Quinones v. Holder et al

Defendant: Eric Holder, Charles E Samuels, Jr, Harvey Lappin, T C Outlaw, Paul A Kastner, J A Keller, G Maldonado, Jr, Amy Carlton, D W Heuett, Jill Dube-Gilley, E J Prince, A Molina, Jones, G Edward Bryant, Subba Gollamudi, A Haynes and Eye Specialty Group Eye Clinic
Plaintiff: Guillermo Quinones
Case Number: 2:2013cv00099
Filed: July 30, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Phillips
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 27, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 7 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, pltf's claims against Holder, Samuels, Lappin, Kastner, Keller, and Maldonado are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, and they are removed as party defts in this action. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/27/13. (vjt)
January 13, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. On October 30, 2013, the Court held a hearing in Quinones v. United States, 2:13CV19, and heard testimony from Mr. Quinones. A hearing transcript was made a part of that record. The Court intends to use Mr. Quinones's testimony in case 2:13CV19 in deciding the instant case. Any objection to the Court using this testimony should be filed by January 24, 2014. The Clerk of Court shall provide a copy of the hearing transcript to Mr. Quinones with a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 1/13/14. (kpr)
February 14, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 40 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects. 26 Motion to dismiss is granted and defendants Subba Gollamudi and Eye Speciality Group Eye Clinic are dismissed from this cause of action. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/14/2014. (ks)
June 23, 2014 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 53 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects; granting in part and denying in part 47 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Defendant G. Edward Bryant is DISMISSED for plaintiff's failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Plaintiff's claim that Dr. Bryant operated on his wrong eye is barred by the statute of limitations. The motion to dismiss based on statute of li mitations is DENIED in all other respects. The motion to dismiss based on the doctrine of collateral estoppel is DENIED. The motion to dismiss based on insufficient service of process is rendered moot. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/23/2014. (ks)
December 9, 2014 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 55 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects. Defendants Amy Carlton and Jones are dismissed from this action without prejudice. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order and the accompanying Judgment would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/9/2014. (ks)
April 22, 2015 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 63 Proposed Findings and Recommended Disposition in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects; granting 60 Motion for Summary Judgment. This cause of action is dismissed without prejudice. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order and a Judgment dismissing this action would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/22/2015. (ks)
April 22, 2015 65 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 64 Order that was entered on this day, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/22/2015. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quinones v. Holder et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Holder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles E Samuels, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvey Lappin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T C Outlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul A Kastner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J A Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G Maldonado, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Carlton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D W Heuett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jill Dube-Gilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E J Prince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Molina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G Edward Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Subba Gollamudi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eye Specialty Group Eye Clinic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guillermo Quinones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]