michael Sawyer
Represented By: Nicholas Vassallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Deb Haaland
Represented By: Michael Sawyer
Represented By: Nicholas Vassallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bureau of Land Management Wyoming State Office Acting Director
Represented By: Michael Sawyer
Represented By: Nicholas Vassallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bureau of Land Management Acting Director
Represented By: Michael Sawyer
Represented By: Nicholas Vassallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nada Culver
Represented By: Michael Sawyer
Represented By: Nicholas Vassallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kim Liebhauser
Represented By: Michael Sawyer
Represented By: Nicholas Vassallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Department of Interior
Represented By: Michael Sawyer
Represented By: Nicholas Vassallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bureau of Land Management
Represented By: Michael Sawyer
Represented By: Nicholas Vassallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Western Energy Alliance
Represented By: Lyle Poe Leggette
Represented By: Alexander Karl Obrecht
Represented By: Mark S Barron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Petroleum Association of Wyoming
Represented By: Alexander Karl Obrecht
Represented By: Lyle Poe Leggette
Represented By: Mark S Barron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: State of Wyoming
Represented By: James C Kaste
Represented By: Travis Steven Jordan
Represented By: D. David DeWald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Conservation Colorado
Represented By: Robin Cooley
Represented By: Thomas R. Delehanty
Represented By: Michael S Freeman
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Western Colorado Alliance
Represented By: Robin Cooley
Represented By: Thomas R. Delehanty
Represented By: Michael S Freeman
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Western Watersheds Project
Represented By: Robin Cooley
Represented By: Thomas R. Delehanty
Represented By: Michael S Freeman
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Alterra Mountain Company
Represented By: Kellan Richard Smith
Represented By: Neil Levine
Represented By: Bruce T Moats
Represented By: Sarah Matsumoto
Represented By: Susan Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Roan Creek Ranch
Represented By: Neil Levine
Represented By: Bruce T Moats
Represented By: Sarah Matsumoto
Represented By: Susan Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Hunt to Eat
Represented By: Neil Levine
Represented By: Bruce T Moats
Represented By: Sarah Matsumoto
Represented By: Susan Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Citizens for a Healthy Community
Represented By: Kyle James Tisdel
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Represented By: Melissa A Hornbein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Western Spirit Cycling
Represented By: Neil Levine
Represented By: Bruce T Moats
Represented By: Sarah Matsumoto
Represented By: Susan Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Valley Organic Growers Association
Represented By: Robin Cooley
Represented By: Thomas R. Delehanty
Represented By: Michael S Freeman
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Food & Water Watch
Represented By: Kyle James Tisdel
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Represented By: Melissa A Hornbein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Sierra Club
Represented By: Robin Cooley
Represented By: Thomas R. Delehanty
Represented By: Michael S Freeman
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: WildEarth Guardians
Represented By: Kyle James Tisdel
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Represented By: Melissa A Hornbein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Aspen Skiing Company
Represented By: Neil Levine
Represented By: Bruce T Moats
Represented By: Sarah Matsumoto
Represented By: Susan Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Thistle Whistle Farm
Represented By: Neil Levine
Represented By: Bruce T Moats
Represented By: Sarah Matsumoto
Represented By: Susan Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: National Parks Conservation Association
Represented By: Robin Cooley
Represented By: Thomas R. Delehanty
Represented By: Michael S Freeman
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Powder River Basin Resource Council
Represented By: Kyle James Tisdel
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Represented By: Melissa A Hornbein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Earthworks
Represented By: Kyle James Tisdel
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Represented By: Melissa A Hornbein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Montana Environmental Information Center
Represented By: Kyle James Tisdel
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Represented By: Melissa A Hornbein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: The Wilderness Society
Represented By: Robin Cooley
Represented By: Thomas R. Delehanty
Represented By: Michael S Freeman
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Western Organization of Resource Councils
Represented By: Kyle James Tisdel
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Represented By: Melissa A Hornbein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance
Represented By: Robin Cooley
Represented By: Thomas R. Delehanty
Represented By: Michael S Freeman
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Kyle James Tisdel
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Represented By: Melissa A Hornbein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Wilderness Workshop
Represented By: Robin Cooley
Represented By: Thomas R. Delehanty
Represented By: Michael S Freeman
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment
Represented By: Kyle James Tisdel
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Represented By: Melissa A Hornbein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Friends of the Earth
Represented By: Robin Cooley
Represented By: Thomas R. Delehanty
Represented By: Michael S Freeman
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Indian People's Action
Represented By: Kyle James Tisdel
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Represented By: Melissa A Hornbein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Great Old Broads for Wilderness
Represented By: Robin Cooley
Represented By: Thomas R. Delehanty
Represented By: Michael S Freeman
Represented By: Shannon Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Western Leaders Network
Represented By: Megan Hayes
Represented By: Wyatt Gregory Sassman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?