Williams v. Arkansas Department of Correction et al

Defendant: Arkansas Department of Correction and John Maples
Plaintiff: Whitnei Williams
Case Number: 4:2013cv00152
Filed: March 15, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: White
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 7, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER lifting stay effective on the 61st day after 9/24/2013. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/7/2014. (ks)
January 14, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot Defendants' 17 motion to dismiss and granting plaintiff's 22 second motion to amend. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/14/2014. (ks)
January 20, 2015 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Having been notified that a settlement has been reached in this matter, the Court finds that this case should be dismissed. The complaint and all claims in this action against defendants are hereby dismissed. The Court retains complete jurisdiction for 90 days to vacate this Order and to reopen the action if it is satisfactorily shown that settlement has not been completed and further litigation is necessary. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/20/2015. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Arkansas Department of Correction et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Maples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Whitnei Williams
Represented By: Luther Oneal Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.