Coleman v. Lockhart et al

Defendant: Eldridge and D Lockhart
Plaintiff: Delwrick D Coleman
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00131
Filed: October 4, 2013
 
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
 
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 25, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The Clerk shall prepare summons for the defts Eldridge and D. Lockhart and the U.S. Marshal shall serve a copy of the summons and complaint on defts at the addresses provided under seal without prepayment of fees 2 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/25/13. (kpr)
November 1, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 4 Partial Report and Recommendations with exception; pltf's false disciplinary allegations against Lockhart, Eldridge, Williams, and Doe are DISMISSED for failure to state a claim; pltf's grievance and disciplinary appeal allegations against defts Williams, Burl, and May are DISMISSED for failure to state a claim; defts Williams, Burl, Doe, and May are DISMISSED from pltf's complaint. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/1/13. (vjt)
September 4, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 54 Proposed Findings and Recommendations in their entirety; granting 48 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 51 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's claim against defendant Eldridge is DISMISSED without prejudice for f ailure to exhaust. Plaintiff's constitutional claims against defendant Lockhart are DISMISSED with prejudice. Plaintiff's state law claims against defendant Lockhart are DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/4/2014. (ks)
September 4, 2014 56 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 55 Order entered in this matter on this date, it is Considered, Ordered and Adjudged that this case be, and it is hereby, DISMISSED. The relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/4/2014. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Coleman v. Lockhart et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eldridge
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Lockhart
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delwrick D Coleman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]